EP2015593 - METHOD AND DEVICE FOR CONTROLLING THE FUNCTION OF MOIBLE COMMUNICATION DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 12.02.2010 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.02.2010 | Withdrawal of application | published on 17.03.2010 [2010/11] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd. Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | [N/P] |
Former [2009/03] | For all designated states Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd. Huawei Administration Building, Bantian Longgang District, Shenzhen Guangdong 518129 / CN | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LA, Huer Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang District Shenzhen Guangdong 518129 / CN | 02 /
YU, Qian Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang District Shenzhen Guangdong 518129 / CN | [2009/03] | Representative(s) | Hengelhaupt, Jürgen Gulde & Partner Patent- und Rechtsanwaltskanzlei mbB Wallstrasse 58/59 10179 Berlin / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/03] | Hengelhaupt, Jürgen Gulde Hengelhaupt Ziebig & Schneider Patentanwälte - Rechtsanwälte Wallstrasse 58/59 10179 Berlin / DE | Application number, filing date | 07720332.1 | 06.03.2007 | [2009/03] | WO2007CN00711 | Priority number, date | CN2006166627 | 13.04.2006 Original published format: CN200610066627 | [2009/03] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2007118403 | Date: | 25.10.2007 | Language: | ZH | [2007/43] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2015593 | Date: | 14.01.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/03] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 25.10.2007 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.05.2009 | Classification | IPC: | H04M1/725 | [2009/27] | CPC: |
H04W48/04 (EP,US);
H04M1/72457 (EP,US);
H04M2250/10 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2009/03] | H04Q7/32 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/03] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND EINRICHTUNG ZUR STEUERUNG DER FUNKTION EINES MOBILKOMMUNIKATIONSGERÄTS | [2009/03] | English: | METHOD AND DEVICE FOR CONTROLLING THE FUNCTION OF MOIBLE COMMUNICATION DEVICE | [2009/03] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET DISPOSITIF DE COMMANDE DE LA FONCTION D'UN DISPOSITIF DE COMMUNICATION MOBILE | [2009/03] | Entry into regional phase | 16.10.2008 | Translation filed | 16.10.2008 | National basic fee paid | 16.10.2008 | Search fee paid | 16.10.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.10.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.10.2008 | Examination requested [2009/03] | 30.09.2009 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.12.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.02.2010 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2010/11] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.03.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XAY]WO9825433 (ERICSSON GE MOBILE INC [US]) [X] 1,2,5,9,10,15 * abstract * * page 2, line 21 - page 8, line 13 * * figures 1,3 * [A] 3,4,6,7,11-14 [Y] 8,16; | [A]US2002037722 (HUSSAIN TAHIR [US], et al) [A] 1-16 * paragraphs [0092] - [0102] ** figure 13 *; | [XAY]EP1302745 (HITACHI LTD [JP]) [X] 1,5,11 * paragraphs [0020] - [0038] * * figures 1-10 * [A] 2-4,6-10,12,13,15,16 [Y] 14; | [A]EP1511347 (KONINKL KPN NV [NL]) [A] 1-16 * paragraphs [0022] - [0028] * * figure 2 *; | [A]US2005192038 (JEONG WON-BAE [KR]) [A] 1-16 * paragraph [0024] *; | [YA]EP1592277 (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR]) [Y] 8,16 * paragraphs [0015] - [0066] * * figures 1-4 * [A] 1-7,9-15; | [YA] - "Digital cellular telecommunications system (Phase 2+); Universal Mobile Telecommunications System (UMTS); USIM/SIM Application Toolkit (USAT/SAT); Service description; Stage 1 (3GPP TS 22.038 version 5.3.0 Release 5); ETSI TS 122 038", ETSI STANDARDS, LIS, SOPHIA ANTIPOLIS CEDEX, FRANCE, (20030601), vol. 3-SA1, no. V5.3.0, ISSN 0000-0001, XP014007136 [Y] 14 * sections 1 and 4 to 8.3 * [A] 1-13,15,16 | International search | [A]JP2000350251 (HITACHI LTD); | [X]KR20010050746 (LUCENT TECHNOLOGIES INC); | [A]US2005075114 (DENNISON EVERETT [US], et al) |