EP2002105 - INTERNAL COMBUSTION ENGINE WITH A PLASTIC COMPONENT, FIXED BY GLUING, AND CORRESPONDING PLASTIC ACCESSORY PIECE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 07.03.2014 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.03.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 09.04.2014 [2014/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hengst SE & Co. KG Nienkamp 55-85 48147 Münster / DE | [2014/11] |
Former [2008/51] | For all designated states Hengst GmbH & Co. KG Nienkamp 55 - 85 48147 Münster / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
RÖLVER, Martin Am Stopfer 81 48329 Havixbeck / DE | 02 /
MAY, Thomas Eichhornweg 11 48565 Steinfurt / DE | 03 /
MENDEL, Frank Schulzenweg 10 48317 Drensteinfurt / DE | [2009/04] |
Former [2008/51] | 01 /
RÖLVER, Martin Dionysiusstr. 25-27 48329 Havixbeck / DE | ||
02 /
MAY, Thomas Eichhornweg 11 48565 Steinfurt / DE | |||
03 /
MENDEL, Frank Schulzenweg 10 48317 Drensteinfurt / DE | Representative(s) | Habbel, Hans-Georg Habbel & Habbel Patentanwälte Am Kanonengraben 11 48151 Münster / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/51] | Habbel, Hans-Georg Habbel & Habbel, Patentanwälte, Am Kanonengraben 11 48151 Münster / DE | Application number, filing date | 07722148.9 | 02.04.2007 | [2008/51] | WO2007DE00590 | Priority number, date | DE20062005379U | 31.03.2006 Original published format: DE 202006005379 U | DE20062006927U | 29.04.2006 Original published format: DE 202006006927 U | DE20062017242U | 09.11.2006 Original published format: DE 202006017242 U | [2008/51] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2007115543 | Date: | 18.10.2007 | Language: | DE | [2007/42] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2002105 | Date: | 17.12.2008 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.10.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/51] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 10.04.2008 | Classification | IPC: | F02F7/00 | [2008/51] | CPC: |
F02F7/0068 (EP);
F01M11/03 (EP);
F16B11/00 (EP);
F01M2011/0054 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/51] | Title | German: | VERBRENNUNGSKRAFTMASCHINE MIT EINEM DURCH VERKLEBUNG BEFESTIGTEN KUNSTSTOFF-BAUTEIL, UND DEMENTSPRECHENDES KUNSTSTOFF-ANBAUTEIL | [2008/51] | English: | INTERNAL COMBUSTION ENGINE WITH A PLASTIC COMPONENT, FIXED BY GLUING, AND CORRESPONDING PLASTIC ACCESSORY PIECE | [2008/51] | French: | MOTEUR À COMBUSTION INTERNE POURVU D'UNE PIÈCE EN PLASTIQUE FIXÉE PAR COLLAGE ET PIÈCE RAPPORTÉE EN PLASTIQUE CORRESPONDANTE | [2008/51] | Entry into regional phase | 29.09.2008 | National basic fee paid | 29.09.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.09.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.09.2008 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 29.09.2008 | Examination requested [2008/51] | 15.06.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.07.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.11.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2014/15] | 27.11.2013 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2014/15] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 15.06.2010 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.04.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.04.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 16.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.02.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.2013 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XY]WO02057611 (DOW GLOBAL TECHNOLOGIES INC [US]) [X] 1,4-12 * abstract * * page 4, lines 13-15 * * page 10, paragraph 3 - page 11, paragraph 2 * * figures 2,9,10 * [Y] 13; | [YA]FR2845142 (MANN & HUMMEL GMBH [DE]) [Y] 13 * page 1, lines 29-33 * * page 4, lines 27-31 * * claim 3 * * figure - * [A] 10-12; | [A]AU2005100072 (BRIAN INVEST PTY LTD) [A] 10 * page 16, paragraph 2 * * figure 12 *; | [A]FR2317500 (CUMMINS ENGINE CO INC [US]) [A] 10-12 * abstract * * figure - *; | [A]DE10026815 (DEUTZ AG [DE]) [A] 1 * column 3, lines 57-61 * * figures 3,4 *; | [A]DE19916985 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [A] 10-12 * abstract * * figure 1 *; | [A]EP1323569 (AMERICAN AXLE & MFG INC [US]) [A] 13 * paragraph [0028] * * figures 3-6 * |