EP2044211 - A METHOD FOR THE DETECTION OF ENZYMATIC REACTIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 26.02.2010 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.02.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 31.03.2010 [2010/13] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Bio Pur AG Kantonstrasse 7 4416 Bubendorf / CH | [2009/15] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
AMBAR, Abraham Im Proli 10 79639 Grenzach 1 / DE | 02 /
AMBAR, Benjamin, Badri Albisriederstrasse 414 CH-8047 Zürich / CH | [2009/20] |
Former [2009/15] | 01 /
AMBAR, Abraham Im Proli 10 79639 Grenzach 1 / DE | ||
02 /
AMBAR, Benjamin, Badri Kochstrasse 2 CH-8004 Zürich / CH | Representative(s) | Lahrtz, Fritz Patentanwälte Isenbruck Bösl Hörschler PartG mbB Prinzregentenstraße 68 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/15] | Lahrtz, Fritz Isenbruck Bösl Hörschler Wichmann Huhn LLP Patentanwälte Prinzregentenstrasse 68 81675 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 07725917.4 | 08.06.2007 | [2009/15] | WO2007EP05078 | Priority number, date | EP20060011960 | 09.06.2006 Original published format: EP 06011960 | [2009/15] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2007141030 | Date: | 13.12.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/50] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2044211 | Date: | 08.04.2009 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.12.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/15] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 10.04.2008 | Classification | IPC: | C12Q1/34, C12Q1/37 | [2009/15] | CPC: |
C12Q1/34 (EP,US);
C12Q1/37 (EP,US);
C12Q1/44 (EP,US);
G01N33/573 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/15] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUM NACHWEIS ENZYMATISCHER REAKTIONEN | [2009/15] | English: | A METHOD FOR THE DETECTION OF ENZYMATIC REACTIONS | [2009/15] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE DÉTECTION DES RÉACTIONS ENZYMATIQUES | [2009/15] | Entry into regional phase | 07.01.2009 | National basic fee paid | 07.01.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.01.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.01.2009 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 07.01.2009 | Examination requested [2009/15] | 20.05.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 30.06.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.07.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 03.10.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2010/13] | 10.11.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2010/13] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.06.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]EP0571939 (BOEHRINGER MANNHEIM GMBH [DE]) [X] 1-59* claims 1-2, 6-7; p. 4 l. 12 - p.7 l.41; p.9 l.39 - l.58; figures 1-2 *; | [X]WO9424306 (LITMUS CONCEPTS INC [US]) [X] 1-59 * claims 1-5, 10; pp.9-13; claims 8-11; pp.25-34, pp.40-43; figures 1-2 *; | [X]WO02061114 (NANOGEN INC [US]) [X] 1-45 * claims 78-85,106-113 * * page 4 - page 6 * * page 8 - page 10 * * page 12 * * page 16 - page 18 * * page 26 - page 28 * * page 30 * * page 33 *; | [X]US2003077685 (SCHMIDT JAMES J [US], et al) [X] 1-45 * paragraph [0012] - paragraph [0021] * * paragraph [0041] - paragraph [0083] *; | [X]US2003207795 (PILON APRILE L [US], et al) [X] 1-45 * paragraph [0136] - paragraph [0143] * * paragraph [0222] *; | [X]WO2006007009 (KIMBERLY CLARK CO [US], et al) [X] 1-45 * page 4 - page 5 * * page 6 - page 16 * * example 4 * * page 22 - page 25 * * claims 7-20 *; | [X]WO2006020748 (ALLERGAN INC [US], et al) [X] 1-45 * paragraphs [0146] , [0125] , [0126] , [0034] , [0043] , [0007] , [0114] , [0162] * * paragraphs [0141] - [0143] * * paragraphs [0154] - [0157] * * example 2 * * figure 10G * |