EP1984789 - ILLUMINATION SYSTEM FOR MICROLITHOGRAPHIC PROJECTION EXPOSURE APPARATUS COMPRISING AN ILLUMINATION SYSTEM OF THIS TYPE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.09.2014 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.01.2015 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 18.02.2015 [2015/08] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Carl Zeiss SMT GmbH Rudolf-Eber-Strasse 2 73447 Oberkochen / DE | [2011/10] |
Former [2008/44] | For all designated states Carl Zeiss SMT AG Rudolf-Eber-Strasse 2 73447 Oberkochen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DEGÜNTHER, Markus Langäckerweg 20 73432 Aalen / DE | 02 /
LAYH, Michael Heulenbergweg 30 73432 Aalen / DE | 03 /
GERHARD, Michael Toggenburger Strasse 15 73432 Aalen / DE | 04 /
THOME, Bruno Friedrich-Ebert-Strasse 20 73433 Aalen / DE | 05 /
SINGER, Wolfgang Egerlandstrasse 45 73431 Aalen / DE | [2008/51] |
Former [2008/44] | 01 /
DEGÜNTHER, Markus Langäckerweg 20 73432 Aalen / DE | ||
02 /
LAYH, Michael Himmlinger Weg 33 73432 Aalen / DE | |||
03 /
GERHARD, Michael Toggenburger Strasse 15 73432 Aalen / DE | |||
04 /
THOME, Bruno Friedrich-Ebert-Strasse 20 73433 Aalen / DE | |||
05 /
SINGER, Wolfgang Egerlandstrasse 45 73431 Aalen / DE | Representative(s) | Hofmann, Matthias, et al Rau, Schneck & Hübner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte PartGmbB Königstrasse 2 90402 Nürnberg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/44] | Hofmann, Matthias, et al Rau, Schneck & Hübner Patentanwälte Königstrasse 2 90402 Nürnberg / DE | Application number, filing date | 07722838.5 | 16.02.2007 | [2008/44] | WO2007EP01362 | Priority number, date | US20060774850P | 17.02.2006 Original published format: US 774850 P | US20060823296P | 23.08.2006 Original published format: US 823296 P | DE20061042452 | 09.09.2006 Original published format: DE102006042452 | DE20061061711 | 28.12.2006 Original published format: DE102006061711 | [2008/44] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2007093433 | Date: | 23.08.2007 | Language: | DE | [2007/34] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1984789 | Date: | 29.10.2008 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.08.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/44] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1984789 | Date: | 06.11.2013 | Language: | DE | [2013/45] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 23.08.2007 | Classification | IPC: | G03F7/20 | [2008/44] | CPC: |
G03F7/70075 (EP,KR,US);
G03F7/70091 (KR);
G03F7/70058 (KR,US);
G03F7/70083 (EP,KR,US);
G03F7/70108 (EP,KR,US);
G03F7/70191 (EP,KR,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, NL [2009/12] |
Former [2008/44] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | BELEUCHTUNGSSYSTEM FÜR DIE MIKRO-LITHOGRAPHIE, PROJEKTIONSBELICHTUNGSANLAGE MIT EINEM DERARTIGEN BELEUCHTUNGSSYSTEM | [2008/44] | English: | ILLUMINATION SYSTEM FOR MICROLITHOGRAPHIC PROJECTION EXPOSURE APPARATUS COMPRISING AN ILLUMINATION SYSTEM OF THIS TYPE | [2008/44] | French: | SYSTEME D'ECLAIRAGE POUR LA MICRO-LITHOGRAPHIE, EQUIPEMENT D'ECLAIRAGE PAR PROJECTION EQUIPE D'UN TEL SYSTEME D'ECLAIRAGE | [2008/44] | Entry into regional phase | 23.08.2008 | National basic fee paid | 23.08.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.08.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.08.2008 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 23.08.2008 | Examination requested [2008/44] | 18.09.2008 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 24.10.2008 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 09.01.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.03.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.08.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 05.01.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.01.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.03.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.06.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.09.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 20.09.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 09.01.2009 | Opposition(s) | 07.08.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/42] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.02.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.02.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.02.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.02.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 21.02.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FR | 28.02.2014 | [2015/08] | Cited in | International search | [A]US2001052969 (BUNAU RUDOLF VON [DE], et al) [A] 1-48 * abstract * * figure 13 *; | [Y]US2002136351 (SINGER WOLFGANG [DE]) [Y] 4,11,14,17 * abstract * * figure 1 *; | [X]WO03029875 (ZEISS CARL MICROELECTRONIC SYS [DE], et al) [X] 1,46-48 * abstract * * page 3, lines 16-20; claim 1 *; | [XY]EP1367442 (NIKON CORP [JP]) [X] 1-3,7,37,46-48 * abstract * * figures 1,3A,3B,5 * * paragraphs [0029] , [0062] * [Y] 4,11,14,17; | [A]US2005237623 (FIOLKA DAMIAN [DE], et al) [A] 1-48 * abstract * * figures 2,6,10 ** claim 1 * | by applicant | US2002136351 | WO03029875 | EP1307442 | US2004119961 | WO2005083512 | WO2006084478 |