EP2018486 - CAGE SEGMENT FOR THE CAGE OF A ROLLER BEARING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 12.04.2019 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 09.01.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.04.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 15.05.2019 [2019/20] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Schaeffler Technologies AG & Co. KG Industriestrasse 1-3 91074 Herzogenaurach / DE | [2015/10] |
Former [2014/12] | For all designated states Schaeffler Technologies GmbH & Co. KG Industriestrasse 1-3 91074 Herzogenaurach / DE | ||
Former [2012/11] | For all designated states Schaeffler Technologies AG & Co. KG Industriestrasse 1-3 91074 Herzogenaurach / DE | ||
Former [2011/28] | For all designated states Schaeffler Technologies GmbH & Co. KG Industriestrasse 1-3 91074 Herzogenaurach / DE | ||
Former [2011/28] | For all designated states Schaeffler KG Industriestrasse 1-3 91074 Herzogenaurach / DE | ||
Former [2009/05] | For all designated states Schaeffler KG Industriestrasse 1-3 91074 Herzogenaurach / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
JAUERNIG, Dieter Glockengasse 21 91074 Herzogenaurach / DE | 02 /
GRAMANN, Martina Beegstrasse 5 90518 Altdorf / DE | 03 /
ROST, Herbert Merkurstrasse 1 91074 Herzogenaurach / DE | 04 /
ZEIDLHACK, Rudolf Schleifweg 7 97440 Essleben / DE | 05 /
GEISSDÖRFER, Horst Schornweisach 152 91486 Vehlfeld / DE | [2009/05] | Application number, filing date | 07722401.2 | 10.05.2007 | [2009/05] | WO2007DE00852 | Priority number, date | DE20061022951 | 17.05.2006 Original published format: DE102006022951 | [2009/05] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2007131478 | Date: | 22.11.2007 | Language: | DE | [2007/47] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2018486 | Date: | 28.01.2009 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.11.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/05] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 26.06.2008 | Classification | IPC: | F16C19/34, F16C33/50 | [2009/05] | CPC: |
F16C33/502 (EP,US);
F16C19/34 (EP,US);
F16C33/4635 (EP,US);
F16C2208/36 (EP);
F16C2226/74 (EP,US);
F16C2300/14 (EP,US);
F16C2360/31 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/05] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | KÄFIGSEGMENT FÜR EINEN KÄFIG EINES WÄLZLAGERS | [2009/05] | English: | CAGE SEGMENT FOR THE CAGE OF A ROLLER BEARING | [2009/05] | French: | SEGMENT DE CAGE POUR UN PALIER À ROULEMENT | [2009/05] | Entry into regional phase | 25.11.2008 | National basic fee paid | 25.11.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.11.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.11.2008 | Examination requested [2009/05] | 02.11.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 12.05.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.12.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2019/20] | 10.01.2019 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2019/20] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 02.11.2010 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.05.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.05.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.05.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.05.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 02.06.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 01.06.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 31.05.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 31.05.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2018 | 12   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]US1340310 (GEORGE WOLFF) [X] 1,4-10,14,15 * the whole document *; | [X]DE1901911U (ROTHE ERDE EISENWERK [DE]) [X] 1,4-8,11,12,14,15 * the whole document *; | [XY]US4239304 (WAKUNAMI TERUAKI [JP]) [X] 1-7,12,14-16 * the whole document * [Y] 8-10; | [X]DE3928913 (TORRINGTON CO [US]) [X] 1,4-10,14 * the whole document *; | [Y]EP0392146 (SCHAEFFLER WAELZLAGER KG [DE]) [Y] 8-10 * the whole document *; | [A]DE19738331 (TORRINGTON CO [US]) [A] 12,13 * column 2, lines 55-67; claims 8-10 *; | [X]GB2333329 (COOPER ROLLER BEARINGS COMPANY [GB]) [X] 1,4-9,14,15 * page 10, paragraph L - page 11, paragraph L; figures 11-14 *; | [X]DE19856024 (SCHAEFFLER WAELZLAGER OHG [DE]) [X] 1-9,11,12,14-16 * the whole document *; | [DA]DE10246825 (SKF AB [SE]) [DA] 1,12,13* the whole document * |