EP2013535 - MOTOR VEHICLE HEADLAMP [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.04.2011 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.04.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 11.05.2011 [2011/19] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Bayerische Motoren Werke Aktiengesellschaft Petuelring 130 80809 München / DE | [2009/03] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ERDL, Helmut Aign 11 83569 Vogtareuth / DE | 02 /
KOLB, Norbert Bachleite 7 84184 Tiefenbach / DE | 03 /
KUHL, Patrick Brudermühlstrasse 42 81371 München / DE | 04 /
RIPPERGER, Joachim Gartenstrasse 5 85774 Unterföhring / DE | 05 /
AULBACH, Johannes Samhofstrasse 12A 85293 Reichertshausen Grafing / DE | 06 /
ENDERS, Martin Unterfeld 25 82041 Deisenhofen / DE | [2009/03] | Representative(s) | Mayer-Martin, Christian Bayerische Motoren Werke AG Patentabteilung AJ-5 80788 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/03] | Mayer-Martin, Christian Bayerische Motorenwerke AG Patentabteilung AJ-3 D-80788 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 07723957.2 | 04.04.2007 | [2009/03] | WO2007EP03016 | Priority number, date | DE20061019735 | 28.04.2006 Original published format: DE102006019735 | [2009/03] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2007124836 | Date: | 08.11.2007 | Language: | DE | [2007/45] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2013535 | Date: | 14.01.2009 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.11.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/03] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2013535 | Date: | 02.06.2010 | Language: | DE | [2010/22] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 08.11.2007 | Classification | IPC: | F21S8/10 | [2009/03] | CPC: |
F21V9/04 (EP,US);
F21S41/141 (EP,US);
F21S41/143 (EP,US);
F21S41/172 (EP,US);
F21S41/683 (EP);
F21Y2113/00 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2009/51] |
Former [2009/03] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | KRAFTFAHRZEUGSCHEINWERFER | [2009/03] | English: | MOTOR VEHICLE HEADLAMP | [2009/03] | French: | PHARE DE VÉHICULE AUTOMOBILE | [2009/03] | Entry into regional phase | 30.08.2008 | National basic fee paid | 30.08.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.08.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.08.2008 | Examination requested [2009/03] | 17.03.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.07.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.11.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.02.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 26.02.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 03.03.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/19] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.04.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.04.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XY]EP1160506 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [X] 1,6-8,11 * paragraph [0003] - paragraph [0016]; figures 1-3 * [Y] 2,10; | [XA]EP1191279 (HELLA KG HUECK & CO [DE]) [X] 1,6,7,11 * paragraph [0004] - paragraph [0028]; figures 1-6 * [A] 9; | [YA]US2003223246 (ALBOU PIERRE [FR]) [Y] 2,10 * paragraph [0027] - paragraph [0079]; figures 1-5 *[A] 1,3-5 |