EP2171896 - APPARATUS AND METHOD FOR REMOVING COMMON PHASE ERROR IN A DVB-T/H RECEIVER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 03.05.2013 Database last updated on 26.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.05.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 05.06.2013 [2013/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Thomson Licensing 1-5, rue Jeanne d'Arc 92130 Issy-les-Moulineaux / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2010/14] | For all designated states Thomson Licensing 1, rue Jeanne d'Arc 92443 Issy-les-Moulineaux Cedex / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LIU, Peng 8th Floor, Building A Technology Fortune Center No.8 Xueqing Road Haidian District Beijing 100085 / CN | 02 /
ZOU, Jilin 8th Floor, Building A Technology Fortune Center No.8 Xueqing Road Haidian District Beijing 100085 / CN | 03 /
ZOU, Li 8th Floor, Building A Technology Fortune Center No.8 Xueqing Road Haidian District Beijing 100085 / CN | [2010/14] | Representative(s) | Ruellan-Lemonnier, Brigitte, et al Technicolor European Patent Operations 1-5 Rue Jeanne d'Arc 92443 Issy-les-Moulineaux Cedex / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2010/14] | Ruellan-Lemonnier, Brigitte, et al Thomson European Patent Operations 1-5 Rue Jeanne d'Arc 92443 Issy-les-Moulineaux Cedex / FR | Application number, filing date | 07721600.0 | 29.06.2007 | [2010/14] | WO2007CN02033 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2009003306 | Date: | 08.01.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/02] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2171896 | Date: | 07.04.2010 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.01.2009 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2010/14] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 08.01.2009 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.05.2012 | Classification | IPC: | H04J11/00, H04K1/10, H04L1/20, H04B1/10, H04L27/28 | [2010/14] | CPC: |
H04L27/2647 (EP,BR,KR,US);
H04L25/022 (EP,BR,KR,US);
H04B1/10 (KR);
H04L25/0224 (KR);
H04L25/03159 (EP,BR,KR,US);
H04L27/3854 (EP,BR,KR,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/14] | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUM ENTFERNEN EINES GEMEINSAMEN PHASENFEHLERS IN EINEM DVB-T/H-EMPFÄNGER | [2010/14] | English: | APPARATUS AND METHOD FOR REMOVING COMMON PHASE ERROR IN A DVB-T/H RECEIVER | [2010/14] | French: | APPAREIL ET PROCÉDÉ POUR ÉLIMINER UNE ERREUR DE PHASE COMMUNE DANS UN RÉCEPTEUR DVB-T/H | [2010/14] | Entry into regional phase | 22.01.2010 | National basic fee paid | 22.01.2010 | Search fee paid | 22.01.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.01.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.01.2010 | Examination requested [2010/14] | 04.03.2010 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 04.12.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2013/23] | 09.01.2013 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2013/23] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.01.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.06.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.06.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.06.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2005078599 (ZHIDKOV SERGEI [KR], et al) [X] 1-3,7-9,11-13 * paragraph [0045] - paragraph [0051] * * figure 4 * | International search | [A]US2006165187 (TROYA ALFONSO [DE], et al); | [A]US2006182015 (KIM DONG-KYU [KR]); | [A]CN1823490 (MOTOROLA INC [US]); | [A]JP2004007280 (TOYO COMMUNICATION EQUIP); | [A]US2005286649 (REDFERN ARTHUR J [US]); | [A]US6618352 (SHIRAKATA NAGANORI [JP], et al) |