EP1984486 - LAUNDRY COMPOSITION WITH ENCAPSULATED LIQUID BENEFIT AGENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Opposition rejected Status updated on 30.09.2016 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.09.2016 | Opposition rejected | published on 02.11.2016 [2016/44] | Applicant(s) | For:CY
GB
IE
Unilever PLC Unilever House 100 Victoria Embankment London EC4Y 0DY / GB | For:AT
BE
BG
CH
CZ
DE
DK
EE
ES
FI
FR
GR
HU
IS
IT
LI
LT
LU
LV
MC
NL
PL
PT
RO
SE
SI
SK
TR
Unilever N.V. Weena 455 3013 AL Rotterdam / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2009/03] | For:CY
GB
IE
Unilever PLC Unilever House 100 Victoria Embankment London EC4Y 0DY / GB | ||
For:AT
BE
BG
CH
CZ
DE
DK
EE
ES
FI
FR
GR
HU
IS
IT
LI
LT
LU
LV
MC
NL
PL
PT
RO
SE
SI
SK
TR
Unilever N.V. Weena 455 3013 AL Rotterdam / NL | |||
Former [2008/44] | For:CY
GB
IE
Unilever PLC Unilever House Blackfriars London Greater London EC4P 4BQ / GB | ||
For:AT
BE
BG
CH
CZ
DE
DK
EE
ES
FI
FR
GR
HU
IS
IT
LI
LT
LU
LV
MC
NL
PL
PT
RO
SE
SI
SK
TR
Unilever N.V. Weena 455 3013 AL Rotterdam / NL | |||
Former [2008/32] | For:CY
GB
IE
UNILEVER PLC Unilever House, Blackfriars London, Greater London EC4P 4BQ / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BALGOBIND-NARAIN, Parmiladevie, Marianne Unilever R & D Vlaardingen B.V. Olivier van Noortlaan 120 NL-3133 AT Vlaardingen / NL | 02 /
KLUIT, Sander, Bas Hulstbes 1 2318 AS - Leiden / NL | [2009/06] |
Former [2009/02] | 01 /
BALGOBIND-NARAIN, Parmiladevie, Marianne Unilever R & D Vlaardingen B.V. Olivier van Noortlaan 120 NL-3133 AT Vlaardingen / NL | ||
02 /
KLUIT, Sander, Bas Mulatbes 1 2318 AS - Leiden / NL | |||
Former [2008/44] | 01 /
BALGOBIND-NARAIN, Parmiladevie, Marianne Unilever R & D Vlaardingen B.V. Olivier van Noortlaan 120 NL-3133 AT Vlaardingen / NL | ||
02 /
KLUIT, Sander, Bas Unilever R & D Vlaardingen B.V. Olivier van Noortlaan 120 NL-3133 AT Vlaardingen / NL | Representative(s) | van Benthum, Wilhelmus A. J. Unilever Patent Group Bronland 14 6708 WH Wageningen / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2009/52] | Kan, Jacob Hendrik Unilever Patent Group P. O. Box 137 3130 AC Vlaardingen / NL | ||
Former [2009/50] | Kan, Jacob Hendrik Unilever N.V. Unilever Patent Group P.O. Box 137 3130 AC Vlaardingen / NL | ||
Former [2009/47] | Kan, Jacob Hendrik Patent Group PO Box 317 3130 AV Vlaardingen / NL | ||
Former [2008/44] | Bristow, Stephen Robert Unilever Patent Group Colworth House Sharnbrook Bedford, MK44 1LQ / GB | Application number, filing date | 07723661.0 | 26.03.2007 | [2008/44] | WO2007EP02715 | Priority number, date | EP20060075799 | 04.04.2006 Original published format: EP 06075799 | [2008/44] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2007112891 | Date: | 11.10.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/41] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1984486 | Date: | 29.10.2008 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.10.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/44] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1984486 | Date: | 13.01.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/02] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 11.10.2007 | Classification | IPC: | C11D3/50 | [2008/44] | CPC: |
C11D3/505 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/49] |
Former [2008/44] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | WASCHMITTELSZUSAMMENSETZUNG MIT VERKAPSELTEM FLÜSSIGEM PFLEGEMITTEL | [2008/44] | English: | LAUNDRY COMPOSITION WITH ENCAPSULATED LIQUID BENEFIT AGENT | [2008/44] | French: | COMPOSITION DE LAVAGE DU LINGE COMPRENANT UN AGENT BENEFIQUE LIQUIDE EN CAPSULE | [2008/44] | Entry into regional phase | 01.08.2008 | National basic fee paid | 01.08.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 01.08.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 01.08.2008 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.08.2008 | Examination requested [2008/44] | 05.01.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.02.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.07.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.10.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 07.10.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
24.09.2010
04.10.2010
ADMISSIBLE Henkel AG & Co. KGaA Henkelstrasse 57 40589 Düsseldorf / DE | [2010/45] |
Former [2010/44] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
24.09.2010
Henkel AG & Co. KGaA Henkelstrasse 57 40589 Düsseldorf / DE Opponent's representative Korber, Frank, et al, et al Henkel AG & Co. KGaA VTP Patente 40191 Düsseldorf / DE | 22.11.2010 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 01.06.2011 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 04.12.2013 | Date of oral proceedings | 17.01.2014 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 17.01.2014 | Date of despatch of rejection of opposition | 04.07.2016 | Legal effect of rejection of opposition [2016/44] | Appeal following opposition | 18.02.2014 | Appeal received No. T0409/14 | 04.07.2016 | Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the opponent was rejected | 04.07.2016 | Date of oral proceedings | 13.07.2016 | Minutes of the oral proceedings despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.03.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 13.01.2010 | CY | 13.01.2010 | CZ | 13.01.2010 | DK | 13.01.2010 | EE | 13.01.2010 | FI | 13.01.2010 | LT | 13.01.2010 | LV | 13.01.2010 | NL | 13.01.2010 | PL | 13.01.2010 | RO | 13.01.2010 | SE | 13.01.2010 | SI | 13.01.2010 | SK | 13.01.2010 | IE | 26.03.2010 | LU | 26.03.2010 | MC | 31.03.2010 | BG | 13.04.2010 | GR | 14.04.2010 | IS | 13.05.2010 | PT | 13.05.2010 | HU | 14.07.2010 | CH | 31.03.2011 | LI | 31.03.2011 | [2015/22] |
Former [2011/26] | AT | 13.01.2010 | |
CY | 13.01.2010 | ||
CZ | 13.01.2010 | ||
DK | 13.01.2010 | ||
EE | 13.01.2010 | ||
FI | 13.01.2010 | ||
LT | 13.01.2010 | ||
LV | 13.01.2010 | ||
NL | 13.01.2010 | ||
PL | 13.01.2010 | ||
RO | 13.01.2010 | ||
SE | 13.01.2010 | ||
SI | 13.01.2010 | ||
SK | 13.01.2010 | ||
IE | 26.03.2010 | ||
MC | 31.03.2010 | ||
BG | 13.04.2010 | ||
GR | 14.04.2010 | ||
IS | 13.05.2010 | ||
PT | 13.05.2010 | ||
Former [2011/25] | AT | 13.01.2010 | |
CY | 13.01.2010 | ||
CZ | 13.01.2010 | ||
DK | 13.01.2010 | ||
EE | 13.01.2010 | ||
FI | 13.01.2010 | ||
LT | 13.01.2010 | ||
LV | 13.01.2010 | ||
NL | 13.01.2010 | ||
PL | 13.01.2010 | ||
RO | 13.01.2010 | ||
SE | 13.01.2010 | ||
SI | 13.01.2010 | ||
SK | 13.01.2010 | ||
IE | 26.03.2010 | ||
IT | 26.03.2010 | ||
MC | 31.03.2010 | ||
BG | 13.04.2010 | ||
GR | 14.04.2010 | ||
IS | 13.05.2010 | ||
PT | 13.05.2010 | ||
Former [2010/43] | AT | 13.01.2010 | |
FI | 13.01.2010 | ||
LT | 13.01.2010 | ||
LV | 13.01.2010 | ||
NL | 13.01.2010 | ||
PL | 13.01.2010 | ||
SI | 13.01.2010 | ||
IS | 13.05.2010 | ||
PT | 13.05.2010 | ||
Former [2010/30] | AT | 13.01.2010 | Cited in | International search | [A]US4536315 (RAMACHANDRAN PALLASSANNA [US], et al) [A] 1-10* column 9, line 50 - column 10, line 7; claim - *; | [A]EP0684301 (PROCTER & GAMBLE [US]) [A] 1-10 * page 2, lines 1-3 * * page 4, lines 38,39 * * example -; claim 1 *; | [DA]WO2005059083 (UNILEVER NV [NL], et al) [DA] 1-10 * page 4, lines 3-5 * * page 5, line 34 - page 6, line 2; claims 9-13 * |