EP2007634 - GLUING APPARATUS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.04.2013 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2015 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 19.08.2015 [2015/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states KHS GmbH Juchostrasse 20 44143 Dortmund / DE | [2010/30] |
Former [2009/01] | For all designated states KHS AG Juchostrasse 20 44143 Dortmund / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DECKERT, Lutz Visbystrasse 23 45721 Haltern am See / DE | 02 /
KRÄMER, Klaus Dinnendahlweg 11 44267 Dortmund / DE | 03 /
KRESS, Oliver Insterburgerweg 1 45731 Waltrop / DE | [2009/01] | Representative(s) | (deleted) | [2012/23] | Application number, filing date | 07723682.6 | 28.03.2007 | [2009/01] | WO2007EP02736 | Priority number, date | DE20061017365 | 11.04.2006 Original published format: DE102006017365 | [2009/01] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2007118582 | Date: | 25.10.2007 | Language: | DE | [2007/43] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2007634 | Date: | 31.12.2008 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.10.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/01] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2007634 | Date: | 06.06.2012 | Language: | DE | [2012/23] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 25.10.2007 | Classification | IPC: | B65C9/22 | [2009/01] | CPC: |
B65C9/2269 (EP,US);
B65C9/2247 (EP,US);
B65C2009/0075 (EP,US);
B65C2009/0078 (EP,US);
Y10T156/1768 (EP,US);
Y10T156/1798 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/01] | Title | German: | BELEIMUNGSVORRICHTUNG | [2009/01] | English: | GLUING APPARATUS | [2009/01] | French: | DISPOSITIF D'ENCOLLAGE | [2012/13] |
Former [2009/01] | Dispositif d'encollage | Entry into regional phase | 11.11.2008 | National basic fee paid | 11.11.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.11.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.11.2008 | Examination requested [2009/01] | 06.06.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.10.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.03.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.04.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 16.04.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 06.06.2011 | Opposition(s) | 07.03.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/20] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.03.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 28.03.2007 | CY | 06.06.2012 | CZ | 06.06.2012 | DK | 06.06.2012 | EE | 06.06.2012 | FI | 06.06.2012 | LT | 06.06.2012 | LV | 06.06.2012 | MT | 06.06.2012 | NL | 06.06.2012 | RO | 06.06.2012 | SE | 06.06.2012 | SI | 06.06.2012 | SK | 06.06.2012 | TR | 06.06.2012 | BG | 06.09.2012 | GR | 07.09.2012 | ES | 17.09.2012 | IS | 06.10.2012 | PT | 08.10.2012 | [2015/34] |
Former [2015/32] | CY | 06.06.2012 | |
CZ | 06.06.2012 | ||
DK | 06.06.2012 | ||
EE | 06.06.2012 | ||
FI | 06.06.2012 | ||
LT | 06.06.2012 | ||
LV | 06.06.2012 | ||
MT | 06.06.2012 | ||
NL | 06.06.2012 | ||
RO | 06.06.2012 | ||
SE | 06.06.2012 | ||
SI | 06.06.2012 | ||
SK | 06.06.2012 | ||
TR | 06.06.2012 | ||
BG | 06.09.2012 | ||
GR | 07.09.2012 | ||
ES | 17.09.2012 | ||
IS | 06.10.2012 | ||
PT | 08.10.2012 | ||
Former [2014/32] | CY | 06.06.2012 | |
CZ | 06.06.2012 | ||
DK | 06.06.2012 | ||
EE | 06.06.2012 | ||
FI | 06.06.2012 | ||
LT | 06.06.2012 | ||
LV | 06.06.2012 | ||
MT | 06.06.2012 | ||
NL | 06.06.2012 | ||
RO | 06.06.2012 | ||
SE | 06.06.2012 | ||
SI | 06.06.2012 | ||
SK | 06.06.2012 | ||
BG | 06.09.2012 | ||
GR | 07.09.2012 | ||
ES | 17.09.2012 | ||
IS | 06.10.2012 | ||
PT | 08.10.2012 | ||
Former [2013/34] | CY | 06.06.2012 | |
CZ | 06.06.2012 | ||
DK | 06.06.2012 | ||
EE | 06.06.2012 | ||
FI | 06.06.2012 | ||
LT | 06.06.2012 | ||
LV | 06.06.2012 | ||
NL | 06.06.2012 | ||
RO | 06.06.2012 | ||
SE | 06.06.2012 | ||
SI | 06.06.2012 | ||
SK | 06.06.2012 | ||
BG | 06.09.2012 | ||
GR | 07.09.2012 | ||
ES | 17.09.2012 | ||
IS | 06.10.2012 | ||
PT | 08.10.2012 | ||
Former [2013/22] | CY | 06.06.2012 | |
CZ | 06.06.2012 | ||
DK | 06.06.2012 | ||
EE | 06.06.2012 | ||
FI | 06.06.2012 | ||
LT | 06.06.2012 | ||
LV | 06.06.2012 | ||
NL | 06.06.2012 | ||
RO | 06.06.2012 | ||
SE | 06.06.2012 | ||
SI | 06.06.2012 | ||
SK | 06.06.2012 | ||
GR | 07.09.2012 | ||
ES | 17.09.2012 | ||
IS | 06.10.2012 | ||
PT | 08.10.2012 | ||
Former [2013/21] | CY | 06.06.2012 | |
CZ | 06.06.2012 | ||
DK | 06.06.2012 | ||
EE | 06.06.2012 | ||
FI | 06.06.2012 | ||
LT | 06.06.2012 | ||
LV | 06.06.2012 | ||
NL | 06.06.2012 | ||
RO | 06.06.2012 | ||
SE | 06.06.2012 | ||
SI | 06.06.2012 | ||
SK | 06.06.2012 | ||
GR | 07.09.2012 | ||
IS | 06.10.2012 | ||
PT | 08.10.2012 | ||
Former [2013/13] | CY | 06.06.2012 | |
CZ | 06.06.2012 | ||
EE | 06.06.2012 | ||
FI | 06.06.2012 | ||
LT | 06.06.2012 | ||
LV | 06.06.2012 | ||
NL | 06.06.2012 | ||
RO | 06.06.2012 | ||
SE | 06.06.2012 | ||
SI | 06.06.2012 | ||
SK | 06.06.2012 | ||
GR | 07.09.2012 | ||
IS | 06.10.2012 | ||
PT | 08.10.2012 | ||
Former [2013/10] | CY | 06.06.2012 | |
CZ | 06.06.2012 | ||
EE | 06.06.2012 | ||
FI | 06.06.2012 | ||
LT | 06.06.2012 | ||
LV | 06.06.2012 | ||
NL | 06.06.2012 | ||
RO | 06.06.2012 | ||
SE | 06.06.2012 | ||
SI | 06.06.2012 | ||
SK | 06.06.2012 | ||
GR | 07.09.2012 | ||
IS | 06.10.2012 | ||
Former [2013/09] | CY | 06.06.2012 | |
EE | 06.06.2012 | ||
FI | 06.06.2012 | ||
LT | 06.06.2012 | ||
LV | 06.06.2012 | ||
NL | 06.06.2012 | ||
SE | 06.06.2012 | ||
SI | 06.06.2012 | ||
GR | 07.09.2012 | ||
Former [2013/08] | CY | 06.06.2012 | |
FI | 06.06.2012 | ||
LT | 06.06.2012 | ||
LV | 06.06.2012 | ||
NL | 06.06.2012 | ||
SE | 06.06.2012 | ||
SI | 06.06.2012 | ||
GR | 07.09.2012 | ||
Former [2012/51] | CY | 06.06.2012 | |
FI | 06.06.2012 | ||
LT | 06.06.2012 | ||
LV | 06.06.2012 | ||
SE | 06.06.2012 | ||
SI | 06.06.2012 | ||
GR | 07.09.2012 | ||
Former [2012/50] | CY | 06.06.2012 | |
FI | 06.06.2012 | ||
LT | 06.06.2012 | ||
LV | 06.06.2012 | ||
SE | 06.06.2012 | ||
GR | 07.09.2012 | ||
Former [2012/49] | CY | 06.06.2012 | |
FI | 06.06.2012 | ||
LT | 06.06.2012 | ||
SE | 06.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/48] | FI | 06.06.2012 | |
LT | 06.06.2012 | ||
SE | 06.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/47] | LT | 06.06.2012 | Cited in | International search | [X]DE1240775 (JAGENBERG WERKE AG) [X] 1 * figure 4 *; | [X]US4347095 (YAMASHITA KYOICHI) [X] 1,2,4,5,7,8,11-16 * column 3, lines 5-11 * * column 4, lines 10-14 * * column 4, lines 34-51 * * figures 1-5 *; | [X]US4693210 (DIFRANK FRANK J [US]) [X] 1* column 5, line 65 - column 6, line 15; figures 3,5 *; | [X]US5160570 (DICKEY DANIEL M [US]) [X] 1 * figures 3,4 *; | [X]DE20220132U (KRONES AG [DE]) [X] 1 * paragraph [0016]; figure - * |