EP2027266 - MULTIMER FOR IMMUNOSTIMULATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.10.2011 Database last updated on 26.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.10.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 06.11.2013 [2013/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Mologen AG Fabeckstrasse 30 14195 Berlin / DE | [2009/09] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SCHROFF, Matthias Auf dem Grat 22 14195 Berlin / DE | 02 /
WITTIG, Burghardt Salzachstr. 33 14129 Berlin / DE | 03 /
SCHMIDT, Manuel Thielallee 23 14195 Berlin / DE | 04 /
LÖHR, Janine Mainzer Str. 44 12053 Berlin / DE | [2009/09] | Representative(s) | Harrison, Robert John, et al Sonnenberg Harrison Partnerschaft mbB Postfach 33 08 65 80068 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2010/17] | Harrison, Robert John, et al 24IP Law Group Sonnenberg Fortmann Herzogspitalstraße 10a 80331 München / DE | ||
Former [2010/16] | (deleted) | ||
Former [2009/09] | Boeckh, Tobias HERTIN Anwaltssozietät Kurfürstendamm 54/55 10707 Berlin / DE | Application number, filing date | 07722435.0 | 11.05.2007 | [2009/09] | WO2007DE00887 | Priority number, date | DE20061023332 | 11.05.2006 Original published format: DE102006023332 | [2009/09] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2007131495 | Date: | 22.11.2007 | Language: | DE | [2007/47] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2027266 | Date: | 25.02.2009 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.11.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/09] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2027266 | Date: | 22.12.2010 | Language: | DE | [2010/51] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 19.06.2008 | Classification | IPC: | C12N15/11 | [2009/09] | CPC: |
A61P35/00 (EP);
C12N15/11 (KR);
C12N15/113 (US);
A61P35/02 (EP);
A61P35/04 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP);
C07H21/00 (KR);
C12N15/10 (KR);
C12N15/117 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/09] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | MULTIMER ZUR IMMUNSTIMULATION | [2009/09] | English: | MULTIMER FOR IMMUNOSTIMULATION | [2009/09] | French: | MULTIMÈRE POUR L'IMMUNOSTIMULATION | [2009/09] | Entry into regional phase | 10.12.2008 | National basic fee paid | 10.12.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.12.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.12.2008 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 10.12.2008 | Examination requested [2009/11] | 06.07.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.11.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 04.11.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 23.09.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/48] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.04.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.02.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 22.12.2010 | CZ | 22.12.2010 | EE | 22.12.2010 | FI | 22.12.2010 | HU | 22.12.2010 | IT | 22.12.2010 | LT | 22.12.2010 | LV | 22.12.2010 | MT | 22.12.2010 | PL | 22.12.2010 | RO | 22.12.2010 | SI | 22.12.2010 | SK | 22.12.2010 | TR | 22.12.2010 | BG | 22.03.2011 | GR | 23.03.2011 | IS | 22.04.2011 | LU | 11.05.2011 | BE | 31.05.2011 | MC | 31.05.2011 | [2013/45] |
Former [2013/44] | CY | 22.12.2010 | |
CZ | 22.12.2010 | ||
EE | 22.12.2010 | ||
FI | 22.12.2010 | ||
IT | 22.12.2010 | ||
LT | 22.12.2010 | ||
LV | 22.12.2010 | ||
MT | 22.12.2010 | ||
PL | 22.12.2010 | ||
RO | 22.12.2010 | ||
SI | 22.12.2010 | ||
SK | 22.12.2010 | ||
TR | 22.12.2010 | ||
BG | 22.03.2011 | ||
GR | 23.03.2011 | ||
IS | 22.04.2011 | ||
LU | 11.05.2011 | ||
BE | 31.05.2011 | ||
MC | 31.05.2011 | ||
Former [2013/25] | CY | 22.12.2010 | |
CZ | 22.12.2010 | ||
EE | 22.12.2010 | ||
FI | 22.12.2010 | ||
IT | 22.12.2010 | ||
LT | 22.12.2010 | ||
LV | 22.12.2010 | ||
MT | 22.12.2010 | ||
PL | 22.12.2010 | ||
RO | 22.12.2010 | ||
SI | 22.12.2010 | ||
SK | 22.12.2010 | ||
BG | 22.03.2011 | ||
GR | 23.03.2011 | ||
IS | 22.04.2011 | ||
LU | 11.05.2011 | ||
BE | 31.05.2011 | ||
MC | 31.05.2011 | ||
Former [2012/17] | CY | 22.12.2010 | |
CZ | 22.12.2010 | ||
EE | 22.12.2010 | ||
FI | 22.12.2010 | ||
IT | 22.12.2010 | ||
LT | 22.12.2010 | ||
LV | 22.12.2010 | ||
MT | 22.12.2010 | ||
PL | 22.12.2010 | ||
RO | 22.12.2010 | ||
SI | 22.12.2010 | ||
SK | 22.12.2010 | ||
BG | 22.03.2011 | ||
GR | 23.03.2011 | ||
IS | 22.04.2011 | ||
BE | 31.05.2011 | ||
MC | 31.05.2011 | ||
Former [2012/05] | CY | 22.12.2010 | |
CZ | 22.12.2010 | ||
EE | 22.12.2010 | ||
FI | 22.12.2010 | ||
IT | 22.12.2010 | ||
LT | 22.12.2010 | ||
LV | 22.12.2010 | ||
MT | 22.12.2010 | ||
PL | 22.12.2010 | ||
RO | 22.12.2010 | ||
SI | 22.12.2010 | ||
SK | 22.12.2010 | ||
BG | 22.03.2011 | ||
GR | 23.03.2011 | ||
IS | 22.04.2011 | ||
MC | 31.05.2011 | ||
Former [2012/03] | CY | 22.12.2010 | |
CZ | 22.12.2010 | ||
EE | 22.12.2010 | ||
FI | 22.12.2010 | ||
IT | 22.12.2010 | ||
LT | 22.12.2010 | ||
LV | 22.12.2010 | ||
PL | 22.12.2010 | ||
RO | 22.12.2010 | ||
SI | 22.12.2010 | ||
SK | 22.12.2010 | ||
BG | 22.03.2011 | ||
GR | 23.03.2011 | ||
IS | 22.04.2011 | ||
Former [2011/37] | CY | 22.12.2010 | |
CZ | 22.12.2010 | ||
EE | 22.12.2010 | ||
FI | 22.12.2010 | ||
LT | 22.12.2010 | ||
LV | 22.12.2010 | ||
PL | 22.12.2010 | ||
RO | 22.12.2010 | ||
SI | 22.12.2010 | ||
SK | 22.12.2010 | ||
BG | 22.03.2011 | ||
GR | 23.03.2011 | ||
IS | 22.04.2011 | ||
Former [2011/34] | CY | 22.12.2010 | |
FI | 22.12.2010 | ||
LT | 22.12.2010 | ||
LV | 22.12.2010 | ||
SI | 22.12.2010 | ||
BG | 22.03.2011 | ||
GR | 23.03.2011 | ||
Former [2011/29] | CY | 22.12.2010 | |
FI | 22.12.2010 | ||
LT | 22.12.2010 | ||
LV | 22.12.2010 | ||
SI | 22.12.2010 | ||
BG | 22.03.2011 | Cited in | International search | [X]WO0107055 (MOLOGEN FORSCHUNGS ENTWICKLUNG [DE], et al) [X] 1,2,4-30 * page 10, lines 9-17 * * Anspruch 11(a) Anspruch 11(b) *; | [XA]WO02060476 (MOLOGEN FORSCHUNGS ENTWICKLUNG [DE], et al) [X] 1 * page 18, lines 13-19 * * claim 6 * [A] 2,4-30; | [A] - SCHMIDT M ET AL, "Cytokine and Ig-production by CG-containing sequences with phosphorodiester backbone and dumbbell-shape", ALLERGY (OXFORD), (200601), vol. 61, no. 1, ISSN 0105-4538, pages 56 - 63, XP002461380 [A] 1,2,4-30 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1111/j.1398-9995.2005.00908.x | [A] - KRIEG ARTHUR M, "CpG motifs: The active ingredient in bacterial extracts?", NATURE MEDICINE, (200307), vol. 9, no. 7, ISSN 1078-8956, pages 831 - 835, XP002461381 [A] 1,2,4-30 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/nm0703-831 |