EP1991800 - SEALING SYSTEM WITH PRESSURE RELIEF ELEMENTS AND USE OF A SEALING SYSTEM FOR PRODUCING A PRESSURE CASCADE IN AN INTERMEDIATE SPACE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.11.2014 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.07.2016 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): LU, TR | published on 17.08.2016 [2016/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Trelleborg Sealing Solutions Germany GmbH Handwerkstrasse 5-7 70565 Stuttgart / DE | [2008/47] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
JORDAN, Holger Novizenweg 140 73765 Neuhausen a.d.F. / DE | [2008/47] | Representative(s) | Kohler Schmid Möbus Patentanwälte Partnerschaftsgesellschaft mbB Gropiusplatz 10 70563 Stuttgart / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2014/01] | Kohler Schmid Möbus Patentanwälte Ruppmannstraße 27 70565 Stuttgart / DE | ||
Former [2008/47] | Kohler Schmid Möbus Patentanwälte Ruppmannstrasse 27 70565 Stuttgart / DE | Application number, filing date | 07721934.3 | 20.02.2007 | [2008/47] | WO2007DE00317 | Priority number, date | DE20061009491 | 27.02.2006 Original published format: DE102006009491 | [2008/47] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2007095915 | Date: | 30.08.2007 | Language: | DE | [2007/35] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1991800 | Date: | 19.11.2008 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.08.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/47] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1991800 | Date: | 01.01.2014 | Language: | DE | [2014/01] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 30.08.2007 | Classification | IPC: | F16J15/16, F16J15/56 | [2008/47] | CPC: |
F16J15/164 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/47] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | DICHTUNGSSYSTEM MIT DRUCKENTLASTUNGSELEMENTEN UND VERWENDUNG EINES DICHTUNGSSYSTEMS ZUR EINSTELLUNG EINER ZWISCHENRAUMDRUCKKASKADE | [2008/47] | English: | SEALING SYSTEM WITH PRESSURE RELIEF ELEMENTS AND USE OF A SEALING SYSTEM FOR PRODUCING A PRESSURE CASCADE IN AN INTERMEDIATE SPACE | [2008/47] | French: | SYSTÈME D'ÉTANCHÉITÉ PRÉSENTANT DES ÉLÉMENTS DE DÉCOMPRESSION, ET UTILISATION D'UN SYSTÈME D'ÉTANCHÉITÉ POUR LE RÉGLAGE D'UNE CASCADE DE PRESSION DANS DES ESPACES INTERMÉDIAIRES | [2008/47] | Entry into regional phase | 29.09.2008 | National basic fee paid | 29.09.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.09.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.12.2007 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 29.09.2008 | Examination requested [2008/47] | 22.08.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.12.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.01.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.05.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.07.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.11.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 18.11.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 22.08.2012 | Opposition(s) | 02.10.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/50] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.02.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 01.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.02.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.02.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 26.02.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 20.02.2007 | BG | 01.01.2014 | CY | 01.01.2014 | CZ | 01.01.2014 | EE | 01.01.2014 | LT | 01.01.2014 | LV | 01.01.2014 | MC | 01.01.2014 | PL | 01.01.2014 | RO | 01.01.2014 | SI | 01.01.2014 | SK | 01.01.2014 | TR | 01.01.2014 | IE | 20.02.2014 | LU | 20.02.2014 | GR | 02.04.2014 | IS | 01.05.2014 | PT | 02.05.2014 | [2016/33] |
Former [2016/32] | HU | 20.02.2007 | |
BG | 01.01.2014 | ||
CY | 01.01.2014 | ||
CZ | 01.01.2014 | ||
EE | 01.01.2014 | ||
LT | 01.01.2014 | ||
LV | 01.01.2014 | ||
MC | 01.01.2014 | ||
PL | 01.01.2014 | ||
RO | 01.01.2014 | ||
SI | 01.01.2014 | ||
SK | 01.01.2014 | ||
IE | 20.02.2014 | ||
GR | 02.04.2014 | ||
IS | 01.05.2014 | ||
PT | 02.05.2014 | ||
Former [2016/28] | BG | 01.01.2014 | |
CY | 01.01.2014 | ||
CZ | 01.01.2014 | ||
EE | 01.01.2014 | ||
LT | 01.01.2014 | ||
LV | 01.01.2014 | ||
MC | 01.01.2014 | ||
PL | 01.01.2014 | ||
RO | 01.01.2014 | ||
SI | 01.01.2014 | ||
SK | 01.01.2014 | ||
IE | 20.02.2014 | ||
GR | 02.04.2014 | ||
IS | 01.05.2014 | ||
PT | 02.05.2014 | ||
Former [2016/25] | BG | 01.01.2014 | |
CY | 01.01.2014 | ||
CZ | 01.01.2014 | ||
EE | 01.01.2014 | ||
LT | 01.01.2014 | ||
LV | 01.01.2014 | ||
MC | 01.01.2014 | ||
PL | 01.01.2014 | ||
RO | 01.01.2014 | ||
SI | 01.01.2014 | ||
SK | 01.01.2014 | ||
IE | 20.02.2014 | ||
IS | 01.05.2014 | ||
PT | 02.05.2014 | ||
Former [2015/24] | CY | 01.01.2014 | |
CZ | 01.01.2014 | ||
EE | 01.01.2014 | ||
LT | 01.01.2014 | ||
LV | 01.01.2014 | ||
MC | 01.01.2014 | ||
PL | 01.01.2014 | ||
RO | 01.01.2014 | ||
SI | 01.01.2014 | ||
SK | 01.01.2014 | ||
IE | 20.02.2014 | ||
IS | 01.05.2014 | ||
PT | 02.05.2014 | ||
Former [2015/07] | CY | 01.01.2014 | |
CZ | 01.01.2014 | ||
EE | 01.01.2014 | ||
LT | 01.01.2014 | ||
LV | 01.01.2014 | ||
MC | 01.01.2014 | ||
PL | 01.01.2014 | ||
RO | 01.01.2014 | ||
SK | 01.01.2014 | ||
IE | 20.02.2014 | ||
IS | 01.05.2014 | ||
PT | 02.05.2014 | ||
Former [2014/50] | CY | 01.01.2014 | |
CZ | 01.01.2014 | ||
EE | 01.01.2014 | ||
LT | 01.01.2014 | ||
LV | 01.01.2014 | ||
MC | 01.01.2014 | ||
PL | 01.01.2014 | ||
RO | 01.01.2014 | ||
SK | 01.01.2014 | ||
IS | 01.05.2014 | ||
PT | 02.05.2014 | ||
Former [2014/49] | CY | 01.01.2014 | |
CZ | 01.01.2014 | ||
EE | 01.01.2014 | ||
LT | 01.01.2014 | ||
LV | 01.01.2014 | ||
MC | 01.01.2014 | ||
RO | 01.01.2014 | ||
IS | 01.05.2014 | ||
PT | 02.05.2014 | ||
Former [2014/48] | CY | 01.01.2014 | |
CZ | 01.01.2014 | ||
EE | 01.01.2014 | ||
LT | 01.01.2014 | ||
LV | 01.01.2014 | ||
MC | 01.01.2014 | ||
IS | 01.05.2014 | ||
PT | 02.05.2014 | ||
Former [2014/46] | CY | 01.01.2014 | |
LT | 01.01.2014 | ||
LV | 01.01.2014 | ||
MC | 01.01.2014 | ||
IS | 01.05.2014 | ||
PT | 02.05.2014 | ||
Former [2014/41] | CY | 01.01.2014 | |
LT | 01.01.2014 | ||
LV | 01.01.2014 | ||
IS | 01.05.2014 | ||
PT | 02.05.2014 | ||
Former [2014/37] | CY | 01.01.2014 | |
LT | 01.01.2014 | ||
IS | 01.05.2014 | ||
PT | 02.05.2014 | ||
Former [2014/36] | LT | 01.01.2014 | |
IS | 01.05.2014 | Cited in | International search | [Y]DE3620539 (BUSAK & LUYKEN GMBH & CO [DE]) [Y] 1-5,12,13 * the whole document *; | [AD]DE19654357 (BUSAK & SHAMBAN GMBH & CO [DE]) [AD] 1* the whole document *; | [A]US6290235 (ALBERTSON KENNETH R [US]) [A] 1-17 * column 4, lines 35-59 * * column 9, line 40 - column 12, line 15 *; | [Y]US2002153665 (BORSTEL DIETER VON [DE], et al) [Y] 1-5,12,13 * paragraphs [0015] - [0020]; figure - * | by applicant | US2002153665 | EP0946837 |