EP1994203 - COATING A FUNCTIONAL COMPONENT WHICH IS SUBJECT TO A THERMAL LOAD AND EROSION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 26.12.2014 Database last updated on 15.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.12.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 28.01.2015 [2015/05] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states KS Aluminium-Technologie GmbH Hafenstrasse 25 74172 Neckarsulm / DE | For all designated states GELITA AG Uferstrasse 7 69412 Eberbach / DE | [2009/12] |
Former [2008/48] | For all designated states KS Aluminium-Technologie AG Hafenstrasse 25 74172 Neckarsulm / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LAUDENKLOS, Manfred Pommernstrasse 8 61137 Schöneck / DE | [2008/48] | Representative(s) | terpatent PartGmbB Partnerschaftsgesellschaft mbB Burgunderstraße 29 40549 Düsseldorf / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/04] | Patentanwälte ter Smitten Eberlein Rütten Partnerschaftsgesellschaft Burgunderstr. 29 40549 Düsseldorf / DE | ||
Former [2009/12] | Patentanwälte ter Smitten Burgunder Strasse 29 40549 Düsseldorf / DE | ||
Former [2008/48] | Thul, Hermann, et al Thul Patentanwaltsgesellschaft mbH Rheinmetall Platz 1 40476 Düsseldorf / DE | Application number, filing date | 07722820.3 | 15.02.2007 | [2008/48] | WO2007EP01301 | Priority number, date | DE20061010875 | 07.03.2006 Original published format: DE102006010875 | [2008/48] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2007101529 | Date: | 13.09.2007 | Language: | DE | [2007/37] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1994203 | Date: | 26.11.2008 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.09.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/48] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 13.09.2007 | Classification | IPC: | C23C22/74, C04B28/00, C09D5/18, F02B77/02, C23C22/34, F02F3/10 | [2008/48] | CPC: |
C23C22/74 (EP,KR,US);
C23C22/34 (EP,KR,US);
B82Y30/00 (EP,KR,US);
C04B28/008 (EP,KR,US);
C09D5/18 (EP,KR,US);
C23C22/77 (KR);
Y02P40/10 (EP,US);
Y10T428/256 (EP,US);
Y10T428/257 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
C04B28/008, C04B14/20, C04B14/327, C04B14/36, C04B20/008, C04B40/0263 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/48] | Title | German: | BESCHICHTUNG EINES THERMISCH UND EROSIV BELASTETEN FUNKTIONSBAUTEILS | [2008/48] | English: | COATING A FUNCTIONAL COMPONENT WHICH IS SUBJECT TO A THERMAL LOAD AND EROSION | [2008/48] | French: | REVETEMENT POUR UN COMPOSANT FONCTIONNEL SUBISSANT UNE CHARGE THERMIQUE ET UN PHÉNOMÈNE D'ÉROSION | [2008/48] | Entry into regional phase | 26.09.2008 | National basic fee paid | 26.09.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.09.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.09.2008 | Examination requested [2008/50] | 15.03.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.07.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.03.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.08.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2015/05] | 10.09.2014 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2015/05] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 15.03.2011 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.02.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.02.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.02.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.02.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.02.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.02.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]EP1398547 (NICHIAS CORP [JP]) [X] 1,5-7,9,18,19 * paragraphs [0009] - [0013]; example 6; claim - *; | [X]EP0358338 (ALCAN INT LTD [CA]) [X] 9-11,13-16,18,19 * page 1, line 50 - page 6, line 15; examples 1-10 *; | [X]EP1130132 (NIPPON PAINT CO LTD [JP]) [X] 9,13-15,18,19 * paragraphs [0004] - [0038]; example 6; claim - *; | [X]JP2005298837 (KANSAI PAINT CO LTD) [X] 9,12,13,17 * abstract *; | [A]GB2155497 (KAMAN SCIENCES CORP) [A] 1-19 * claim - *; | [A]DE19861003 (SUZUKI MOTOR CO [JP]) [A] 1-19 * the whole document * | by applicant | DE10124434 | DE69908837T | EP1398547 | EP0358338 | GB2155497 |