EP2015860 - PROCESS FOR THE REMOVAL OF HYDROGEN CYANIDE AND FORMIC ACID FROM SYNTHESIS GAS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.04.2012 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.07.2014 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 20.08.2014 [2014/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Haldor Topso̸e A/S Nymo̸llevej 55 2800 Kgs. Lyngby / DK | [N/P] |
Former [2009/04] | For all designated states Haldor Topsoe A/S Nymollevej 55 2800 Kgs. Lyngby / DK | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PEDERSEN, Karsten Julsovej 6 8600 Silkeborg / DK | 02 /
DYBKJAER, Ib Klerkegade 25 B 1308 Copenhagen K / DK | 03 /
NIELSEN, Poul, Erik, Ho̸jlund Rolandsvej 3 3480 Fredensborg / DK | 04 /
NERLOV, Jesper Storkekrogen 20 3500 Vaerlose / DK | [2009/04] | Application number, filing date | 07724334.3 | 18.04.2007 | [2009/04] | WO2007EP03397 | Priority number, date | DK20060000606 | 28.04.2006 Original published format: DK 200600606 | [2009/04] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2007124865 | Date: | 08.11.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/45] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2015860 | Date: | 21.01.2009 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.11.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/04] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2015860 | Date: | 22.06.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/25] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 08.11.2007 | Classification | IPC: | B01D53/86, C10K1/34 | [2009/04] | CPC: |
B01J23/50 (EP,US);
B01D53/8671 (EP,US);
B01D53/8681 (EP,US);
B01J23/44 (EP,US);
B01J23/63 (EP,US);
B01J23/6525 (EP,US);
B01J23/66 (EP,US);
B01J35/56 (EP,US);
C01B3/58 (EP,US);
C10K1/34 (EP,US);
B01D2255/1023 (EP,US);
B01D2255/104 (EP,US);
B01D2255/106 (EP,US);
B01D2255/206 (EP,US);
B01D2255/20761 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/04] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUM ENTFERNEN VON WASSERSTOFFCYANID UND AMEISENSÄURE AUS SYNTHESEGAS | [2009/04] | English: | PROCESS FOR THE REMOVAL OF HYDROGEN CYANIDE AND FORMIC ACID FROM SYNTHESIS GAS | [2009/04] | French: | PROCÉDÉ D'ÉLIMINATION DE CYANURE D'HYDROGÈNE ET D'ACIDE FORMIQUE À PARTIR DE GAZ DE SYNTHÈSE | [2009/04] | Entry into regional phase | 28.11.2008 | National basic fee paid | 28.11.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.11.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.02.2008 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 28.11.2008 | Examination requested [2009/04] | 30.11.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.03.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.01.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.05.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 06.05.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 30.11.2009 | Opposition(s) | 23.03.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/22] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.04.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.04.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.04.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 18.04.2007 | AT | 22.06.2011 | BE | 22.06.2011 | CY | 22.06.2011 | CZ | 22.06.2011 | DK | 22.06.2011 | EE | 22.06.2011 | FI | 22.06.2011 | IT | 22.06.2011 | LT | 22.06.2011 | LV | 22.06.2011 | MT | 22.06.2011 | PL | 22.06.2011 | RO | 22.06.2011 | SE | 22.06.2011 | SI | 22.06.2011 | SK | 22.06.2011 | TR | 22.06.2011 | BG | 22.09.2011 | GR | 23.09.2011 | ES | 03.10.2011 | IS | 22.10.2011 | PT | 24.10.2011 | [2014/34] |
Former [2014/21] | AT | 22.06.2011 | |
BE | 22.06.2011 | ||
CY | 22.06.2011 | ||
CZ | 22.06.2011 | ||
DK | 22.06.2011 | ||
EE | 22.06.2011 | ||
FI | 22.06.2011 | ||
IT | 22.06.2011 | ||
LT | 22.06.2011 | ||
LV | 22.06.2011 | ||
MT | 22.06.2011 | ||
PL | 22.06.2011 | ||
RO | 22.06.2011 | ||
SE | 22.06.2011 | ||
SI | 22.06.2011 | ||
SK | 22.06.2011 | ||
TR | 22.06.2011 | ||
BG | 22.09.2011 | ||
GR | 23.09.2011 | ||
ES | 03.10.2011 | ||
IS | 22.10.2011 | ||
PT | 24.10.2011 | ||
Former [2013/35] | AT | 22.06.2011 | |
BE | 22.06.2011 | ||
CY | 22.06.2011 | ||
CZ | 22.06.2011 | ||
DK | 22.06.2011 | ||
EE | 22.06.2011 | ||
FI | 22.06.2011 | ||
IT | 22.06.2011 | ||
LT | 22.06.2011 | ||
LV | 22.06.2011 | ||
MT | 22.06.2011 | ||
PL | 22.06.2011 | ||
RO | 22.06.2011 | ||
SE | 22.06.2011 | ||
SI | 22.06.2011 | ||
SK | 22.06.2011 | ||
BG | 22.09.2011 | ||
GR | 23.09.2011 | ||
ES | 03.10.2011 | ||
IS | 22.10.2011 | ||
PT | 24.10.2011 | ||
Former [2013/29] | AT | 22.06.2011 | |
BE | 22.06.2011 | ||
CY | 22.06.2011 | ||
CZ | 22.06.2011 | ||
DK | 22.06.2011 | ||
EE | 22.06.2011 | ||
FI | 22.06.2011 | ||
IT | 22.06.2011 | ||
LT | 22.06.2011 | ||
LV | 22.06.2011 | ||
PL | 22.06.2011 | ||
RO | 22.06.2011 | ||
SE | 22.06.2011 | ||
SI | 22.06.2011 | ||
SK | 22.06.2011 | ||
BG | 22.09.2011 | ||
GR | 23.09.2011 | ||
ES | 03.10.2011 | ||
IS | 22.10.2011 | ||
PT | 24.10.2011 | ||
Former [2013/22] | AT | 22.06.2011 | |
BE | 22.06.2011 | ||
CY | 22.06.2011 | ||
CZ | 22.06.2011 | ||
DK | 22.06.2011 | ||
EE | 22.06.2011 | ||
FI | 22.06.2011 | ||
IT | 22.06.2011 | ||
LT | 22.06.2011 | ||
LV | 22.06.2011 | ||
PL | 22.06.2011 | ||
RO | 22.06.2011 | ||
SE | 22.06.2011 | ||
SI | 22.06.2011 | ||
SK | 22.06.2011 | ||
GR | 23.09.2011 | ||
ES | 03.10.2011 | ||
IS | 22.10.2011 | ||
PT | 24.10.2011 | ||
Former [2012/31] | AT | 22.06.2011 | |
BE | 22.06.2011 | ||
CY | 22.06.2011 | ||
CZ | 22.06.2011 | ||
DK | 22.06.2011 | ||
EE | 22.06.2011 | ||
FI | 22.06.2011 | ||
IT | 22.06.2011 | ||
LT | 22.06.2011 | ||
LV | 22.06.2011 | ||
PL | 22.06.2011 | ||
RO | 22.06.2011 | ||
SE | 22.06.2011 | ||
SI | 22.06.2011 | ||
SK | 22.06.2011 | ||
GR | 23.09.2011 | ||
IS | 22.10.2011 | ||
PT | 24.10.2011 | ||
Former [2012/24] | AT | 22.06.2011 | |
BE | 22.06.2011 | ||
CY | 22.06.2011 | ||
CZ | 22.06.2011 | ||
EE | 22.06.2011 | ||
FI | 22.06.2011 | ||
IT | 22.06.2011 | ||
LT | 22.06.2011 | ||
LV | 22.06.2011 | ||
PL | 22.06.2011 | ||
RO | 22.06.2011 | ||
SE | 22.06.2011 | ||
SI | 22.06.2011 | ||
SK | 22.06.2011 | ||
GR | 23.09.2011 | ||
IS | 22.10.2011 | ||
PT | 24.10.2011 | ||
Former [2012/11] | AT | 22.06.2011 | |
BE | 22.06.2011 | ||
CY | 22.06.2011 | ||
CZ | 22.06.2011 | ||
EE | 22.06.2011 | ||
FI | 22.06.2011 | ||
LT | 22.06.2011 | ||
LV | 22.06.2011 | ||
PL | 22.06.2011 | ||
RO | 22.06.2011 | ||
SE | 22.06.2011 | ||
SI | 22.06.2011 | ||
SK | 22.06.2011 | ||
GR | 23.09.2011 | ||
IS | 22.10.2011 | ||
PT | 24.10.2011 | ||
Former [2012/05] | AT | 22.06.2011 | |
BE | 22.06.2011 | ||
CY | 22.06.2011 | ||
FI | 22.06.2011 | ||
LT | 22.06.2011 | ||
LV | 22.06.2011 | ||
SE | 22.06.2011 | ||
SI | 22.06.2011 | ||
GR | 23.09.2011 | ||
Former [2011/52] | AT | 22.06.2011 | |
CY | 22.06.2011 | ||
FI | 22.06.2011 | ||
LT | 22.06.2011 | ||
LV | 22.06.2011 | ||
SE | 22.06.2011 | ||
SI | 22.06.2011 | ||
GR | 23.09.2011 | ||
Former [2011/50] | CY | 22.06.2011 | |
FI | 22.06.2011 | ||
LT | 22.06.2011 | ||
LV | 22.06.2011 | ||
SE | 22.06.2011 | ||
SI | 22.06.2011 | ||
GR | 23.09.2011 | ||
Former [2011/49] | CY | 22.06.2011 | |
FI | 22.06.2011 | ||
LT | 22.06.2011 | ||
SE | 22.06.2011 | ||
GR | 23.09.2011 | ||
Former [2011/48] | LT | 22.06.2011 | |
SE | 22.06.2011 | Cited in | International search | [A]FR2398107 (BASF AG [DE]) [A] 1-16,1-16,1-16 * page 1, lines 1-6 * * page 4, lines 14-33 * * page 5, lines 5-29 * * page 1, lines 1-6 * * page 4, lines 14-33 * * page 5, lines 5-29 * * page 1, lines 1-6 * * page 4, lines 14-33 * * page 5, lines 5-29 *; | [X]US4521387 (BROECKER FRANZ J [DE], et al) [X] 1-3,6-12,1-3,6-12,1-3,6-12 * abstract * * column 1, lines 5-16 * * column 2, lines 1-57 * * column 3, lines 2-51 * * abstract * * column 1, lines 5-16 * * column 2, lines 1-57 * * column 3, lines 2-51 * * abstract * * column 1, lines 5-16 * * column 2, lines 1-57 * * column 3, lines 2-51 *; | [A]US4810475 (CHU HUMBERT H [US], et al) [A] 1-16,1-16,1-16 * abstract * * column 1, lines 7-36 * * abstract * * column 1, lines 7-36 * * abstract ** column 1, lines 7-36 *; | [X]EP1034832 (SAMSUNG ELECTRO MECH [KR]) [X] 12-15,12-15,12-15 * abstract * * paragraphs [0050] , [0051] * * abstract * * paragraphs [0050] , [0051] * * abstract * * paragraphs [0050] , [0051] *; | [X]US2004175327 (HAGEMEYER ALFRED [US], et al) [X] 12-16,12-16,12-16 * abstract * * paragraphs [0075] - [0081] - [0202]; examples 1,2,6-9 * * abstract * * paragraphs [0075] - [0081] - [0202]; examples 1,2,6-9 * * abstract * * paragraphs [0075] - [0081] - [0202]; examples 1,2,6-9 *; | [X]WO2005063384 (NISSAN MOTOR [JP], et al) [X] 12-16,12-16,12-16 * abstract * * page 8, lines 4-24 * * page 10, lines 12-20 * * examples 1,3,7 * * abstract * * page 8, lines 4-24 * * page 10, lines 12-20 * * examples 1,3,7 * * abstract * * page 8, lines 4-24 * * page 10, lines 12-20 * * examples 1,3,7 *; | [X] - HICKEY N ET AL, "Improvement of SOx-Resistance of Silver Lean-DeNOx Catalysts by Supporting on CeO2-Containing Zirconia", JOURNAL OF CATALYSIS, ACADEMIC PRESS, DULUTH, MN, US, (20020701), vol. 209, no. 1, ISSN 0021-9517, pages 271 - 274, XP004468872 [X] 12-16,12-16,12-16 * abstract * * page 271 * * abstract * * page 271 * * abstract * * page 271 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1006/jcat.2002.3614 |