EP1996885 - METHOD FOR DETERMINING THE POSITION AND ORIENTATION OF A MEASURING OR REPAIRING DEVICE AND AN APPARATUS OPERATING ON THE BASIS OF THE METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 13.11.2009 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.11.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 16.12.2009 [2009/51] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Refractory Intellectual Property GmbH & Co. KG Wienerbergstraße 11 1100 Wien / AT | [N/P] |
Former [2008/49] | For all designated states Refractory Intellectual Property GmbH & Co. KG Wienerbergstrasse 11 1100 Wien / AT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GRAFINGER, Helge Taisenberggasse 11A A-5020 Salzburg / AT | 02 /
KRÖLL, Christoph Almweg 45 A-6365 Kirchberg / AT | [2008/49] | Representative(s) | Riebling, Peter Patentanwalt Postfach 31 60 88113 Lindau / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/49] | Riebling, Peter Patentanwalt Postfach 31 60 88113 Lindau / DE | Application number, filing date | 07723074.6 | 07.03.2007 | [2008/49] | WO2007EP01929 | Priority number, date | DE20061013185 | 22.03.2006 Original published format: DE102006013185 | [2008/49] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2007107242 | Date: | 27.09.2007 | Language: | DE | [2007/39] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1996885 | Date: | 03.12.2008 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.09.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/49] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 27.09.2007 | Classification | IPC: | F27D21/00, C21C5/44, G01B11/02 | [2008/49] | CPC: |
F27D21/0021 (EP,US);
C21C5/441 (EP,US);
C21C5/4673 (EP,US);
F27D1/1636 (EP,US);
F27D1/1642 (EP,US);
G01B11/026 (EP,US);
G01B11/06 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/49] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR ERMITTLUNG DER POSITION UND ORIENTIERUNG EINER MESS- ODER REPARATUREINRICHTUNG UND EINE NACH DEM VERFAHREN ARBEITENDE VORRICHTUNG | [2008/49] | English: | METHOD FOR DETERMINING THE POSITION AND ORIENTATION OF A MEASURING OR REPAIRING DEVICE AND AN APPARATUS OPERATING ON THE BASIS OF THE METHOD | [2008/49] | French: | PROCEDE DE DETERMINATION DE LA POSITION ET DE L'ORIENTATION D'UN DISPOSITIF DE MESURE OU DE REPARATION ET DISPOSITIF FONCTIONNANT SELON LE PROCEDE | [2008/49] | Entry into regional phase | 26.07.2007 | National basic fee paid | 26.07.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.07.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.07.2007 | Examination requested [2008/49] | 10.02.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.06.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2009/51] | 29.07.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2009/51] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2009 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]US5212738 (CHANDE ALHAD M [US], et al) [X] 1-18 * column 3, line 28 - line 56 * * column 5, line 3 - line 10 * * column 6, line 41 - line 66 * * column 7, line 15 - column 8, line 2 * * column 11, line 53 - column 12, line 5 * * column 12, line 56 - line 65 * * column 13, line 25 - line 62 * * figures 1a-11c *; | [A]WO03081157 (REFRACTORY INTELLECTUAL PROP [AT], et al) [A] 1-18 * page 8, line 24 - page 11, line 12 ** figures 3,4 * |