EP1994071 - SHAPE MEMORY POLYMER WITH POLYESTER AND POLYETHER SEGMENTS AND PROCESS FOR ITS PREPARATION AND PROGRAMMING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.04.2011 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.10.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): ES | published on 13.11.2013 [2013/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states GKSS-Forschungszentrum Geesthacht GmbH Max-Planck-Strasse 1 21502 Geesthacht / DE | [2008/48] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KELCH, Steffen Fabrikstrasse 2b 8102 Oberengstringen / CH | 02 /
LENDLEIN, Andreas Sundgauer Str. 142 14167 Berlin / DE | 03 /
BELLIN, Ingo B2 Nr. 5 68159 Mannheim / DE | [2009/01] |
Former [2008/48] | 01 /
KELCH, Steffen Seehofstr. 110 14167 Berlin / DE | ||
02 /
LENDLEIN, Andreas Sundgauer Str. 142 14167 Berlin / DE | |||
03 /
BELLIN, Ingo B2 Nr. 5 68159 Mannheim / DE | Representative(s) | Reinstädler, Diane, et al Anwaltskanzlei Gulde Hengelhaupt Ziebig & Schneider Wallstrasse 58/59 D-10179 Berlin / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/48] | Reinstädler, Diane, et al Anwaltskanzlei, Gulde Hengelhaupt Ziebig Schneider, Wallstrasse 58/59 10179 Berlin / DE | Application number, filing date | 07726849.8 | 13.03.2007 | [2008/48] | WO2007EP52345 | Priority number, date | DE20061012169 | 14.03.2006 Original published format: DE102006012169 | [2008/48] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2007104757 | Date: | 20.09.2007 | Language: | DE | [2007/38] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1994071 | Date: | 26.11.2008 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.09.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/48] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1994071 | Date: | 26.05.2010 | Language: | DE | [2010/21] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 20.09.2007 | Classification | IPC: | C08G63/00, C08G65/00 | [2008/48] | CPC: |
C08F290/061 (EP,US);
A61L27/18 (EP,US);
A61L27/50 (EP,US);
C08F283/00 (EP,US);
C08F283/02 (EP,US);
C08F283/06 (EP,US);
C08F290/062 (EP,US);
C08G63/664 (EP,US);
C08G65/3322 (EP,US);
C08L71/02 (EP,US);
A61L2400/16 (EP,US);
C08G2270/00 (EP,US);
C08G2280/00 (EP,US)
(-)
| C-Set: |
A61L27/18, C08L67/00 (EP,US);
C08L71/02, C08L2666/04 (US,EP) | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/48] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | FORMGEDÄCHTNISPOLYMER MIT POLYESTER- UND POLYETHERSEGMENTEN UND VERFAHREN ZU SEINER HERSTELLUNG UND PROGRAMMIERUNG | [2010/14] | English: | SHAPE MEMORY POLYMER WITH POLYESTER AND POLYETHER SEGMENTS AND PROCESS FOR ITS PREPARATION AND PROGRAMMING | [2008/48] | French: | POLYMERE A MEMOIRE DE FORME COMPRENANT DES SEGMENTS POLYESTER ET POLYETHER, SON PROCEDE DE FABRICATION ET SA PROGRAMMATION | [2008/48] |
Former [2008/48] | FORMGEDÄCHTNISPOLYMER MIT POLYESTER- UND POLYETHERSEGEMENTEN UND VERFAHREN ZU SEINER HERSTELLUNG UND PROGRAMMIERUNG | Entry into regional phase | 08.09.2008 | National basic fee paid | 08.09.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.09.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.09.2008 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 08.09.2008 | Examination requested [2008/48] | 12.01.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.05.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.06.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.09.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.10.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.02.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 04.02.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 01.03.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/18] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.03.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CZ | 26.05.2010 | DK | 26.05.2010 | EE | 26.05.2010 | FI | 26.05.2010 | HU | 26.05.2010 | LT | 26.05.2010 | LV | 26.05.2010 | MT | 26.05.2010 | PL | 26.05.2010 | RO | 26.05.2010 | SI | 26.05.2010 | CY | 02.06.2010 | BG | 26.08.2010 | GR | 27.08.2010 | ES | 06.09.2010 | IS | 26.09.2010 | PT | 27.09.2010 | [2013/46] |
Former [2013/45] | CZ | 26.05.2010 | |
DK | 26.05.2010 | ||
EE | 26.05.2010 | ||
FI | 26.05.2010 | ||
HU | 26.05.2010 | ||
LT | 26.05.2010 | ||
LV | 26.05.2010 | ||
MT | 26.05.2010 | ||
PL | 26.05.2010 | ||
RO | 26.05.2010 | ||
SI | 26.05.2010 | ||
CY | 02.06.2010 | ||
BG | 26.08.2010 | ||
GR | 27.08.2010 | ||
IS | 26.09.2010 | ||
PT | 27.09.2010 | ||
Former [2013/42] | CZ | 26.05.2010 | |
DK | 26.05.2010 | ||
EE | 26.05.2010 | ||
FI | 26.05.2010 | ||
LT | 26.05.2010 | ||
LV | 26.05.2010 | ||
MT | 26.05.2010 | ||
PL | 26.05.2010 | ||
RO | 26.05.2010 | ||
SI | 26.05.2010 | ||
CY | 02.06.2010 | ||
BG | 26.08.2010 | ||
GR | 27.08.2010 | ||
IS | 26.09.2010 | ||
PT | 27.09.2010 | ||
Former [2012/05] | CZ | 26.05.2010 | |
DK | 26.05.2010 | ||
EE | 26.05.2010 | ||
FI | 26.05.2010 | ||
LT | 26.05.2010 | ||
LV | 26.05.2010 | ||
MT | 26.05.2010 | ||
PL | 26.05.2010 | ||
RO | 26.05.2010 | ||
SI | 26.05.2010 | ||
CY | 02.06.2010 | ||
GR | 27.08.2010 | ||
IS | 26.09.2010 | ||
PT | 27.09.2010 | ||
Former [2011/25] | CZ | 26.05.2010 | |
DK | 26.05.2010 | ||
EE | 26.05.2010 | ||
FI | 26.05.2010 | ||
LT | 26.05.2010 | ||
LV | 26.05.2010 | ||
PL | 26.05.2010 | ||
RO | 26.05.2010 | ||
SI | 26.05.2010 | ||
CY | 02.06.2010 | ||
GR | 27.08.2010 | ||
IS | 26.09.2010 | ||
PT | 27.09.2010 | Cited in | International search | [DX]EP1362879 (MNEMOSCIENCE GMBH [DE]) [DX] 1-16* the whole document *; | [X]WO2004046221 (MNEMOSCIENCE GMBH [DE], et al) [X] 1-16 * the whole document *; | [X]WO2004090042 (MNEMOSCIENCE GMBH [DE], et al) [X] 1-16 * the whole document * | by applicant | WO2004046221 | WO2004090042 |