EP2029186 - ISOLATED NATURE-IDENTICAL COLLAGEN [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.10.2011 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.10.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 06.11.2013 [2013/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Fraunhofer-Gesellschaft zur Förderung der angewandten Forschung e.V. Hansastrasse 27c 80686 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/51] | For all designated states Fraunhofer-Gesellschaft zur Förderung der angewandten Forschung e.V. Hansastrasse 27c 80686 München / DE | ||
Former [2009/10] | For all designated states Fraunhofer-Gesellschaft zur Förderung der Angewandten Forschung e.V. Hansastrasse 27c 80686 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
XIONG, Xin Schwarzwaldstrasse 12 70569 Stuttgart / DE | 02 /
MERTSCHING, Heike Bahnhofstrasse 21 71063 Sindelfingen / DE | 03 /
RUPP, Steffen Edouard-Manet-Weg 14 70569 Stuttgart / DE | 04 /
BRUNNER, Herwig Bärenmühlweg 39 82362 Weilheim / DE | [2009/10] | Representative(s) | (deleted) | [2010/38] |
Former [2009/10] | Schwahn, Hartmut, et al Gleiss Grosse Schrell & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte Leitzstraße 45 70469 Stuttgart / DE | Application number, filing date | 07725658.4 | 30.05.2007 | [2009/10] | WO2007EP04767 | Priority number, date | DE20061026591 | 31.05.2006 Original published format: DE102006026591 | [2009/10] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2007137827 | Date: | 06.12.2007 | Language: | DE | [2007/49] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2029186 | Date: | 04.03.2009 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.12.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/10] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2029186 | Date: | 01.12.2010 | Language: | DE | [2010/48] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 06.12.2007 | Classification | IPC: | A61L27/24, C08L89/06, C12N5/00 | [2009/10] | CPC: |
C12N5/0068 (EP,US);
A61L27/24 (EP,US);
A61L27/38 (EP,US);
C08L89/06 (EP,US);
C12N2533/54 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/10] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ISOLIERTES NATURIDENTISCHES KOLLAGEN | [2009/10] | English: | ISOLATED NATURE-IDENTICAL COLLAGEN | [2009/10] | French: | COLLAGÈNE ISOLÉ IDENTIQUE AU NATUREL | [2009/10] | Entry into regional phase | 05.01.2009 | National basic fee paid | 05.01.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.01.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.03.2008 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 05.01.2009 | Examination requested [2009/10] | 24.11.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.01.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.03.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.04.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.07.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.10.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 13.10.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 02.09.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/45] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.05.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.05.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 01.12.2010 | CZ | 01.12.2010 | DK | 01.12.2010 | EE | 01.12.2010 | FI | 01.12.2010 | HU | 01.12.2010 | IE | 01.12.2010 | IT | 01.12.2010 | LT | 01.12.2010 | LV | 01.12.2010 | MT | 01.12.2010 | NL | 01.12.2010 | PL | 01.12.2010 | RO | 01.12.2010 | SE | 01.12.2010 | SI | 01.12.2010 | SK | 01.12.2010 | TR | 01.12.2010 | BG | 01.03.2011 | GR | 02.03.2011 | ES | 12.03.2011 | IS | 01.04.2011 | PT | 01.04.2011 | LU | 30.05.2011 | BE | 31.05.2011 | CH | 31.05.2011 | LI | 31.05.2011 | MC | 31.05.2011 | [2013/45] |
Former [2013/44] | CY | 01.12.2010 | |
CZ | 01.12.2010 | ||
DK | 01.12.2010 | ||
EE | 01.12.2010 | ||
FI | 01.12.2010 | ||
IE | 01.12.2010 | ||
IT | 01.12.2010 | ||
LT | 01.12.2010 | ||
LV | 01.12.2010 | ||
MT | 01.12.2010 | ||
NL | 01.12.2010 | ||
PL | 01.12.2010 | ||
RO | 01.12.2010 | ||
SE | 01.12.2010 | ||
SI | 01.12.2010 | ||
SK | 01.12.2010 | ||
TR | 01.12.2010 | ||
BG | 01.03.2011 | ||
GR | 02.03.2011 | ||
ES | 12.03.2011 | ||
IS | 01.04.2011 | ||
PT | 01.04.2011 | ||
LU | 30.05.2011 | ||
BE | 31.05.2011 | ||
CH | 31.05.2011 | ||
LI | 31.05.2011 | ||
MC | 31.05.2011 | ||
Former [2013/25] | CY | 01.12.2010 | |
CZ | 01.12.2010 | ||
DK | 01.12.2010 | ||
EE | 01.12.2010 | ||
FI | 01.12.2010 | ||
IE | 01.12.2010 | ||
IT | 01.12.2010 | ||
LT | 01.12.2010 | ||
LV | 01.12.2010 | ||
MT | 01.12.2010 | ||
NL | 01.12.2010 | ||
PL | 01.12.2010 | ||
RO | 01.12.2010 | ||
SE | 01.12.2010 | ||
SI | 01.12.2010 | ||
SK | 01.12.2010 | ||
BG | 01.03.2011 | ||
GR | 02.03.2011 | ||
ES | 12.03.2011 | ||
IS | 01.04.2011 | ||
PT | 01.04.2011 | ||
LU | 30.05.2011 | ||
BE | 31.05.2011 | ||
CH | 31.05.2011 | ||
LI | 31.05.2011 | ||
MC | 31.05.2011 | ||
Former [2012/17] | CY | 01.12.2010 | |
CZ | 01.12.2010 | ||
DK | 01.12.2010 | ||
EE | 01.12.2010 | ||
FI | 01.12.2010 | ||
IE | 01.12.2010 | ||
IT | 01.12.2010 | ||
LT | 01.12.2010 | ||
LV | 01.12.2010 | ||
MT | 01.12.2010 | ||
NL | 01.12.2010 | ||
PL | 01.12.2010 | ||
RO | 01.12.2010 | ||
SE | 01.12.2010 | ||
SI | 01.12.2010 | ||
SK | 01.12.2010 | ||
BG | 01.03.2011 | ||
GR | 02.03.2011 | ||
ES | 12.03.2011 | ||
IS | 01.04.2011 | ||
PT | 01.04.2011 | ||
BE | 31.05.2011 | ||
CH | 31.05.2011 | ||
LI | 31.05.2011 | ||
MC | 31.05.2011 | ||
Former [2012/07] | CY | 01.12.2010 | |
CZ | 01.12.2010 | ||
DK | 01.12.2010 | ||
EE | 01.12.2010 | ||
FI | 01.12.2010 | ||
IE | 01.12.2010 | ||
IT | 01.12.2010 | ||
LT | 01.12.2010 | ||
LV | 01.12.2010 | ||
MT | 01.12.2010 | ||
NL | 01.12.2010 | ||
PL | 01.12.2010 | ||
RO | 01.12.2010 | ||
SE | 01.12.2010 | ||
SI | 01.12.2010 | ||
SK | 01.12.2010 | ||
BG | 01.03.2011 | ||
GR | 02.03.2011 | ||
ES | 12.03.2011 | ||
IS | 01.04.2011 | ||
PT | 01.04.2011 | ||
CH | 31.05.2011 | ||
LI | 31.05.2011 | ||
MC | 31.05.2011 | ||
Former [2012/05] | CY | 01.12.2010 | |
CZ | 01.12.2010 | ||
DK | 01.12.2010 | ||
EE | 01.12.2010 | ||
FI | 01.12.2010 | ||
IE | 01.12.2010 | ||
IT | 01.12.2010 | ||
LT | 01.12.2010 | ||
LV | 01.12.2010 | ||
MT | 01.12.2010 | ||
NL | 01.12.2010 | ||
PL | 01.12.2010 | ||
RO | 01.12.2010 | ||
SE | 01.12.2010 | ||
SI | 01.12.2010 | ||
SK | 01.12.2010 | ||
BG | 01.03.2011 | ||
GR | 02.03.2011 | ||
ES | 12.03.2011 | ||
IS | 01.04.2011 | ||
PT | 01.04.2011 | ||
MC | 31.05.2011 | ||
Former [2012/03] | CY | 01.12.2010 | |
CZ | 01.12.2010 | ||
DK | 01.12.2010 | ||
EE | 01.12.2010 | ||
FI | 01.12.2010 | ||
IE | 01.12.2010 | ||
IT | 01.12.2010 | ||
LT | 01.12.2010 | ||
LV | 01.12.2010 | ||
NL | 01.12.2010 | ||
PL | 01.12.2010 | ||
RO | 01.12.2010 | ||
SE | 01.12.2010 | ||
SI | 01.12.2010 | ||
SK | 01.12.2010 | ||
BG | 01.03.2011 | ||
GR | 02.03.2011 | ||
ES | 12.03.2011 | ||
IS | 01.04.2011 | ||
PT | 01.04.2011 | ||
Former [2011/47] | CY | 01.12.2010 | |
CZ | 01.12.2010 | ||
DK | 01.12.2010 | ||
EE | 01.12.2010 | ||
FI | 01.12.2010 | ||
IE | 01.12.2010 | ||
LT | 01.12.2010 | ||
LV | 01.12.2010 | ||
NL | 01.12.2010 | ||
PL | 01.12.2010 | ||
RO | 01.12.2010 | ||
SE | 01.12.2010 | ||
SI | 01.12.2010 | ||
SK | 01.12.2010 | ||
BG | 01.03.2011 | ||
GR | 02.03.2011 | ||
ES | 12.03.2011 | ||
IS | 01.04.2011 | ||
PT | 01.04.2011 | ||
Former [2011/37] | CY | 01.12.2010 | |
CZ | 01.12.2010 | ||
EE | 01.12.2010 | ||
FI | 01.12.2010 | ||
IE | 01.12.2010 | ||
LT | 01.12.2010 | ||
LV | 01.12.2010 | ||
NL | 01.12.2010 | ||
PL | 01.12.2010 | ||
RO | 01.12.2010 | ||
SE | 01.12.2010 | ||
SI | 01.12.2010 | ||
SK | 01.12.2010 | ||
BG | 01.03.2011 | ||
GR | 02.03.2011 | ||
ES | 12.03.2011 | ||
IS | 01.04.2011 | ||
PT | 01.04.2011 | ||
Former [2011/36] | CY | 01.12.2010 | |
CZ | 01.12.2010 | ||
EE | 01.12.2010 | ||
FI | 01.12.2010 | ||
IE | 01.12.2010 | ||
LT | 01.12.2010 | ||
LV | 01.12.2010 | ||
NL | 01.12.2010 | ||
PL | 01.12.2010 | ||
SE | 01.12.2010 | ||
SI | 01.12.2010 | ||
SK | 01.12.2010 | ||
BG | 01.03.2011 | ||
GR | 02.03.2011 | ||
ES | 12.03.2011 | ||
IS | 01.04.2011 | ||
PT | 01.04.2011 | ||
Former [2011/35] | CY | 01.12.2010 | |
CZ | 01.12.2010 | ||
EE | 01.12.2010 | ||
FI | 01.12.2010 | ||
IE | 01.12.2010 | ||
LT | 01.12.2010 | ||
LV | 01.12.2010 | ||
NL | 01.12.2010 | ||
SE | 01.12.2010 | ||
SI | 01.12.2010 | ||
BG | 01.03.2011 | ||
GR | 02.03.2011 | ||
ES | 12.03.2011 | ||
IS | 01.04.2011 | ||
PT | 01.04.2011 | ||
Former [2011/34] | CY | 01.12.2010 | |
FI | 01.12.2010 | ||
IE | 01.12.2010 | ||
LT | 01.12.2010 | ||
LV | 01.12.2010 | ||
NL | 01.12.2010 | ||
SE | 01.12.2010 | ||
SI | 01.12.2010 | ||
BG | 01.03.2011 | ||
GR | 02.03.2011 | ||
ES | 12.03.2011 | ||
PT | 01.04.2011 | ||
Former [2011/29] | CY | 01.12.2010 | |
FI | 01.12.2010 | ||
LT | 01.12.2010 | ||
LV | 01.12.2010 | ||
NL | 01.12.2010 | ||
SE | 01.12.2010 | ||
SI | 01.12.2010 | ||
BG | 01.03.2011 | ||
GR | 02.03.2011 | Cited in | International search | [Y]DE10062623 (FRAUNHOFER GES FORSCHUNG [DE]) [Y] 1-31 * paragraphs [0021] , [0039] , [0050] , [0051] *; | [XY] - STOLTZ M ET AL, "NONHELICAL REGIONS IN RAT COLLAGEN ALPHA 1 CHAIN", FEBS LETTERS, (1972), vol. 26, no. 1, ISSN 0014-5793, pages 61 - 65, XP002450468 [X] 1,2,6,8,10,12,17-22 * page 61, column RIGHT, lines 1-11 * [Y] 1-31 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0014-5793(72)80542-8 | [XY] - BECKER U ET AL, "AMINO TERMINAL EXTENSIONS ON SKIN COLLAGEN FROM SHEEP WITH A GENETIC DEFECT IN CONVERSION OF PRO COLLAGEN INTO COLLAGEN", BIOCHEMISTRY, (1976), vol. 15, no. 13, ISSN 0006-2960, pages 2853 - 2862, XP002450469 [X] 1,6,8,10,12,19,22 * page 221, column RIGHT, paragraph LAST * [Y] 1-31 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/bi00658a024 | [XY] - BECKER U ET AL, "CARBOXY TERMINAL ANTIGENIC DETERMINANTS OF COLLAGEN FROM CALF SKIN LOCALIZATION WITHIN DISCRETE REGIONS OF THE NONHELICAL SEQUENCE", EUROPEAN JOURNAL OF BIOCHEMISTRY, (1972), vol. 28, no. 2, ISSN 0014-2956, pages 221 - 231, XP002450470 [X] 1,8,10-12,19-22 * page 2854, column LEFT, paragraph ZWEITLETZTER * [Y] 1-31 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1111/j.1432-1033.1972.tb01905.x | [A] - ADELMANN B C, "THE STRUCTURAL BASIS OF CELL MEDIATED IMMUNOLOGICAL REACTIONS OF COLLAGEN REACTIVITY OF SEPARATED ALPHA CHAINS OF CALF AND RAT COLLAGEN IN CUTANEOUS DELAYED HYPER SENSITIVITY REACTIONS", IMMUNOLOGY, (1972), vol. 23, no. 5, ISSN 0019-2805, pages 739 - 748, XP002450471 [A] 3-5 * Seite 747, zweitletzter Absatz; page 740, paragraph LAST * |