EP2013968 - OPERATIONAL AMPLIFIER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 19.03.2010 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.03.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 21.04.2010 [2010/16] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ATMEL Germany GmbH Theresienstrasse 2 74072 Heilbronn / DE | [2009/03] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DEQUIEDT, Odile Hechtstr. 24 01097 Dresden / DE | 02 /
KLUGE, Wolfram Darwinstr. 10 01109 Dresden / DE | [2009/03] | Representative(s) | Koch Müller Patentanwaltsgesellschaft mbH Maaßstraße 32/1 69123 Heidelberg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/03] | Koch Müller Patentanwaltsgesellschaft mbH Maasstrasse 32/1 69123 Heidelberg / DE | ||
Former [2008/44] | Koch Müller Patentanwaltsgesellschaft mbH Maaßstraße 32/1 69123 Heidelberg / DE | Application number, filing date | 07724519.9 | 24.04.2007 | [2009/03] | WO2007EP03589 | Priority number, date | DE20061020485 | 28.04.2006 Original published format: DE102006020485 | [2009/03] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2007124895 | Date: | 08.11.2007 | Language: | DE | [2007/45] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2013968 | Date: | 14.01.2009 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.11.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/03] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 08.11.2007 | Classification | IPC: | H03F3/45 | [2009/03] | CPC: |
H03F3/45076 (EP,US);
H03F3/45085 (EP,US);
H03F3/45183 (EP,US);
H03F2203/45652 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR [2009/22] |
Former [2009/03] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | OPERATIONSVERSTÄRKER | [2009/03] | English: | OPERATIONAL AMPLIFIER | [2009/03] | French: | AMPLIFICATEUR OPÉRATIONNEL | [2009/03] | Entry into regional phase | 12.09.2008 | National basic fee paid | 12.09.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.09.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.02.2008 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 12.09.2008 | Examination requested [2009/03] | 29.11.2008 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 08.01.2009 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 03.11.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2010/16] | 04.12.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2010/16] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.2009 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]EP0633657 (PHILIPS ELECTRONICS UK LTD [GB], et al) [X] 1,4,5 * column 4, line 3 - column 5, line 10; figures 1,2,4 *; | [X]WO9914758 (INTEL CORP [US], et al) [X] 1-5 * figure 7 *; | [A]US6542019 (LIM KYOOHYUN [US], et al) [A] 1 * figure 4 *; | [A]US2003193492 (KOYAMA JUN [JP]) [A] 1* figures 2,4 *; | [X]US6801090 (ABERNATHY BRIAN LEE [US]) [X] 1,4 * column 2, line 26 - column 3, line 14; figure 2 *; | [A]US2006012429 (KIM JI-HYUN [KR]) [A] 1-4 * figure 3 *; | [A]US2006077584 (NAINAR ELANGOVAN [US]) [A] 1-5 * paragraph [0031] - paragraph [0041]; figure 3 *; | [PX]US2007001760 (KWON ICK-JIN [KR], et al) [PX] 1-5 * the whole document * |