EP2010687 - HARD METAL BODY AND METHOD FOR PRODUCING THE SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2009/02] | METHOD FOR PRODUCING A HARD METAL BODY, POWDER FOR PRODUCING A HARD METAL AND HARD METAL BODY | ||
[2012/38] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.04.2014 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.07.2016 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 17.08.2016 [2016/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TUTEC GmbH Schwendergasse 17/1 1150 Wien / AT | [2009/04] |
Former [2009/02] | For all designated states Treibacher Industrie AG Auer-Welsbach-Strasse 1 9330 Althofen / AT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LENGAUER, Walter Weinberggasse 12 A-2100 Leobendorf / AT | [2009/02] | Representative(s) | Vomberg, Friedhelm Patentanwalt Schulstrasse 8 42653 Solingen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/23] | Vomberg, Friedhelm Patentanwalt, Schulstrasse 8 42653 Solingen / DE | ||
Former [2009/04] | Vomberg, Friedhelm Patentanwalt, Schulstrasse 8 42653 Solingen / DE | ||
Former [2009/02] | Vomberg, Friedhelm Schulstrasse 8 D-42653 Solingen / DE | Application number, filing date | 07724394.7 | 20.04.2007 | [2009/02] | WO2007EP03457 | Priority number, date | DE20061018947 | 24.04.2006 Original published format: DE102006018947 | [2009/02] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2007121931 | Date: | 01.11.2007 | Language: | DE | [2007/44] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2010687 | Date: | 07.01.2009 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.11.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/02] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2010687 | Date: | 05.06.2013 | Language: | DE | [2013/23] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 06.03.2008 | Classification | IPC: | C22C29/08, B22F3/10, C22C1/05, B22F3/15 | [2013/15] | CPC: |
C22C29/08 (EP);
B22F3/1007 (EP);
B22F3/15 (EP);
C22C1/053 (EP);
B22F2005/001 (EP);
B22F2999/00 (EP)
| C-Set: |
B22F2999/00, B22F3/1007, B22F2201/02 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2009/02] | C22C29/08 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/02] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | HARTMETALLKÖRPER UND VERFAHREN ZU DESSEN HERSTELLUNG | [2012/38] | English: | HARD METAL BODY AND METHOD FOR PRODUCING THE SAME | [2012/38] | French: | CORPS EN MÉTAL DUR ET PROCÉDÉ DE SON PRODUCTION | [2012/38] |
Former [2009/02] | HARTMETALLKÖRPER, DER AUS EINER MISCHUNG GEBILDET IST, DIE EINE WOLFRAM-COBALT-KOHLENSTOFF-PHASE ENTHÄLT | ||
Former [2009/02] | METHOD FOR PRODUCING A HARD METAL BODY, POWDER FOR PRODUCING A HARD METAL AND HARD METAL BODY | ||
Former [2009/02] | PROCÉDÉ DE PRODUCTION D'UN CORPS EN MÉTAL DUR, POUDRE SERVANT À LA PRODUCTION D'UN MÉTAL DUR ET CORPS EN MÉTAL DUR | Entry into regional phase | 11.11.2008 | National basic fee paid | 11.11.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.11.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.02.2008 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 11.11.2008 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 11.11.2008 | Examination requested [2009/02] | 04.03.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.05.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.11.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 12.12.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.09.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.11.2012 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 27.11.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 27.11.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 08.04.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 04.03.2009 | Opposition(s) | 06.03.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/20] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.02.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.02.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 04.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.04.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 24.04.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 20.04.2007 | CY | 05.06.2013 | CZ | 05.06.2013 | DK | 05.06.2013 | EE | 05.06.2013 | FI | 05.06.2013 | IT | 05.06.2013 | LT | 05.06.2013 | LV | 05.06.2013 | MC | 05.06.2013 | MT | 05.06.2013 | NL | 05.06.2013 | PL | 05.06.2013 | RO | 05.06.2013 | SE | 05.06.2013 | SI | 05.06.2013 | SK | 05.06.2013 | TR | 05.06.2013 | BG | 05.09.2013 | GR | 06.09.2013 | ES | 16.09.2013 | IS | 05.10.2013 | PT | 07.10.2013 | [2016/33] |
Former [2016/32] | HU | 20.04.2007 | |
CY | 05.06.2013 | ||
CZ | 05.06.2013 | ||
DK | 05.06.2013 | ||
EE | 05.06.2013 | ||
FI | 05.06.2013 | ||
IT | 05.06.2013 | ||
LT | 05.06.2013 | ||
LV | 05.06.2013 | ||
MC | 05.06.2013 | ||
MT | 05.06.2013 | ||
NL | 05.06.2013 | ||
PL | 05.06.2013 | ||
RO | 05.06.2013 | ||
SE | 05.06.2013 | ||
SI | 05.06.2013 | ||
SK | 05.06.2013 | ||
BG | 05.09.2013 | ||
GR | 06.09.2013 | ||
ES | 16.09.2013 | ||
IS | 05.10.2013 | ||
PT | 07.10.2013 | ||
Former [2016/31] | CY | 05.06.2013 | |
CZ | 05.06.2013 | ||
DK | 05.06.2013 | ||
EE | 05.06.2013 | ||
FI | 05.06.2013 | ||
IT | 05.06.2013 | ||
LT | 05.06.2013 | ||
LV | 05.06.2013 | ||
MC | 05.06.2013 | ||
MT | 05.06.2013 | ||
NL | 05.06.2013 | ||
PL | 05.06.2013 | ||
RO | 05.06.2013 | ||
SE | 05.06.2013 | ||
SI | 05.06.2013 | ||
SK | 05.06.2013 | ||
BG | 05.09.2013 | ||
GR | 06.09.2013 | ||
ES | 16.09.2013 | ||
IS | 05.10.2013 | ||
PT | 07.10.2013 | ||
Former [2016/16] | CZ | 05.06.2013 | |
DK | 05.06.2013 | ||
EE | 05.06.2013 | ||
FI | 05.06.2013 | ||
IT | 05.06.2013 | ||
LT | 05.06.2013 | ||
LV | 05.06.2013 | ||
MC | 05.06.2013 | ||
MT | 05.06.2013 | ||
NL | 05.06.2013 | ||
PL | 05.06.2013 | ||
RO | 05.06.2013 | ||
SE | 05.06.2013 | ||
SI | 05.06.2013 | ||
SK | 05.06.2013 | ||
BG | 05.09.2013 | ||
GR | 06.09.2013 | ||
ES | 16.09.2013 | ||
IS | 05.10.2013 | ||
PT | 07.10.2013 | ||
Former [2014/52] | CZ | 05.06.2013 | |
DK | 05.06.2013 | ||
EE | 05.06.2013 | ||
FI | 05.06.2013 | ||
IT | 05.06.2013 | ||
LT | 05.06.2013 | ||
LV | 05.06.2013 | ||
MC | 05.06.2013 | ||
NL | 05.06.2013 | ||
PL | 05.06.2013 | ||
RO | 05.06.2013 | ||
SE | 05.06.2013 | ||
SI | 05.06.2013 | ||
SK | 05.06.2013 | ||
BG | 05.09.2013 | ||
GR | 06.09.2013 | ||
ES | 16.09.2013 | ||
IS | 05.10.2013 | ||
PT | 07.10.2013 | ||
Former [2014/24] | CZ | 05.06.2013 | |
DK | 05.06.2013 | ||
EE | 05.06.2013 | ||
FI | 05.06.2013 | ||
IT | 05.06.2013 | ||
LT | 05.06.2013 | ||
LV | 05.06.2013 | ||
NL | 05.06.2013 | ||
PL | 05.06.2013 | ||
RO | 05.06.2013 | ||
SE | 05.06.2013 | ||
SI | 05.06.2013 | ||
SK | 05.06.2013 | ||
BG | 05.09.2013 | ||
GR | 06.09.2013 | ||
ES | 16.09.2013 | ||
IS | 05.10.2013 | ||
PT | 07.10.2013 | ||
Former [2014/21] | CZ | 05.06.2013 | |
DK | 05.06.2013 | ||
EE | 05.06.2013 | ||
FI | 05.06.2013 | ||
LT | 05.06.2013 | ||
LV | 05.06.2013 | ||
NL | 05.06.2013 | ||
PL | 05.06.2013 | ||
RO | 05.06.2013 | ||
SE | 05.06.2013 | ||
SI | 05.06.2013 | ||
SK | 05.06.2013 | ||
BG | 05.09.2013 | ||
GR | 06.09.2013 | ||
ES | 16.09.2013 | ||
IS | 05.10.2013 | ||
PT | 07.10.2013 | ||
Former [2014/14] | CZ | 05.06.2013 | |
EE | 05.06.2013 | ||
FI | 05.06.2013 | ||
LT | 05.06.2013 | ||
LV | 05.06.2013 | ||
NL | 05.06.2013 | ||
PL | 05.06.2013 | ||
RO | 05.06.2013 | ||
SE | 05.06.2013 | ||
SI | 05.06.2013 | ||
SK | 05.06.2013 | ||
BG | 05.09.2013 | ||
GR | 06.09.2013 | ||
ES | 16.09.2013 | ||
IS | 05.10.2013 | ||
PT | 07.10.2013 | ||
Former [2014/11] | CZ | 05.06.2013 | |
EE | 05.06.2013 | ||
FI | 05.06.2013 | ||
LT | 05.06.2013 | ||
LV | 05.06.2013 | ||
PL | 05.06.2013 | ||
RO | 05.06.2013 | ||
SE | 05.06.2013 | ||
SI | 05.06.2013 | ||
SK | 05.06.2013 | ||
BG | 05.09.2013 | ||
GR | 06.09.2013 | ||
ES | 16.09.2013 | ||
IS | 05.10.2013 | ||
PT | 07.10.2013 | ||
Former [2014/10] | CZ | 05.06.2013 | |
EE | 05.06.2013 | ||
FI | 05.06.2013 | ||
LT | 05.06.2013 | ||
LV | 05.06.2013 | ||
PL | 05.06.2013 | ||
SE | 05.06.2013 | ||
SI | 05.06.2013 | ||
SK | 05.06.2013 | ||
BG | 05.09.2013 | ||
GR | 06.09.2013 | ||
ES | 16.09.2013 | ||
IS | 05.10.2013 | ||
PT | 07.10.2013 | ||
Former [2014/08] | FI | 05.06.2013 | |
LT | 05.06.2013 | ||
LV | 05.06.2013 | ||
PL | 05.06.2013 | ||
SE | 05.06.2013 | ||
SI | 05.06.2013 | ||
BG | 05.09.2013 | ||
GR | 06.09.2013 | ||
ES | 16.09.2013 | ||
PT | 07.10.2013 | ||
Former [2014/02] | FI | 05.06.2013 | |
LT | 05.06.2013 | ||
LV | 05.06.2013 | ||
PL | 05.06.2013 | ||
SE | 05.06.2013 | ||
SI | 05.06.2013 | ||
BG | 05.09.2013 | ||
GR | 06.09.2013 | ||
ES | 16.09.2013 | ||
Former [2013/50] | FI | 05.06.2013 | |
LT | 05.06.2013 | ||
PL | 05.06.2013 | ||
SE | 05.06.2013 | ||
SI | 05.06.2013 | ||
BG | 05.09.2013 | ||
GR | 06.09.2013 | ||
ES | 16.09.2013 | ||
Former [2013/49] | FI | 05.06.2013 | |
LT | 05.06.2013 | ||
SE | 05.06.2013 | ||
SI | 05.06.2013 | ||
GR | 06.09.2013 | ||
ES | 16.09.2013 | ||
Former [2013/48] | LT | 05.06.2013 | |
ES | 16.09.2013 | ||
Former [2013/47] | LT | 05.06.2013 | Cited in | International search | [X]US4649084 (HALE THOMAS E [US] ET AL) [X] 1-19 * abstract * * column 3, line 65 - column 4, line 38 * * column 5, lines 1-3 * * column 6, line 54 - line 61 *; | [A]US3971656 (RUDY ERWIN) [A] 1-19 * the whole document *; | [A]EP0763605 (NANODYNE INC [US]; UNIV RUTGERS [US]) [A] 1-19 * the whole document *; | [A]WO2004007784 (BOART HWF GMBH CO KG [DE]; KONYASHIN IGOR [DE] BOART HWF GMBH CO KG [D) [A] 1-19 * the whole document *; | [A]US2005000317 (LIANG DAH-BEN [US] ET AL) [A] 1-19 * the whole document *; | [A]DE4340652 (KRUPP WIDIA GMBH [DE] WIDIA GMBH [DE]) [A] 1-19 * the whole document *; | [A]GB2095702 (KENNAMETAL INC) [A] 1-19 * the whole document *; | [A]US2005072269 (BANERJEE DEBANGSHU [US]) [A] 1-19 * the whole document * |