EP2004631 - N-OXIDES OF HETEROCYCLIC SUBSTITUTED BISARYLUREAS FOR TREATING KINASE-MEDIATED DISEASES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 18.03.2011 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.03.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 20.04.2011 [2011/16] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Merck Patent GmbH Frankfurter Strasse 250 64293 Darmstadt / DE | [2008/52] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
JONCZYK, Alfred Scheppallee 57 64295 Darmstadt / DE | 02 /
RAUTENBERG, Wilfried Magdeburger Strasse 13 64354 Reinheim / DE | [2008/52] | Application number, filing date | 07723593.5 | 26.03.2007 | [2008/52] | WO2007EP02647 | Priority number, date | EP20060007695 | 12.04.2006 Original published format: EP 06007695 | [2008/52] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2007115670 | Date: | 18.10.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/42] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2004631 | Date: | 24.12.2008 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.10.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/52] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 18.10.2007 | Classification | IPC: | C07D401/12, C07D471/04, A61K31/435, A61K31/495, A61P35/00, A61P37/00, A61P29/00 | [2008/52] | CPC: |
C07D401/12 (EP,US);
A61P1/04 (EP);
A61P11/06 (EP);
A61P13/08 (EP);
A61P13/12 (EP);
A61P15/00 (EP);
A61P17/02 (EP);
A61P17/04 (EP);
A61P19/02 (EP);
A61P25/28 (EP);
A61P29/00 (EP);
A61P3/10 (EP);
A61P31/04 (EP);
A61P31/16 (EP);
A61P35/00 (EP);
A61P35/02 (EP);
A61P37/00 (EP);
A61P37/06 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP);
A61P9/00 (EP);
A61P9/10 (EP);
C07D471/04 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/52] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | N-OXIDE HETEROCYCLISCHER SUBSTITUIERTER BISARYLHARNSTOFFE ZUR BEHANDLUNG KINASEVERMITTELTER ERKRANKUNGEN | [2008/52] | English: | N-OXIDES OF HETEROCYCLIC SUBSTITUTED BISARYLUREAS FOR TREATING KINASE-MEDIATED DISEASES | [2008/52] | French: | N-OXYDES DE BISARYLURÉES À SUBSTITUTION HÉTÉROCYCLIQUE UTILISÉS DANS LE TRAITEMENT DE MALADIES INDUITES PAR UNE KINASE | [2008/52] | Entry into regional phase | 18.08.2008 | National basic fee paid | 18.08.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.08.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.08.2008 | Examination requested [2008/52] | 27.05.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.10.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2011/16] | 29.11.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2011/16] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.03.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2010 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]WO2005047283 (MERCK PATENT GMBH [DE], et al) [X] 1-31* Examples, claim 1 *; | [X]WO2005075425 (MERCK PATENT GMBH [DE], et al) [X] 1-31 * examples 80,89; claim 1 *; | [X]WO2005097755 (MERCK PATENT GMBH [DE], et al) [X] 1-31 * Examples; claim 1 * |