EP2027255 - DEVICE AND SUBSTANCE FOR ISOLATING MESENCHYMAL STEM CELLS (MSC) [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 13.05.2011 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.05.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 15.06.2011 [2011/24] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Eberhard-Karls-Universität Tübingen Universitätsklinikum Geissweg 3 72076 Tübingen / DE | [2009/09] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WENDEL, Hans-Peter Erlenstr. 44 72336 Balingen / DE | 02 /
GUO, Ketai Pfingstrosenstr. 60 02-131 München / DE | 03 /
SCHAEFER, Richard Robert-Koch-Str. 48/1 72116 Moessingen / DE | [2009/22] |
Former [2009/09] | 01 /
WENDEL, Hans-Peter Erlenstr. 44 72336 Balingen / DE | ||
02 /
GUO, Ketai Fichtenweg 17/2 72076 Tuebingen / DE | |||
03 /
SCHAEFER, Richard Robert-Koch-Str. 48/1 72116 Moessingen / DE | Representative(s) | Findeisen, Marco, et al Witte, Weller & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Postfach 10 54 62 70047 Stuttgart / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/09] | Findeisen, Marco, et al Witte, Weller & Partner Patentanwälte Postfach 10 54 62 70047 Stuttgart / DE | Application number, filing date | 07724981.1 | 08.05.2007 | [2009/09] | WO2007EP04057 | Priority number, date | DE20061026191 | 26.05.2006 Original published format: DE102006026191 | [2009/09] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2007137679 | Date: | 06.12.2007 | Language: | DE | [2007/49] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2027255 | Date: | 25.02.2009 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.12.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/09] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 03.04.2008 | Classification | IPC: | C12N5/00 | [2009/09] | CPC: |
C12N15/111 (EP,US);
C12N15/115 (EP,US);
C12N5/0663 (EP,US);
C12N2310/3517 (EP,US);
C12N2320/11 (EP,US);
C12N2320/13 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/09] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG UND SUBSTANZ ZUR ISOLIERUNG VON MESENCHYMALEN STAMMZELLEN (MSC) | [2009/09] | English: | DEVICE AND SUBSTANCE FOR ISOLATING MESENCHYMAL STEM CELLS (MSC) | [2009/09] | French: | DISPOSITIF ET SUBSTANCE DESTINÉS À ISOLER DES CELLULES SOUCHES MÉSENCHYMATEUSES | [2009/09] | Entry into regional phase | 20.11.2008 | National basic fee paid | 20.11.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.11.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.11.2008 | Examination requested [2009/09] | 06.04.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 01.02.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.12.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2011/24] | 21.01.2011 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2011/24] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 06.04.2009 | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 01.02.2010 | Request for further processing filed | 01.02.2010 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.11.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2010 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [YA]WO2004025293 (EBERHARD KARLS UNIVER SITAET T [DE], et al) [Y] 1,9,13,16,18 * "ANTIBODY FOR ISOLATING AND/OR IDENTIFYING MESENCHYMAL STEM CELLS AND METHOD FOR ISOLATING AND/OR IDENTIFYING MESENCHYMAL STEM CELLS" * * page 9, line 20 - page 11, line 9 * * page 12, paragraph L - page 15, paragraph 2 * [A] 2-8,10-12,14,15,17; | [YA] - GUO K ET AL, "APTAMER-BASED CAPTURE MOLECULES AS A NOVEL COATING STRATEGY TO PROMOTE CELL ADHESION", JOURNAL OF CELLULAR AND MOLECULAR MEDICINE, UNIVERSITY PRESS CAROL DAVILA, BUCHAREST, RO, (200507), vol. 9, no. 3, ISSN 1582-1838, pages 731 - 736, XP008066334 [Y] 1,9,13,16,18 * abstract * * page 732, column L, paragraph L * * page 734, column R, paragraph L - page 736, column L, paragraph 1 * [A] 2-8,10-12,14,15,17 | [DA] - REYES M ET AL, "PURIFICATION AND EX VIVO EXPANSION OF POSTNATAL HUMAN MARROW MESODERMAL PROGENITOR CELLS", BLOOD, W.B.SAUNDERS COMPANY, ORLANDO, FL, US, (20011101), vol. 98, no. 9, ISSN 0006-4971, pages 2615 - 2629, XP001153222 [DA] 1-18 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1182/blood.V98.9.2615 | [PX] - GUO KE-TAI ET AL, "A new technique for the isolation and surface immobilization of mesenchymal stem cells from whole bone marrow using high-specific DNA aptamers", STEM CELLS (MIAMISBURG), (200610), vol. 24, no. 10, ISSN 1066-5099, pages 2220 - 2231, XP002465469 [PX] 1-18 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1634/stemcells.2006-0015 |