EP1996456 - BOLTED JOINT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 31.12.2010 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.10.2012 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 21.11.2012 [2012/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Airbus Deutschland GmbH Kreetslag 10 21129 Hamburg / DE | [2008/49] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
STEINKE, Uwe Heidblick 21 21149 Hamburg / DE | [2008/49] | Representative(s) | Peckmann, Ralf ADDRESS INACTIVE - USE ASS-NR - CDR / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/49] | Peckmann, Ralf Reinhard, Skuhra, Weise & Partner GbR Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Friedrichstrasse 31 80801 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 07727004.9 | 16.03.2007 | [2008/49] | WO2007EP52525 | Priority number, date | DE20061013068 | 22.03.2006 Original published format: DE102006013068 | DE20061058140 | 09.12.2006 Original published format: DE102006058140 | [2008/49] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2007107520 | Date: | 27.09.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/39] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1996456 | Date: | 03.12.2008 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.09.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/49] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1996456 | Date: | 24.02.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/08] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 31.01.2008 | Classification | IPC: | B64C1/00, B64C5/02 | [2008/49] | CPC: |
B64C1/06 (EP,US);
F16B3/06 (EP,US);
F16B35/041 (EP,US);
F16B39/101 (EP,US);
F16B5/025 (EP,US);
B64C2001/0081 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/49] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SCHRAUBENVERBINDUNG | [2008/49] | English: | BOLTED JOINT | [2008/49] | French: | JOINT BOULONNE | [2008/49] | Entry into regional phase | 24.07.2008 | National basic fee paid | 24.07.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.07.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.07.2008 | Examination requested [2008/49] | 04.02.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.05.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.09.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.12.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 29.12.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 25.11.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/05] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.03.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 24.02.2010 | BE | 24.02.2010 | CY | 24.02.2010 | CZ | 24.02.2010 | DK | 24.02.2010 | EE | 24.02.2010 | FI | 24.02.2010 | LT | 24.02.2010 | LV | 24.02.2010 | MT | 24.02.2010 | NL | 24.02.2010 | PL | 24.02.2010 | RO | 24.02.2010 | SE | 24.02.2010 | SI | 24.02.2010 | SK | 24.02.2010 | TR | 24.02.2010 | IE | 16.03.2010 | LU | 16.03.2010 | MC | 31.03.2010 | BG | 24.05.2010 | GR | 25.05.2010 | ES | 04.06.2010 | IS | 24.06.2010 | PT | 25.06.2010 | HU | 25.08.2010 | [2012/47] |
Former [2012/43] | AT | 24.02.2010 | |
BE | 24.02.2010 | ||
CY | 24.02.2010 | ||
CZ | 24.02.2010 | ||
DK | 24.02.2010 | ||
EE | 24.02.2010 | ||
FI | 24.02.2010 | ||
LT | 24.02.2010 | ||
LV | 24.02.2010 | ||
MT | 24.02.2010 | ||
NL | 24.02.2010 | ||
PL | 24.02.2010 | ||
RO | 24.02.2010 | ||
SE | 24.02.2010 | ||
SI | 24.02.2010 | ||
SK | 24.02.2010 | ||
IE | 16.03.2010 | ||
LU | 16.03.2010 | ||
MC | 31.03.2010 | ||
BG | 24.05.2010 | ||
GR | 25.05.2010 | ||
ES | 04.06.2010 | ||
IS | 24.06.2010 | ||
PT | 25.06.2010 | ||
HU | 25.08.2010 | ||
Former [2012/42] | AT | 24.02.2010 | |
BE | 24.02.2010 | ||
CY | 24.02.2010 | ||
CZ | 24.02.2010 | ||
DK | 24.02.2010 | ||
EE | 24.02.2010 | ||
FI | 24.02.2010 | ||
LT | 24.02.2010 | ||
LV | 24.02.2010 | ||
MT | 24.02.2010 | ||
NL | 24.02.2010 | ||
PL | 24.02.2010 | ||
RO | 24.02.2010 | ||
SE | 24.02.2010 | ||
SI | 24.02.2010 | ||
SK | 24.02.2010 | ||
IE | 16.03.2010 | ||
MC | 31.03.2010 | ||
BG | 24.05.2010 | ||
GR | 25.05.2010 | ||
ES | 04.06.2010 | ||
IS | 24.06.2010 | ||
PT | 25.06.2010 | ||
HU | 25.08.2010 | ||
Former [2011/26] | AT | 24.02.2010 | |
BE | 24.02.2010 | ||
CY | 24.02.2010 | ||
CZ | 24.02.2010 | ||
DK | 24.02.2010 | ||
EE | 24.02.2010 | ||
FI | 24.02.2010 | ||
LT | 24.02.2010 | ||
LV | 24.02.2010 | ||
MT | 24.02.2010 | ||
NL | 24.02.2010 | ||
PL | 24.02.2010 | ||
RO | 24.02.2010 | ||
SE | 24.02.2010 | ||
SI | 24.02.2010 | ||
SK | 24.02.2010 | ||
IE | 16.03.2010 | ||
MC | 31.03.2010 | ||
BG | 24.05.2010 | ||
GR | 25.05.2010 | ||
ES | 04.06.2010 | ||
IS | 24.06.2010 | ||
PT | 25.06.2010 | ||
Former [2011/25] | AT | 24.02.2010 | |
BE | 24.02.2010 | ||
CY | 24.02.2010 | ||
CZ | 24.02.2010 | ||
DK | 24.02.2010 | ||
EE | 24.02.2010 | ||
FI | 24.02.2010 | ||
LT | 24.02.2010 | ||
LV | 24.02.2010 | ||
MT | 24.02.2010 | ||
NL | 24.02.2010 | ||
PL | 24.02.2010 | ||
RO | 24.02.2010 | ||
SE | 24.02.2010 | ||
SI | 24.02.2010 | ||
SK | 24.02.2010 | ||
IE | 16.03.2010 | ||
IT | 16.03.2010 | ||
MC | 31.03.2010 | ||
BG | 24.05.2010 | ||
GR | 25.05.2010 | ||
ES | 04.06.2010 | ||
IS | 24.06.2010 | ||
PT | 25.06.2010 | ||
Former [2010/45] | AT | 24.02.2010 | |
FI | 24.02.2010 | ||
LT | 24.02.2010 | ||
LV | 24.02.2010 | ||
NL | 24.02.2010 | ||
PL | 24.02.2010 | ||
SI | 24.02.2010 | ||
MC | 31.03.2010 | ||
IS | 24.06.2010 | ||
PT | 25.06.2010 | ||
Former [2010/43] | AT | 24.02.2010 | |
FI | 24.02.2010 | ||
LT | 24.02.2010 | ||
LV | 24.02.2010 | ||
PL | 24.02.2010 | ||
SI | 24.02.2010 | ||
IS | 24.06.2010 | ||
PT | 25.06.2010 | Cited in | International search | [A]FR2574135 (OLIN CORP [US]); | [Y]US2003108398 (SATHIANATHAN SIVASUBRAMANIUM K [GB]); | [Y]US2005262682 (GROVER CHRISTIAN [DE], et al) |