|
14.12.2022 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
38 |
|
09.12.2022 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.12.2022 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure - 01 |
Opposition |
2 |
|
09.12.2022 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure - 02 |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.12.2022 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure - 03 |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.12.2022 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure - 04 |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.12.2022 |
Citation in opposition procedure - 010 |
Opposition |
2 |
|
09.12.2022 |
Consolidated list of cited opposition documents |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.12.2022 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.12.2022 |
Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition |
Opposition |
37 |
|
08.08.2022 |
Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.08.2022 |
Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) |
Opposition |
2 |
|
28.07.2022 |
Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor |
Opposition |
27 |
|
25.07.2022 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
2 |
|
25.07.2022 |
Citation in opposition procedure - 001 |
Opposition |
90 |
|
25.07.2022 |
Citation in opposition procedure - 002 |
Opposition |
3 |
|
25.07.2022 |
Citation in opposition procedure - 002 |
Opposition |
5 |
|
25.07.2022 |
Citation in opposition procedure - 003 |
Opposition |
10 |
|
25.07.2022 |
Citation in opposition procedure - 004 |
Opposition |
11 |
|
25.07.2022 |
Citation in opposition procedure - 005 |
Opposition |
17 |
|
25.07.2022 |
Citation in opposition procedure - 006 |
Opposition |
17 |
|
25.07.2022 |
Citation in opposition procedure - 006 |
Opposition |
54 |
|
25.07.2022 |
Citation in opposition procedure - 007 |
Opposition |
20 |
|
25.07.2022 |
Citation in opposition procedure - 007 |
Opposition |
56 |
|
25.07.2022 |
Citation in opposition procedure - 008 |
Opposition |
41 |
|
25.07.2022 |
Citation in opposition procedure - 008 |
Opposition |
13 |
|
25.07.2022 |
Citation in opposition procedure - 008 |
Opposition |
35 |
|
25.07.2022 |
Citation in opposition procedure - 009 |
Opposition |
23 |
|
25.07.2022 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
21 |
|
25.07.2022 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
5 |
|
09.11.2021 |
Transmission of the certificate for a European patent pursuant to Rule 74 EPC |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.11.2021 |
Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
25.10.2021 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.10.2021 |
Annexes in respect of a client data request |
Search / examination |
26 |
|
25.10.2021 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
25.10.2021 |
Submission concerning a transfer of rights (applicant) |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
30.09.2021 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
17.09.2021 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.09.2021 |
English translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
17.09.2021 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.09.2021 |
French translation of claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
17.09.2021 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
18.06.2021 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
18.06.2021 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
18.06.2021 |
Intention to grant (signatures) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.06.2021 |
Text intended for grant (clean copy) |
Search / examination |
45 |
|
18.06.2021 |
Text intended for grant (version for approval) |
Search / examination |
45 |
|
19.02.2021 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.02.2021 |
Amended description with annotations |
Search / examination |
52 |
|
19.02.2021 |
Description |
Search / examination |
43 |
|
19.02.2021 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.02.2021 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
17.12.2020 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
17.12.2020 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
23.03.2020 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.03.2020 |
Amended description with annotations |
Search / examination |
51 |
|
23.03.2020 |
Description |
Search / examination |
44 |
|
23.03.2020 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.03.2020 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
03.01.2020 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
03.01.2020 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
12.11.2019 |
Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
06.11.2019 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's name |
Search / examination |
59 |
|
06.11.2019 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's name |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.08.2019 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.08.2019 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.08.2019 |
Authorisation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.08.2019 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.08.2019 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.04.2019 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.04.2019 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.04.2019 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
13.03.2019 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.03.2019 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
16.01.2019 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.01.2019 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.01.2019 |
Matter concerning the application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
09.01.2019 |
Refund of fees |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.01.2019 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
02.01.2019 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
21.12.2018 |
Decision of the Board of Appeal |
Search / examination |
9 |
|
21.12.2018 |
Decision of the Board of Appeal |
Appeal |
9 |
|
21.12.2018 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
1 |
|
21.12.2018 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.11.2018 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
1 |
|
23.11.2018 |
F3314 Oral proceedings: Minutes (ex parte) |
Appeal |
3 |
|
11.10.2018 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
11.10.2018 |
Claims |
Appeal |
4 |
|
11.10.2018 |
Claims |
Appeal |
2 |
|
11.10.2018 |
Claims |
Appeal |
2 |
|
11.10.2018 |
Claims |
Appeal |
2 |
|
11.10.2018 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
11.10.2018 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
13 |
|
19.06.2018 |
F3017 Oral Proceedings: Notification of cancellation/postponing |
Appeal |
1 |
|
07.03.2018 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
07.03.2018 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
02.03.2018 |
F3017 Oral Proceedings: Notification of cancellation/postponing |
Appeal |
1 |
|
27.02.2018 |
F3014 Oral Proceedings: Order cancelling/postponing |
Appeal |
1 |
|
23.11.2017 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
22.11.2017 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
17.11.2017 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
2 |
|
14.11.2017 |
F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
05.08.2016 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Appeal |
1 |
|
18.05.2016 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's representative |
Appeal |
1 |
|
05.12.2014 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
05.12.2014 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
03.11.2014 |
F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) |
Appeal |
2 |
|
13.08.2014 |
Composition of the board (T) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
06.06.2014 |
F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
02.06.2014 |
Processing of an appeal |
Appeal |
2 |
|
09.05.2014 |
Acknowledgement of receipt of third party observations |
Appeal |
1 |
|
09.05.2014 |
Transmittal of third party observations to applicant |
Appeal |
1 |
|
11.04.2014 |
Claims |
Appeal |
4 |
|
11.04.2014 |
Claims |
Appeal |
4 |
|
11.04.2014 |
Claims |
Appeal |
3 |
|
11.04.2014 |
Claims |
Appeal |
3 |
|
11.04.2014 |
Claims |
Appeal |
4 |
|
11.04.2014 |
Claims |
Appeal |
5 |
|
11.04.2014 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
12 |
|
08.04.2014 |
Claims |
Appeal |
3 |
|
08.04.2014 |
Claims |
Appeal |
4 |
|
08.04.2014 |
Claims |
Appeal |
4 |
|
08.04.2014 |
Claims |
Appeal |
4 |
|
08.04.2014 |
Claims |
Appeal |
3 |
|
08.04.2014 |
Claims |
Appeal |
5 |
|
08.04.2014 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
12 |
|
02.04.2014 |
Observations by third parties |
Appeal |
16 |
|
02.04.2014 |
Patent document filed by a Third party |
Appeal |
8 |
|
24.01.2014 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
2 |
|
23.01.2014 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
2 |
|
05.12.2013 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.12.2013 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.11.2013 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.11.2013 |
Annex to a communication |
Search / examination |
14 |
|
29.11.2013 |
Decision to refuse the application (Examining Division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.11.2013 |
Decision to refuse the application (examining division) |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
29.11.2013 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) |
Search / examination |
39 |
|
29.11.2013 |
Means of redress |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
28.10.2013 |
Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.10.2013 |
Findings upon submissions relating to oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
07.10.2013 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.10.2013 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
07.10.2013 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
07.10.2013 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.10.2013 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
18.07.2013 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.07.2013 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.07.2013 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.07.2013 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
23 |
|
16.07.2013 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.07.2013 |
Preparation for oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
12.09.2012 |
Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.09.2012 |
Annexes in respect of a client data request |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
01.09.2012 |
Submission concerning a transfer of rights (applicant) |
Search / examination |
41 |
|
06.07.2011 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
06.07.2011 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
04.07.2011 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
04.07.2011 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
20.04.2011 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.04.2011 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.04.2011 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.04.2011 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.12.2010 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
23.12.2010 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
11.05.2009 |
Refund of fees |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.04.2009 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.04.2009 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
31.03.2009 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's representative |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
23.03.2009 |
CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative for the applicant |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.03.2009 |
Communication regarding possible amendment of claims/payment of claims fees |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
27.02.2009 |
Letter concerning the inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.02.2009 |
Letter concerning the inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.02.2009 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
26.02.2009 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
26.02.2009 |
International publication of the international search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
27.01.2009 |
Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability |
Search / examination |
19 |
|
27.01.2009 |
Invitation to indicate correct address of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.01.2009 |
Invitation to indicate correct address of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.12.2008 |
Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.12.2008 |
Letter which had not been notified |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
09.12.2008 |
Letter which had not been notified |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
28.11.2008 |
Cover sheet for fax transmission |
International Searching Authority |
4 |
|
27.11.2008 |
Cover sheet for fax transmission |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
05.11.2008 |
Request for entry into the European phase |
Search / examination |
20 |
|
30.10.2008 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
30.10.2008 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
30.10.2008 |
Fax request to enter the European phase |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
30.10.2008 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
30.10.2008 |
Payment of fees and costs |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.10.2008 |
Request for correction |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.09.2008 |
Information on entry into European phase |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
01.09.2008 |
Notification of the recording of a change |
PCT receiving Office |
1 |
|
01.09.2008 |
Notification of the recording of a change |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
01.09.2008 |
Notification of the recording of a change |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
27.05.2008 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
63 |
|
27.05.2008 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
61 |
|
27.05.2008 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
47 |
|
27.05.2008 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
46 |
|
27.05.2008 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
57 |
|
01.11.2007 |
Published international application - A2 |
Search / examination |
58 |
|
24.04.2007 |
Abstract |
PCT receiving Office |
1 |
|
24.04.2007 |
Claims |
PCT receiving Office |
6 |
|
24.04.2007 |
Description |
PCT receiving Office |
50 |
|
24.04.2007 |
Submission concerning representation |
PCT receiving Office |
1 |