EP2013498 - RADIAL ANTI FRICTION BEARING, IN PARTICULAR A SINGLE-ROW SPHERICAL ROLLER BEARING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 19.11.2010 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.11.2010 | Refusal of application | published on 22.12.2010 [2010/51] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Schaeffler KG Industriestrasse 1-3 91074 Herzogenaurach / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/03] | For all designated states Schaeffler KG Industriestrasse 1-3 91074 Herzogenaurach / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HOFMANN, Heinrich Altstadtstrasse 17 97422 Schweinfurt / DE | 02 /
DÖPPLING, Horst Adolf-Kolping-Strasse 9 97074 Herzogenaurach / DE | 03 /
EIDLOTH, Rainer Egkstrasse 3a 91074 Herzogenaurach / DE | 04 /
GOPPELT, Georg Hauptstrasse 8 91738 Pfofeld / DE | [2009/03] | Application number, filing date | 07722221.4 | 17.04.2007 | [2009/03] | WO2007DE00663 | Priority number, date | DE20061019230 | 26.04.2006 Original published format: DE102006019230 | [2009/03] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2007121710 | Date: | 01.11.2007 | Language: | DE | [2007/44] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2013498 | Date: | 14.01.2009 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.11.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/03] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 01.11.2007 | Classification | IPC: | F16C19/26, F16C33/36, F16C43/06 | [2009/03] | CPC: |
F16C19/26 (EP,KR,US);
F16C33/36 (EP,KR,US);
F16C43/06 (EP,KR,US);
F16C2240/30 (EP,US);
F16C2240/34 (EP,US);
F16C2240/40 (EP,US);
F16C2361/61 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/03] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | RADIALWÄLZLAGER, INSBESONDERE EINREIHIGES KUGELROLLENLAGER | [2009/03] | English: | RADIAL ANTI FRICTION BEARING, IN PARTICULAR A SINGLE-ROW SPHERICAL ROLLER BEARING | [2009/03] | French: | PALIER À ROULEMENT RADIAL, EN PARTICULIER ROULEMENT À ROULEAUX SPHÉRIQUE À RANGÉE SIMPLE | [2009/03] | Entry into regional phase | 26.11.2008 | National basic fee paid | 26.11.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.11.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.11.2008 | Examination requested [2009/03] | 16.10.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.02.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.08.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2010/51] | 16.08.2010 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2010/51] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.04.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]CH99346 (NORDISKA KULLAGERS FORSALJNING [SE]) [X] 1-4 * page 2, line 34 - line 4; figures 1,2 *; | [XA]US3620585 (ANDERSON WILLIAM J, et al) [X] 1,3 * column 2, line 26 - column 4, line 18; figures 1-5 * [A] 2,4; | [A]US2005117827 (FUJII OSAMU [JP], et al) [A] 1-4 * paragraph [0068] - paragraph [0117]; figures 1-6 *; | [E]DE102005061792 (SCHAEFFLER KG [DE]) [E] 1-4* paragraph [0020] - paragraph [0024]; figures 1-3 * |