EP1974122 - DEVICE AND METHOD FOR PRODUCING FOUNDATION ELEMENTS IN THE GROUND [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2008/40] | DEVICE AND METHOD FOR PRODUCING SOIL STRUCTURES IN THE GROUND | ||
[2009/50] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 18.03.2011 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.10.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 06.11.2013 [2013/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states GUD Ingenieurbüro für Spezialtiefbau GmbH Dudenstrasse 78 10965 Berlin / DE | [2008/40] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SCHNEIDER, Nikolaus Dorfblick 6 14552 Wildenbruch / DE | [2010/19] |
Former [2008/40] | 01 /
SCHNEIDER, Nikolaus Dorfblick 6 14552 Wildenbruck / DE | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastrasse 30 81925 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/40] | HOFFMANN EITLE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 07722760.1 | 19.01.2007 | [2008/40] | WO2007EP00466 | Priority number, date | DE20061002838 | 20.01.2006 Original published format: DE102006002838 | [2008/40] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2007101500 | Date: | 13.09.2007 | Language: | DE | [2007/37] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1974122 | Date: | 01.10.2008 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.09.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/40] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1974122 | Date: | 12.05.2010 | Language: | DE | [2010/19] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 13.09.2007 | Classification | IPC: | E21B47/08, // E02D5/46, E21B7/18 | [2009/50] | CPC: |
E21B47/08 (EP,US);
E02D5/46 (EP,US);
E21B7/18 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2008/40] | E21B47/08 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/19] |
Former [2008/40] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUM HERSTELLEN VON BODENKÖRPERN IM UNTERGRUND | [2008/40] | English: | DEVICE AND METHOD FOR PRODUCING FOUNDATION ELEMENTS IN THE GROUND | [2009/50] | French: | DISPOSITIF ET PROCEDE POUR FABRIQUER DES ELEMENTS DE FONDATION DANS LE SOUS-SOL | [2009/50] |
Former [2008/40] | DEVICE AND METHOD FOR PRODUCING SOIL STRUCTURES IN THE GROUND | ||
Former [2008/40] | DISPOSITIF ET PROCEDE POUR FABRIQUER DES CORPS DE FONDS DANS LE SOUS-SOL | Entry into regional phase | 27.06.2008 | National basic fee paid | 27.06.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.06.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.11.2007 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 27.06.2008 | Examination requested [2008/40] | 22.01.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 30.07.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.09.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.10.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.11.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.03.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 25.03.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 15.02.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/16] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.01.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.01.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CZ | 12.05.2010 | DK | 12.05.2010 | EE | 12.05.2010 | FI | 12.05.2010 | HU | 12.05.2010 | IE | 12.05.2010 | LT | 12.05.2010 | LV | 12.05.2010 | NL | 12.05.2010 | PL | 12.05.2010 | RO | 12.05.2010 | SE | 12.05.2010 | SI | 12.05.2010 | SK | 12.05.2010 | TR | 12.05.2010 | CY | 02.06.2010 | BG | 12.08.2010 | GR | 13.08.2010 | ES | 23.08.2010 | IS | 12.09.2010 | PT | 13.09.2010 | GB | 19.01.2011 | LU | 19.01.2011 | BE | 31.01.2011 | CH | 31.01.2011 | LI | 31.01.2011 | MC | 31.01.2011 | [2013/45] |
Former [2013/44] | CZ | 12.05.2010 | |
DK | 12.05.2010 | ||
EE | 12.05.2010 | ||
FI | 12.05.2010 | ||
IE | 12.05.2010 | ||
LT | 12.05.2010 | ||
LV | 12.05.2010 | ||
NL | 12.05.2010 | ||
PL | 12.05.2010 | ||
RO | 12.05.2010 | ||
SE | 12.05.2010 | ||
SI | 12.05.2010 | ||
SK | 12.05.2010 | ||
TR | 12.05.2010 | ||
CY | 02.06.2010 | ||
BG | 12.08.2010 | ||
GR | 13.08.2010 | ||
ES | 23.08.2010 | ||
IS | 12.09.2010 | ||
PT | 13.09.2010 | ||
GB | 19.01.2011 | ||
LU | 19.01.2011 | ||
BE | 31.01.2011 | ||
CH | 31.01.2011 | ||
LI | 31.01.2011 | ||
MC | 31.01.2011 | ||
Former [2013/42] | CZ | 12.05.2010 | |
DK | 12.05.2010 | ||
EE | 12.05.2010 | ||
FI | 12.05.2010 | ||
IE | 12.05.2010 | ||
LT | 12.05.2010 | ||
LV | 12.05.2010 | ||
NL | 12.05.2010 | ||
PL | 12.05.2010 | ||
RO | 12.05.2010 | ||
SE | 12.05.2010 | ||
SI | 12.05.2010 | ||
SK | 12.05.2010 | ||
CY | 02.06.2010 | ||
BG | 12.08.2010 | ||
GR | 13.08.2010 | ||
ES | 23.08.2010 | ||
IS | 12.09.2010 | ||
PT | 13.09.2010 | ||
GB | 19.01.2011 | ||
LU | 19.01.2011 | ||
BE | 31.01.2011 | ||
CH | 31.01.2011 | ||
LI | 31.01.2011 | ||
MC | 31.01.2011 | ||
Former [2013/25] | CZ | 12.05.2010 | |
DK | 12.05.2010 | ||
EE | 12.05.2010 | ||
FI | 12.05.2010 | ||
IE | 12.05.2010 | ||
LT | 12.05.2010 | ||
LV | 12.05.2010 | ||
NL | 12.05.2010 | ||
PL | 12.05.2010 | ||
RO | 12.05.2010 | ||
SE | 12.05.2010 | ||
SI | 12.05.2010 | ||
SK | 12.05.2010 | ||
CY | 02.06.2010 | ||
GR | 13.08.2010 | ||
ES | 23.08.2010 | ||
IS | 12.09.2010 | ||
PT | 13.09.2010 | ||
GB | 19.01.2011 | ||
LU | 19.01.2011 | ||
BE | 31.01.2011 | ||
CH | 31.01.2011 | ||
LI | 31.01.2011 | ||
MC | 31.01.2011 | ||
Former [2012/01] | CZ | 12.05.2010 | |
DK | 12.05.2010 | ||
EE | 12.05.2010 | ||
FI | 12.05.2010 | ||
IE | 12.05.2010 | ||
LT | 12.05.2010 | ||
LV | 12.05.2010 | ||
NL | 12.05.2010 | ||
PL | 12.05.2010 | ||
RO | 12.05.2010 | ||
SE | 12.05.2010 | ||
SI | 12.05.2010 | ||
SK | 12.05.2010 | ||
CY | 02.06.2010 | ||
GR | 13.08.2010 | ||
ES | 23.08.2010 | ||
IS | 12.09.2010 | ||
PT | 13.09.2010 | ||
GB | 19.01.2011 | ||
BE | 31.01.2011 | ||
CH | 31.01.2011 | ||
LI | 31.01.2011 | ||
MC | 31.01.2011 | ||
Former [2011/48] | CZ | 12.05.2010 | |
DK | 12.05.2010 | ||
EE | 12.05.2010 | ||
FI | 12.05.2010 | ||
IE | 12.05.2010 | ||
LT | 12.05.2010 | ||
LV | 12.05.2010 | ||
NL | 12.05.2010 | ||
PL | 12.05.2010 | ||
RO | 12.05.2010 | ||
SE | 12.05.2010 | ||
SI | 12.05.2010 | ||
SK | 12.05.2010 | ||
CY | 02.06.2010 | ||
GR | 13.08.2010 | ||
ES | 23.08.2010 | ||
IS | 12.09.2010 | ||
PT | 13.09.2010 | ||
CH | 31.01.2011 | ||
LI | 31.01.2011 | ||
MC | 31.01.2011 | ||
Former [2011/42] | CZ | 12.05.2010 | |
DK | 12.05.2010 | ||
EE | 12.05.2010 | ||
FI | 12.05.2010 | ||
IE | 12.05.2010 | ||
LT | 12.05.2010 | ||
LV | 12.05.2010 | ||
NL | 12.05.2010 | ||
PL | 12.05.2010 | ||
RO | 12.05.2010 | ||
SE | 12.05.2010 | ||
SI | 12.05.2010 | ||
SK | 12.05.2010 | ||
CY | 02.06.2010 | ||
GR | 13.08.2010 | ||
ES | 23.08.2010 | ||
IS | 12.09.2010 | ||
PT | 13.09.2010 | ||
MC | 31.01.2011 | ||
Former [2011/25] | CZ | 12.05.2010 | |
DK | 12.05.2010 | ||
EE | 12.05.2010 | ||
FI | 12.05.2010 | ||
IE | 12.05.2010 | ||
LT | 12.05.2010 | ||
LV | 12.05.2010 | ||
NL | 12.05.2010 | ||
PL | 12.05.2010 | ||
RO | 12.05.2010 | ||
SE | 12.05.2010 | ||
SI | 12.05.2010 | ||
SK | 12.05.2010 | ||
CY | 02.06.2010 | ||
GR | 13.08.2010 | ||
ES | 23.08.2010 | ||
IS | 12.09.2010 | ||
PT | 13.09.2010 | ||
Former [2010/45] | NL | 12.05.2010 | Cited in | International search | [A]US5419405 (PATTON BOB J [US]) [A] 1-19* the whole document *; | [XY]DE19949393 (KELLER GRUNDBAU GMBH [DE]) [X] 1,2,4-7,19 * columns 3,4; figures 1,2 * [Y] 3,8-18; | [Y]DE10064187 (KELLER GRUNDBAU GMBH [DE]) [Y] 3,8-18 * paragraphs [0012] - [0032]; figure 1 *; | [A]DE10313912 (KELLER GRUNDBAU GMBH [DE]) [A] 1-19 * the whole document * |