EP2004374 - DEVICE FOR BREAKING SEMICONDUCTOR WAFERS OR SIMILAR SUBSTRATES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 29.08.2014 Database last updated on 15.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.08.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 01.10.2014 [2014/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Asys Automatisierungssysteme GmbH Benzstrasse 10 89160 Dornstadt / DE | [2010/42] |
Former [2008/52] | For all designated states Dyntest Technologies GmbH Bahnhofstrasse 110 83224 Grassau / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LINDNER, Jörg Ringstrasse 38 83224 Grassau / DE | [2008/52] | Representative(s) | Grosse, Rainer Gleiss Große Schrell und Partner mbB Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte Leitzstrasse 45 70469 Stuttgart / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2010/39] | Grosse, Rainer Gleiss & Grosse Leitzstrasse 45 70469 Stuttgart / DE | ||
Former [2010/30] | (deleted) | ||
Former [2010/14] | Dosterschill, Peter, et al Patentanwalt, Fichtenstrasse 11 A 85570 Ottenhofen / DE | ||
Former [2009/40] | Petra, Elke, et al Patentanwaltskanzlei Liermann-Castell Gutenbergstrasse 12 52349 Düren / DE | ||
Former [2008/52] | Petra, Elke, et al Petra & Kollegen Patentanwälte Herzog-Ludwig-Strasse 18 85570 Markt Schwaben / DE | Application number, filing date | 07723840.0 | 30.03.2007 | [2008/52] | WO2007EP02899 | Priority number, date | DE20061015142 | 31.03.2006 Original published format: DE102006015142 | [2008/52] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2007112983 | Date: | 11.10.2007 | Language: | DE | [2007/41] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2004374 | Date: | 24.12.2008 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.10.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/52] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 11.10.2007 | Classification | IPC: | B28D5/00, C03B33/033 | [2008/52] | CPC: |
B28D5/0011 (EP);
B28D5/0023 (EP);
B28D5/0052 (EP);
C03B33/033 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/52] | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG ZUM BRECHEN VON HALBLEITERSCHEIBEN ODER ÄHNLICHEN SUBSTRATEN | [2008/52] | English: | DEVICE FOR BREAKING SEMICONDUCTOR WAFERS OR SIMILAR SUBSTRATES | [2008/52] | French: | DISPOSITIF POUR BRISER DES PLAQUETTES À SEMI-CONDUCTEURS OU DES SUBSTRATS SIMILAIRES | [2008/52] | Entry into regional phase | 31.10.2008 | National basic fee paid | 31.10.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 31.10.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 31.10.2008 | Examination requested [2008/52] | 22.11.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.04.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2014/40] | 14.05.2014 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2014/40] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 22.11.2013 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.03.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 03.07.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 04.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 16.02.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2010 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   03.07.2010 | 31.03.2014 | 08   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XY]FR2749794 (CHARIL JOSETTE [FR]) [X] 1,2,4,5 * page 1, lines 4-8 * * page 11, line 31 - page 15, line 21 * * figures 1-3,9-11 * [Y] 3; | [Y]DE10314179 (BAUMANN GMBH [DE]) [Y] 3 * page 8, column R, lines 41-51 * * figure 1 *; | [A]US6374820 (SAKAMOTO YOSHINORI [JP] ET AL) [A] 1,3,6 * column 4, lines 30-32 * * figures 1-6 *; | [A]WO03002471 (MITSUBOSHI DIAMOND IND CO LTD [JP]; WAKAYAMA HARUO [JP]; HASAKA NOBORU) [A] 1,3,6 * abstract * * figures 1-3,7,13,15,21 * |