EP1994363 - MICROMECHANICAL ROTATIONAL SPEED SENSOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 02.04.2018 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 27.03.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.07.2018 | Refusal of application | published on 22.08.2018 [2018/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Conti Temic Microelectronic GmbH Sieboldstraße 19 90411 Nürnberg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/48] | For all designated states Conti Temic microelectronic GmbH Sieboldstrasse 19 90411 Nürnberg / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HARTMANN, Bernhard Altkönigstrasse 24 61169 Friedberg / DE | 02 /
GÜNTHNER, Stefan Hausener Weg 9 60489 Frankfurt / DE | [2008/48] | Representative(s) | Rinn, Matthias Continental Teves AG & Co. oHG Guerickestraße 7 60488 Frankfurt am Main / DE | [N/P] | Application number, filing date | 07722020.0 | 12.03.2007 | [2008/48] | WO2007DE00445 | Priority number, date | DE20061012610 | 10.03.2006 Original published format: DE102006012610 | [2008/48] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2007104289 | Date: | 20.09.2007 | Language: | DE | [2007/38] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1994363 | Date: | 26.11.2008 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.09.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/48] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 20.09.2007 | Classification | IPC: | G01C19/56, G01P9/04 | [2008/48] | CPC: |
G01C19/5762 (EP,US);
G01C19/56 (KR);
G01C19/5747 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/48] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | MIKROMECHANISCHER DREHRATENSENSOR | [2008/48] | English: | MICROMECHANICAL ROTATIONAL SPEED SENSOR | [2008/48] | French: | CAPTEUR DE VITESSE DE ROTATION MICROMÉCANIQUE | [2008/48] | Entry into regional phase | 01.08.2008 | National basic fee paid | 01.08.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 01.08.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 01.08.2008 | Examination requested [2008/48] | 28.04.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.09.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.01.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 04.07.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.03.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.06.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.03.2018 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2018/34] | 22.03.2018 | Date of oral proceedings | 03.04.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2018/34] | 03.04.2018 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 28.04.2015 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.03.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 26.03.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 19.05.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 15.06.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 31.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 31.03.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2014 | 08   M06   Fee paid on   19.05.2014 | 31.03.2015 | 09   M06   Fee paid on   15.06.2015 | 31.03.2018 | 12   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XY]US2005024527 (CHIOU JEN-HUANG ALBERT [US]) [X] 1-6,8 * paragraphs [0023] - [0033] * [Y] 7,9,10; | [DY]DE19641284 (INST MIKRO UND INFORMATIONSTEC [DE]) [DY] 7,9,10 * column 13, line 20 - column 14, line 50; figure 5 * | Examination | DE19641284 | US2005024527 |