EP2010896 - GRID SENSOR FOR THE TWO-DIMENSIONAL MEASUREMENT OF DIFFERENT COMPONENTS IN THE CROSS SECTION OF A MULTIPHASE FLOW [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.08.2019 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 21.09.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 27.05.2018 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 06.11.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.07.2021 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 25.08.2021 [2021/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Helmholtz-Zentrum Dresden - Rossendorf e.V. Bautzner Landstrasse 400 01328 Dresden / DE | [2011/09] |
Former [2009/10] | For all designated states Forschungszentrum Dresden - Rossendorf e.V. Recht und Patente Bautzner Landstrasse 400 01328 Dresden / DE | ||
Former [2009/02] | For all designated states Forschungszentrum Dresden - Rossendorf e.V. Bautzner Landstrasse 128 01328 Dresden / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DA SILVA, Marco, José R. Des. Arthur Leme 304/ Ap. 404 82510-220 Curitiba-PR / BR | 02 /
SCHLEICHER, Eckhard Reicker Strasse 40 01219 Dresden / DE | 03 /
HAMPEL, Uwe Zur Sternwarte 32 01454 Radeberg / DE | 04 /
PRASSER, Horst-Michael Hertensteinstrasse 37 CH-5415 Nussbaumen / CH | [2018/42] |
Former [2009/02] | 01 /
DA SILVA, Marco, José Am Brauhaus 10 01099 Dresden / DE | ||
02 /
SCHLEICHER, Eckhard Reicker Strasse 40 01219 Dresden / DE | |||
03 /
HAMPEL, Uwe Wilthener Strasse 4 01324 Dresden / DE | |||
04 /
PRASSER, Horst-Michael Pilgerstrasse 71 CH-5405 Dättwil / CH | Application number, filing date | 07722211.5 | 18.04.2007 | [2009/02] | WO2007DE00653 | Priority number, date | DE20061019178 | 21.04.2006 Original published format: DE102006019178 | [2009/02] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2007121708 | Date: | 01.11.2007 | Language: | DE | [2007/44] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2010896 | Date: | 07.01.2009 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.11.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/02] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2010896 | Date: | 24.10.2018 | Language: | DE | [2018/43] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 01.11.2007 | Classification | IPC: | G01N27/07, G01N33/28 | [2009/02] | CPC: |
G01N27/07 (EP,US);
G01N33/2823 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2018/43] |
Former [2009/02] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | GITTERSENSOR ZUR ZWEIDIMENSIONALEN MESSUNG VON VERSCHIEDENEN KOMPONENTEN IM QUERSCHNITT EINER MEHRPHASENSTRÖMUNG | [2009/02] | English: | GRID SENSOR FOR THE TWO-DIMENSIONAL MEASUREMENT OF DIFFERENT COMPONENTS IN THE CROSS SECTION OF A MULTIPHASE FLOW | [2009/02] | French: | DISPOSITIF POUR LA MESURE BIDIMENSIONNELLE DE DIFFÉRENTS COMPOSANTS DANS UNE SECTION TRANSVERSALE D'UN ÉCOULEMENT MULTIPHASE | [2009/02] | Entry into regional phase | 07.11.2008 | National basic fee paid | 07.11.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.11.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.11.2008 | Examination requested [2009/02] | 30.09.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.11.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.10.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.01.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.05.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.09.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 11.09.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 11.09.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 30.09.2014 | Opposition(s) | 25.07.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit [2019/40] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.04.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.04.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 02.05.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 30.04.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 30.04.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 02.05.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 02.05.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 30.04.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 12 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 18.04.2007 | CY | 24.10.2018 | CZ | 24.10.2018 | DK | 24.10.2018 | EE | 24.10.2018 | ES | 24.10.2018 | FI | 24.10.2018 | IT | 24.10.2018 | LT | 24.10.2018 | LV | 24.10.2018 | MC | 24.10.2018 | MT | 24.10.2018 | PL | 24.10.2018 | RO | 24.10.2018 | SE | 24.10.2018 | SI | 24.10.2018 | SK | 24.10.2018 | TR | 24.10.2018 | BG | 24.01.2019 | GR | 25.01.2019 | IS | 24.02.2019 | PT | 24.02.2019 | AT | 18.04.2019 | IE | 18.04.2019 | LU | 18.04.2019 | CH | 30.04.2019 | LI | 30.04.2019 | [2021/34] |
Former [2021/32] | HU | 18.04.2007 | |
CY | 24.10.2018 | ||
CZ | 24.10.2018 | ||
DK | 24.10.2018 | ||
EE | 24.10.2018 | ||
ES | 24.10.2018 | ||
FI | 24.10.2018 | ||
IT | 24.10.2018 | ||
LT | 24.10.2018 | ||
LV | 24.10.2018 | ||
MC | 24.10.2018 | ||
PL | 24.10.2018 | ||
RO | 24.10.2018 | ||
SE | 24.10.2018 | ||
SI | 24.10.2018 | ||
SK | 24.10.2018 | ||
TR | 24.10.2018 | ||
BG | 24.01.2019 | ||
GR | 25.01.2019 | ||
IS | 24.02.2019 | ||
PT | 24.02.2019 | ||
AT | 18.04.2019 | ||
IE | 18.04.2019 | ||
LU | 18.04.2019 | ||
CH | 30.04.2019 | ||
LI | 30.04.2019 | ||
Former [2021/26] | CY | 24.10.2018 | |
CZ | 24.10.2018 | ||
DK | 24.10.2018 | ||
EE | 24.10.2018 | ||
ES | 24.10.2018 | ||
FI | 24.10.2018 | ||
IT | 24.10.2018 | ||
LT | 24.10.2018 | ||
LV | 24.10.2018 | ||
MC | 24.10.2018 | ||
PL | 24.10.2018 | ||
RO | 24.10.2018 | ||
SE | 24.10.2018 | ||
SI | 24.10.2018 | ||
SK | 24.10.2018 | ||
TR | 24.10.2018 | ||
BG | 24.01.2019 | ||
GR | 25.01.2019 | ||
IS | 24.02.2019 | ||
PT | 24.02.2019 | ||
AT | 18.04.2019 | ||
IE | 18.04.2019 | ||
LU | 18.04.2019 | ||
CH | 30.04.2019 | ||
LI | 30.04.2019 | ||
Former [2020/51] | CZ | 24.10.2018 | |
DK | 24.10.2018 | ||
EE | 24.10.2018 | ||
ES | 24.10.2018 | ||
FI | 24.10.2018 | ||
IT | 24.10.2018 | ||
LT | 24.10.2018 | ||
LV | 24.10.2018 | ||
MC | 24.10.2018 | ||
PL | 24.10.2018 | ||
RO | 24.10.2018 | ||
SE | 24.10.2018 | ||
SI | 24.10.2018 | ||
SK | 24.10.2018 | ||
TR | 24.10.2018 | ||
BG | 24.01.2019 | ||
GR | 25.01.2019 | ||
IS | 24.02.2019 | ||
PT | 24.02.2019 | ||
AT | 18.04.2019 | ||
IE | 18.04.2019 | ||
LU | 18.04.2019 | ||
CH | 30.04.2019 | ||
LI | 30.04.2019 | ||
Former [2020/21] | CZ | 24.10.2018 | |
DK | 24.10.2018 | ||
EE | 24.10.2018 | ||
ES | 24.10.2018 | ||
FI | 24.10.2018 | ||
IT | 24.10.2018 | ||
LT | 24.10.2018 | ||
LV | 24.10.2018 | ||
MC | 24.10.2018 | ||
PL | 24.10.2018 | ||
RO | 24.10.2018 | ||
SE | 24.10.2018 | ||
SI | 24.10.2018 | ||
SK | 24.10.2018 | ||
TR | 24.10.2018 | ||
BG | 24.01.2019 | ||
GR | 25.01.2019 | ||
IS | 24.02.2019 | ||
PT | 24.02.2019 | ||
IE | 18.04.2019 | ||
LU | 18.04.2019 | ||
CH | 30.04.2019 | ||
LI | 30.04.2019 | ||
Former [2020/17] | CZ | 24.10.2018 | |
DK | 24.10.2018 | ||
EE | 24.10.2018 | ||
ES | 24.10.2018 | ||
FI | 24.10.2018 | ||
IT | 24.10.2018 | ||
LT | 24.10.2018 | ||
LV | 24.10.2018 | ||
MC | 24.10.2018 | ||
PL | 24.10.2018 | ||
RO | 24.10.2018 | ||
SE | 24.10.2018 | ||
SI | 24.10.2018 | ||
SK | 24.10.2018 | ||
TR | 24.10.2018 | ||
BG | 24.01.2019 | ||
GR | 25.01.2019 | ||
IS | 24.02.2019 | ||
PT | 24.02.2019 | ||
LU | 18.04.2019 | ||
CH | 30.04.2019 | ||
LI | 30.04.2019 | ||
Former [2020/11] | CZ | 24.10.2018 | |
DK | 24.10.2018 | ||
EE | 24.10.2018 | ||
ES | 24.10.2018 | ||
FI | 24.10.2018 | ||
IT | 24.10.2018 | ||
LT | 24.10.2018 | ||
LV | 24.10.2018 | ||
MC | 24.10.2018 | ||
PL | 24.10.2018 | ||
RO | 24.10.2018 | ||
SE | 24.10.2018 | ||
SI | 24.10.2018 | ||
SK | 24.10.2018 | ||
BG | 24.01.2019 | ||
GR | 25.01.2019 | ||
IS | 24.02.2019 | ||
PT | 24.02.2019 | ||
LU | 18.04.2019 | ||
CH | 30.04.2019 | ||
LI | 30.04.2019 | ||
Former [2020/04] | CZ | 24.10.2018 | |
DK | 24.10.2018 | ||
EE | 24.10.2018 | ||
ES | 24.10.2018 | ||
FI | 24.10.2018 | ||
IT | 24.10.2018 | ||
LT | 24.10.2018 | ||
LV | 24.10.2018 | ||
MC | 24.10.2018 | ||
PL | 24.10.2018 | ||
RO | 24.10.2018 | ||
SE | 24.10.2018 | ||
SI | 24.10.2018 | ||
SK | 24.10.2018 | ||
BG | 24.01.2019 | ||
GR | 25.01.2019 | ||
IS | 24.02.2019 | ||
PT | 24.02.2019 | ||
LU | 18.04.2019 | ||
Former [2020/02] | CZ | 24.10.2018 | |
DK | 24.10.2018 | ||
EE | 24.10.2018 | ||
ES | 24.10.2018 | ||
FI | 24.10.2018 | ||
IT | 24.10.2018 | ||
LT | 24.10.2018 | ||
LV | 24.10.2018 | ||
MC | 24.10.2018 | ||
PL | 24.10.2018 | ||
RO | 24.10.2018 | ||
SE | 24.10.2018 | ||
SI | 24.10.2018 | ||
SK | 24.10.2018 | ||
BG | 24.01.2019 | ||
GR | 25.01.2019 | ||
IS | 24.02.2019 | ||
PT | 24.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/50] | CZ | 24.10.2018 | |
DK | 24.10.2018 | ||
EE | 24.10.2018 | ||
ES | 24.10.2018 | ||
FI | 24.10.2018 | ||
IT | 24.10.2018 | ||
LT | 24.10.2018 | ||
LV | 24.10.2018 | ||
PL | 24.10.2018 | ||
RO | 24.10.2018 | ||
SE | 24.10.2018 | ||
SI | 24.10.2018 | ||
SK | 24.10.2018 | ||
BG | 24.01.2019 | ||
GR | 25.01.2019 | ||
IS | 24.02.2019 | ||
PT | 24.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/40] | CZ | 24.10.2018 | |
DK | 24.10.2018 | ||
EE | 24.10.2018 | ||
ES | 24.10.2018 | ||
FI | 24.10.2018 | ||
IT | 24.10.2018 | ||
LT | 24.10.2018 | ||
LV | 24.10.2018 | ||
PL | 24.10.2018 | ||
RO | 24.10.2018 | ||
SE | 24.10.2018 | ||
SK | 24.10.2018 | ||
BG | 24.01.2019 | ||
GR | 25.01.2019 | ||
IS | 24.02.2019 | ||
PT | 24.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/37] | CZ | 24.10.2018 | |
DK | 24.10.2018 | ||
EE | 24.10.2018 | ||
ES | 24.10.2018 | ||
FI | 24.10.2018 | ||
IT | 24.10.2018 | ||
LT | 24.10.2018 | ||
LV | 24.10.2018 | ||
PL | 24.10.2018 | ||
RO | 24.10.2018 | ||
SE | 24.10.2018 | ||
BG | 24.01.2019 | ||
GR | 25.01.2019 | ||
IS | 24.02.2019 | ||
PT | 24.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/35] | CZ | 24.10.2018 | |
DK | 24.10.2018 | ||
ES | 24.10.2018 | ||
FI | 24.10.2018 | ||
IT | 24.10.2018 | ||
LT | 24.10.2018 | ||
LV | 24.10.2018 | ||
PL | 24.10.2018 | ||
SE | 24.10.2018 | ||
BG | 24.01.2019 | ||
GR | 25.01.2019 | ||
IS | 24.02.2019 | ||
PT | 24.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/34] | DK | 24.10.2018 | |
ES | 24.10.2018 | ||
FI | 24.10.2018 | ||
IT | 24.10.2018 | ||
LT | 24.10.2018 | ||
LV | 24.10.2018 | ||
PL | 24.10.2018 | ||
SE | 24.10.2018 | ||
BG | 24.01.2019 | ||
GR | 25.01.2019 | ||
IS | 24.02.2019 | ||
PT | 24.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/26] | ES | 24.10.2018 | |
FI | 24.10.2018 | ||
LT | 24.10.2018 | ||
LV | 24.10.2018 | ||
PL | 24.10.2018 | ||
SE | 24.10.2018 | ||
BG | 24.01.2019 | ||
GR | 25.01.2019 | ||
IS | 24.02.2019 | ||
PT | 24.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/24] | ES | 24.10.2018 | |
FI | 24.10.2018 | ||
LT | 24.10.2018 | ||
LV | 24.10.2018 | ||
PL | 24.10.2018 | ||
SE | 24.10.2018 | ||
BG | 24.01.2019 | ||
GR | 25.01.2019 | ||
IS | 24.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/23] | ES | 24.10.2018 | |
FI | 24.10.2018 | ||
LT | 24.10.2018 | ||
LV | 24.10.2018 | ||
PL | 24.10.2018 | ||
BG | 24.01.2019 | ||
IS | 24.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/22] | FI | 24.10.2018 | |
LT | 24.10.2018 | ||
PL | 24.10.2018 | ||
BG | 24.01.2019 | ||
IS | 24.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/21] | FI | 24.10.2018 | |
LT | 24.10.2018 | ||
IS | 24.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/20] | LT | 24.10.2018 | Cited in | International search | [DX]US4644263 (JOHNSON IRVIN D [US]) [DX] 1,2,5,6 * abstract * * columns 5,6 *; | [DX]US5210499 (WALSH SHAWN M [US]) [DX] 1,2,5 * columns 5-9; figures 1,2 *; | [DA]US5287752 (DEN BOER JOHANNIS J [NL]) [DA] 1-6 * the whole document *; | [DY]DE19649011 (ROSSENDORF FORSCHZENT [DE]) [DY] 6 * column 2, lines 24-26 * * abstract *; | [XA]US6314373 (PRASSER HORST-MICHAEL [DE], et al) [X] 1 * columns 2,3; figure 3 *[A] 2-6; | [XY] - H-M PRASSER A BÖTTGER ET AL, "A new electrode-mesh tomograph for gas-liquid flows", FLOW MEASUREMENT AND INSTRUMENTATION, BUTTERWORTH-HEINEMANN, OXFORD, GB, (1998), vol. 9, ISSN 0955-5986, pages 111 - 119, XP002389213 [X] 1,2,5 * abstract * * paragraphs [0003] - [0005] * [Y] 6 |