EP1987233 - OSCILLATING PISTON MACHINE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.08.2011 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.10.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 06.11.2013 [2013/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hüttlin, Herbert Rümminger Strasse 15 79539 Lörrach / DE | [2008/45] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2008/45] | Representative(s) | Heuckeroth, Volker, et al Witte, Weller & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Postfach 10 54 62 70047 Stuttgart / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/45] | Heuckeroth, Volker, et al Witte, Weller & Partner Patentanwälte Postfach 10 54 62 70047 Stuttgart / DE | Application number, filing date | 07722888.0 | 22.02.2007 | [2008/45] | WO2007EP01512 | Priority number, date | DE20061009197 | 22.02.2006 Original published format: DE102006009197 | [2008/45] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2007096154 | Date: | 30.08.2007 | Language: | DE | [2007/35] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1987233 | Date: | 05.11.2008 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.08.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/45] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1987233 | Date: | 06.10.2010 | Language: | DE | [2010/40] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 30.08.2007 | Classification | IPC: | F01C9/00, F01C21/08 | [2008/45] | CPC: |
F01C21/0836 (EP,US);
F01B9/06 (EP,US);
F01C21/0872 (EP,US);
F01C9/005 (EP,US);
F02B53/04 (EP,US);
F01C21/089 (EP,US);
Y02T10/12 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/45] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | 13.08.2008 | MK | Not yet paid | RS | 13.08.2008 | Title | German: | SCHWENKKOLBENMASCHINE | [2008/45] | English: | OSCILLATING PISTON MACHINE | [2008/45] | French: | MACHINE À PISTONS OSCILLANTS | [2008/45] | Entry into regional phase | 13.08.2008 | National basic fee paid | 13.08.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.08.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.08.2008 | Examination requested [2008/45] | 10.11.2008 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 06.04.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.07.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 24.07.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 07.07.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/37] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.08.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.02.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 06.10.2010 | CZ | 06.10.2010 | DK | 06.10.2010 | EE | 06.10.2010 | FI | 06.10.2010 | HU | 06.10.2010 | IE | 06.10.2010 | IT | 06.10.2010 | LT | 06.10.2010 | LV | 06.10.2010 | NL | 06.10.2010 | PL | 06.10.2010 | RO | 06.10.2010 | SE | 06.10.2010 | SI | 06.10.2010 | SK | 06.10.2010 | TR | 06.10.2010 | BG | 06.01.2011 | GR | 07.01.2011 | ES | 17.01.2011 | IS | 06.02.2011 | PT | 07.02.2011 | LU | 22.02.2011 | BE | 28.02.2011 | MC | 28.02.2011 | [2013/45] |
Former [2013/44] | CY | 06.10.2010 | |
CZ | 06.10.2010 | ||
DK | 06.10.2010 | ||
EE | 06.10.2010 | ||
FI | 06.10.2010 | ||
IE | 06.10.2010 | ||
IT | 06.10.2010 | ||
LT | 06.10.2010 | ||
LV | 06.10.2010 | ||
NL | 06.10.2010 | ||
PL | 06.10.2010 | ||
RO | 06.10.2010 | ||
SE | 06.10.2010 | ||
SI | 06.10.2010 | ||
SK | 06.10.2010 | ||
TR | 06.10.2010 | ||
BG | 06.01.2011 | ||
GR | 07.01.2011 | ||
ES | 17.01.2011 | ||
IS | 06.02.2011 | ||
PT | 07.02.2011 | ||
LU | 22.02.2011 | ||
BE | 28.02.2011 | ||
MC | 28.02.2011 | ||
Former [2013/26] | CY | 06.10.2010 | |
CZ | 06.10.2010 | ||
DK | 06.10.2010 | ||
EE | 06.10.2010 | ||
FI | 06.10.2010 | ||
IE | 06.10.2010 | ||
IT | 06.10.2010 | ||
LT | 06.10.2010 | ||
LV | 06.10.2010 | ||
NL | 06.10.2010 | ||
PL | 06.10.2010 | ||
RO | 06.10.2010 | ||
SE | 06.10.2010 | ||
SI | 06.10.2010 | ||
SK | 06.10.2010 | ||
BG | 06.01.2011 | ||
GR | 07.01.2011 | ||
ES | 17.01.2011 | ||
IS | 06.02.2011 | ||
PT | 07.02.2011 | ||
LU | 22.02.2011 | ||
BE | 28.02.2011 | ||
MC | 28.02.2011 | ||
Former [2013/25] | CZ | 06.10.2010 | |
DK | 06.10.2010 | ||
EE | 06.10.2010 | ||
FI | 06.10.2010 | ||
IE | 06.10.2010 | ||
IT | 06.10.2010 | ||
LT | 06.10.2010 | ||
LV | 06.10.2010 | ||
NL | 06.10.2010 | ||
PL | 06.10.2010 | ||
RO | 06.10.2010 | ||
SE | 06.10.2010 | ||
SI | 06.10.2010 | ||
SK | 06.10.2010 | ||
BG | 06.01.2011 | ||
GR | 07.01.2011 | ||
ES | 17.01.2011 | ||
IS | 06.02.2011 | ||
PT | 07.02.2011 | ||
LU | 22.02.2011 | ||
BE | 28.02.2011 | ||
MC | 28.02.2011 | ||
Former [2012/03] | CZ | 06.10.2010 | |
DK | 06.10.2010 | ||
EE | 06.10.2010 | ||
FI | 06.10.2010 | ||
IE | 06.10.2010 | ||
IT | 06.10.2010 | ||
LT | 06.10.2010 | ||
LV | 06.10.2010 | ||
NL | 06.10.2010 | ||
PL | 06.10.2010 | ||
RO | 06.10.2010 | ||
SE | 06.10.2010 | ||
SI | 06.10.2010 | ||
SK | 06.10.2010 | ||
BG | 06.01.2011 | ||
GR | 07.01.2011 | ||
ES | 17.01.2011 | ||
IS | 06.02.2011 | ||
PT | 07.02.2011 | ||
BE | 28.02.2011 | ||
MC | 28.02.2011 | ||
Former [2012/01] | CZ | 06.10.2010 | |
DK | 06.10.2010 | ||
EE | 06.10.2010 | ||
FI | 06.10.2010 | ||
IE | 06.10.2010 | ||
LT | 06.10.2010 | ||
LV | 06.10.2010 | ||
NL | 06.10.2010 | ||
PL | 06.10.2010 | ||
RO | 06.10.2010 | ||
SE | 06.10.2010 | ||
SI | 06.10.2010 | ||
SK | 06.10.2010 | ||
BG | 06.01.2011 | ||
GR | 07.01.2011 | ||
ES | 17.01.2011 | ||
IS | 06.02.2011 | ||
PT | 07.02.2011 | ||
BE | 28.02.2011 | ||
MC | 28.02.2011 | ||
Former [2011/42] | CZ | 06.10.2010 | |
DK | 06.10.2010 | ||
EE | 06.10.2010 | ||
FI | 06.10.2010 | ||
IE | 06.10.2010 | ||
LT | 06.10.2010 | ||
LV | 06.10.2010 | ||
NL | 06.10.2010 | ||
PL | 06.10.2010 | ||
RO | 06.10.2010 | ||
SE | 06.10.2010 | ||
SI | 06.10.2010 | ||
SK | 06.10.2010 | ||
BG | 06.01.2011 | ||
GR | 07.01.2011 | ||
ES | 17.01.2011 | ||
IS | 06.02.2011 | ||
PT | 07.02.2011 | ||
MC | 28.02.2011 | ||
Former [2011/38] | CZ | 06.10.2010 | |
DK | 06.10.2010 | ||
EE | 06.10.2010 | ||
FI | 06.10.2010 | ||
IE | 06.10.2010 | ||
LT | 06.10.2010 | ||
LV | 06.10.2010 | ||
NL | 06.10.2010 | ||
PL | 06.10.2010 | ||
RO | 06.10.2010 | ||
SE | 06.10.2010 | ||
SI | 06.10.2010 | ||
SK | 06.10.2010 | ||
BG | 06.01.2011 | ||
GR | 07.01.2011 | ||
ES | 17.01.2011 | ||
IS | 06.02.2011 | ||
PT | 07.02.2011 | ||
Former [2011/36] | CZ | 06.10.2010 | |
DK | 06.10.2010 | ||
EE | 06.10.2010 | ||
FI | 06.10.2010 | ||
IE | 06.10.2010 | ||
LT | 06.10.2010 | ||
LV | 06.10.2010 | ||
NL | 06.10.2010 | ||
PL | 06.10.2010 | ||
SE | 06.10.2010 | ||
SI | 06.10.2010 | ||
SK | 06.10.2010 | ||
BG | 06.01.2011 | ||
GR | 07.01.2011 | ||
ES | 17.01.2011 | ||
IS | 06.02.2011 | ||
PT | 07.02.2011 | ||
Former [2011/35] | CZ | 06.10.2010 | |
EE | 06.10.2010 | ||
FI | 06.10.2010 | ||
IE | 06.10.2010 | ||
LT | 06.10.2010 | ||
LV | 06.10.2010 | ||
NL | 06.10.2010 | ||
SE | 06.10.2010 | ||
SI | 06.10.2010 | ||
BG | 06.01.2011 | ||
GR | 07.01.2011 | ||
ES | 17.01.2011 | ||
IS | 06.02.2011 | ||
PT | 07.02.2011 | ||
Former [2011/34] | FI | 06.10.2010 | |
IE | 06.10.2010 | ||
LT | 06.10.2010 | ||
LV | 06.10.2010 | ||
NL | 06.10.2010 | ||
SE | 06.10.2010 | ||
SI | 06.10.2010 | ||
BG | 06.01.2011 | ||
GR | 07.01.2011 | ||
ES | 17.01.2011 | ||
IS | 06.02.2011 | ||
PT | 07.02.2011 | ||
Former [2011/29] | FI | 06.10.2010 | |
LT | 06.10.2010 | ||
LV | 06.10.2010 | ||
NL | 06.10.2010 | ||
SE | 06.10.2010 | ||
SI | 06.10.2010 | ||
BG | 06.01.2011 | ||
GR | 07.01.2011 | ||
IS | 06.02.2011 | ||
PT | 07.02.2011 | ||
Former [2011/27] | FI | 06.10.2010 | |
LT | 06.10.2010 | ||
LV | 06.10.2010 | ||
NL | 06.10.2010 | ||
SE | 06.10.2010 | ||
SI | 06.10.2010 | ||
BG | 06.01.2011 | ||
IS | 06.02.2011 | ||
PT | 07.02.2011 | Cited in | International search | [DXA]WO03067033 (HUETTLIN HERBERT [DE]) [DX] 1-4,7 * figures 1-3,6,7,11,12,15-17 * * page 21, paragraph LAST - page 23, paragraph 1 * * the whole document * [A] 5,6,8-10; | [X]WO2005098202 (PERAVES AG [CH], et al) [X] 1,4 * figures 1,2,4,7 ** the whole document * |