EP2018226 - DISPENSING DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.01.2016 Database last updated on 19.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.10.2017 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): BE, BG, CY, HU, PT, TR | published on 15.11.2017 [2017/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Aptar Dortmund GmbH Hildebrandstrasse 20 44319 Dortmund / DE | [2012/37] |
Former [2009/05] | For all designated states Seaquist Perfect Dispensing GmbH Hildebrandstrasse 20 44319 Dortmund / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NEUHAUS, Reinhard Am Vossholz 36 58675 Hemer / DE | 02 /
CANFIELD, Reiker Ruhrtalstrasse 102 c 45239 Essen / DE | [2009/05] | Representative(s) | Von Rohr Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Rüttenscheider Straße 62 45130 Essen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2015/09] | Von Rohr Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Patentanwälte Partnerschaft Rüttenscheider Straße 62 45130 Essen / DE | ||
Former [2013/03] | Von Rohr Patentanwälte Partnerschaft Rüttenscheider Straße 62 45130 Essen / DE | ||
Former [2009/05] | Gesthuysen, von Rohr & Eggert Patentanwälte Postfach 10 13 54 45013 Essen / DE | Application number, filing date | 07724788.0 | 02.05.2007 | [2009/05] | WO2007EP03862 | Priority number, date | DE20061022747 | 12.05.2006 Original published format: DE102006022747 | DE20061025482 | 30.05.2006 Original published format: DE102006025482 | DE20061030829 | 30.06.2006 Original published format: DE102006030829 | [2009/05] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2007131634 | Date: | 22.11.2007 | Language: | DE | [2007/47] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2018226 | Date: | 28.01.2009 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.11.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/05] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2018226 | Date: | 25.02.2015 | Language: | DE | [2015/09] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 22.11.2007 | Classification | IPC: | B05B11/00, B29C65/08, B29C65/42, B29C65/60, B29C65/54 | [2014/37] | CPC: |
B29C65/08 (EP,US);
B05B11/1033 (EP,US);
B05B11/1032 (EP,US);
B29C65/42 (EP,US);
B29C65/48 (EP,US);
B29C65/4895 (EP,US);
B29C65/606 (EP);
B29C66/112 (EP,US);
B29C66/12445 (EP,US);
B29C66/12461 (EP,US);
B29C66/131 (EP,US);
B29C66/21 (EP);
B29C66/30223 (EP,US);
B29C66/534 (EP,US);
B29C66/54 (EP,US);
B29C66/542 (EP,US);
B29C66/549 (EP,US);
B29C65/542 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
B29C66/71, B29K2023/00 (US,EP);
B29C66/71, B29K2023/06 (US,EP);
B29C66/71, B29K2023/12 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2009/05] | B05B11/00, B29C65/08, B29C65/42, B29C65/60 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/05] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ABGABEVORRICHTUNG | [2009/05] | English: | DISPENSING DEVICE | [2009/05] | French: | DISPOSITIF DISTRIBUTEUR | [2009/05] | Entry into regional phase | 10.10.2008 | National basic fee paid | 10.10.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.10.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.10.2008 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 10.10.2008 | Examination requested [2009/05] | 23.09.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 18.03.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.09.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.10.2014 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 03.12.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.01.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 12.01.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 12.01.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 23.09.2013 | Opposition(s) | 26.11.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit [2016/05] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.05.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.05.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 23.05.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 21.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 02.05.2007 | BG | 25.02.2015 | CY | 25.02.2015 | CZ | 25.02.2015 | DK | 25.02.2015 | EE | 25.02.2015 | FI | 25.02.2015 | LT | 25.02.2015 | LV | 25.02.2015 | MC | 25.02.2015 | MT | 25.02.2015 | NL | 25.02.2015 | PL | 25.02.2015 | RO | 25.02.2015 | SE | 25.02.2015 | SI | 25.02.2015 | SK | 25.02.2015 | TR | 25.02.2015 | AT | 02.05.2015 | IE | 02.05.2015 | LU | 02.05.2015 | GR | 26.05.2015 | BE | 31.05.2015 | CH | 31.05.2015 | LI | 31.05.2015 | IS | 25.06.2015 | PT | 25.06.2015 | [2017/39] |
Former [2017/03] | CZ | 25.02.2015 | |
DK | 25.02.2015 | ||
EE | 25.02.2015 | ||
FI | 25.02.2015 | ||
LT | 25.02.2015 | ||
LV | 25.02.2015 | ||
MC | 25.02.2015 | ||
MT | 25.02.2015 | ||
NL | 25.02.2015 | ||
PL | 25.02.2015 | ||
RO | 25.02.2015 | ||
SE | 25.02.2015 | ||
SI | 25.02.2015 | ||
SK | 25.02.2015 | ||
AT | 02.05.2015 | ||
IE | 02.05.2015 | ||
LU | 02.05.2015 | ||
GR | 26.05.2015 | ||
CH | 31.05.2015 | ||
LI | 31.05.2015 | ||
IS | 25.06.2015 | ||
Former [2016/36] | CZ | 25.02.2015 | |
DK | 25.02.2015 | ||
EE | 25.02.2015 | ||
FI | 25.02.2015 | ||
LT | 25.02.2015 | ||
LV | 25.02.2015 | ||
MC | 25.02.2015 | ||
NL | 25.02.2015 | ||
PL | 25.02.2015 | ||
RO | 25.02.2015 | ||
SE | 25.02.2015 | ||
SI | 25.02.2015 | ||
SK | 25.02.2015 | ||
AT | 02.05.2015 | ||
IE | 02.05.2015 | ||
LU | 02.05.2015 | ||
GR | 26.05.2015 | ||
CH | 31.05.2015 | ||
LI | 31.05.2015 | ||
IS | 25.06.2015 | ||
Former [2016/20] | CZ | 25.02.2015 | |
DK | 25.02.2015 | ||
EE | 25.02.2015 | ||
FI | 25.02.2015 | ||
LT | 25.02.2015 | ||
LV | 25.02.2015 | ||
MC | 25.02.2015 | ||
NL | 25.02.2015 | ||
PL | 25.02.2015 | ||
RO | 25.02.2015 | ||
SE | 25.02.2015 | ||
SI | 25.02.2015 | ||
SK | 25.02.2015 | ||
IE | 02.05.2015 | ||
LU | 02.05.2015 | ||
GR | 26.05.2015 | ||
CH | 31.05.2015 | ||
LI | 31.05.2015 | ||
IS | 25.06.2015 | ||
Former [2016/12] | CZ | 25.02.2015 | |
DK | 25.02.2015 | ||
EE | 25.02.2015 | ||
FI | 25.02.2015 | ||
LT | 25.02.2015 | ||
LV | 25.02.2015 | ||
MC | 25.02.2015 | ||
NL | 25.02.2015 | ||
PL | 25.02.2015 | ||
RO | 25.02.2015 | ||
SE | 25.02.2015 | ||
SI | 25.02.2015 | ||
SK | 25.02.2015 | ||
LU | 02.05.2015 | ||
GR | 26.05.2015 | ||
CH | 31.05.2015 | ||
LI | 31.05.2015 | ||
IS | 25.06.2015 | ||
Former [2016/06] | CZ | 25.02.2015 | |
DK | 25.02.2015 | ||
EE | 25.02.2015 | ||
FI | 25.02.2015 | ||
LT | 25.02.2015 | ||
LV | 25.02.2015 | ||
MC | 25.02.2015 | ||
NL | 25.02.2015 | ||
PL | 25.02.2015 | ||
RO | 25.02.2015 | ||
SE | 25.02.2015 | ||
SK | 25.02.2015 | ||
LU | 02.05.2015 | ||
GR | 26.05.2015 | ||
CH | 31.05.2015 | ||
LI | 31.05.2015 | ||
IS | 25.06.2015 | ||
Former [2015/50] | CZ | 25.02.2015 | |
DK | 25.02.2015 | ||
EE | 25.02.2015 | ||
FI | 25.02.2015 | ||
LT | 25.02.2015 | ||
LV | 25.02.2015 | ||
NL | 25.02.2015 | ||
PL | 25.02.2015 | ||
RO | 25.02.2015 | ||
SE | 25.02.2015 | ||
SK | 25.02.2015 | ||
GR | 26.05.2015 | ||
IS | 25.06.2015 | ||
Former [2015/49] | CZ | 25.02.2015 | |
DK | 25.02.2015 | ||
EE | 25.02.2015 | ||
FI | 25.02.2015 | ||
LT | 25.02.2015 | ||
LV | 25.02.2015 | ||
NL | 25.02.2015 | ||
RO | 25.02.2015 | ||
SE | 25.02.2015 | ||
SK | 25.02.2015 | ||
GR | 26.05.2015 | ||
IS | 25.06.2015 | ||
Former [2015/41] | FI | 25.02.2015 | |
LT | 25.02.2015 | ||
LV | 25.02.2015 | ||
NL | 25.02.2015 | ||
SE | 25.02.2015 | ||
GR | 26.05.2015 | ||
IS | 25.06.2015 | ||
Former [2015/39] | FI | 25.02.2015 | |
LT | 25.02.2015 | ||
LV | 25.02.2015 | ||
SE | 25.02.2015 | ||
GR | 26.05.2015 | ||
IS | 25.06.2015 | ||
Former [2015/38] | FI | 25.02.2015 | |
LT | 25.02.2015 | ||
SE | 25.02.2015 | ||
GR | 26.05.2015 | ||
IS | 25.06.2015 | ||
Former [2015/37] | FI | 25.02.2015 | |
LT | 25.02.2015 | ||
SE | 25.02.2015 | ||
GR | 26.05.2015 | ||
Former [2015/36] | FI | 25.02.2015 | |
LT | 25.02.2015 | ||
SE | 25.02.2015 | ||
Former [2015/35] | LT | 25.02.2015 | Cited in | International search | [I]US3258369 (EMIL BLAICH) [I] 1-3,6,7,13,14,16-20 * column 2, lines 13-21 * * column 3, lines 15-28 * * column 4, lines 17-26; figure - *; | [I]GB1405546 (DIETSCHE ROMAN KG) [I] 1-5,12-20 * page 2, lines 4-72; figure 2 *; | [XI]US4304749 (BAUER PETER) [X] 1,3,7,13-15,19,20 * column 3, lines 43-64 * * column 4, line 24 - column 5, line 14; figures 7-10 * [I] 16-18; | [A]US4352443 (LIBIT SIDNEY M) [A] 1-20* column 4, lines 27-38 *; | [I]US5007596 (IWAHASHI YUJI [JP]) [I] 1,10,11,20 * column 4, lines 53-63; figure 6 *; | [XI]US5197637 (NAUMANN WILHELM K [DE]) [X] 1-6,12-15,17-20 * column 6, line 57 - column 7, line 5; figure 1 * [I] 16; | [XI]US5857224 (OBERG ERIK J [US], et al) [X] 1-6,13-15,20 * column 2, lines 24-61; figure 5 * [I] 16-19; | [XI]US2002037179 (SUZUKI AKIRA [JP], et al) [X] 1-3,6,7,9,13-15,20 * abstract * * paragraphs [0064] , [0069] , [0084] , [0103] - [0109]; figures 1A,2-4,9 * [I] 8,16-19; | [I]US2002051314 (HAYASHI YOICHI [JP]) [I] 1-6,12-20 * paragraphs [0065] , [0074] - [0080]; figures 2-6,10-14(c) * | by applicant | US5197637 |