EP2004385 - VARIABLE MULTIPLE PARISON EXTRUSION HEAD HAVING AN ELECTRICALLY OPERATED ACTUATOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 18.03.2011 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.03.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 20.04.2011 [2011/16] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TECHNE TECHNIPACK ENGINEERING ITALIA S.p.A. Via della Tecnica 1 40023 Castel Guelfo (BO) / IT | [2009/25] |
Former [2008/52] | For all designated states TECHNE TECHNIPACK ENGINEERING ITALIA S.p.A. Via Della Tecnica 53 40068 San Lazzaro di Savena / IT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CASTELLARI, Fabrizio Via Tomba Forella 9/C I-40068 SAN LAZZARO DI SAVENA / IT | 02 /
SGARGI, Enzo Via Chiarini 17 I-40013 Castelmaggiore / IT | [2009/23] |
Former [2008/52] | 01 /
CASTELLARI, Fabrizio Via Larga 34/2 I-40138 Bologna / IT | ||
02 /
SGARGI, Enzo Via Chiarini 17 I-40013 Castelmaggiore / IT | Representative(s) | Porsia, Dino, et al c/o Succ. Ing. Fischetti & Weber Via Caffaro 3/2 16124 Genova / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2008/52] | Porsia, Dino, et al c/o Succ. Ing. Fischetti & Weber Via Caffaro 3/2 16124 Genova / IT | Application number, filing date | 07727237.5 | 22.03.2007 | [2008/52] | WO2007EP52763 | Priority number, date | IT2006BO00269 | 12.04.2006 Original published format: IT BO20060269 | [2008/52] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2007115921 | Date: | 18.10.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/42] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2004385 | Date: | 24.12.2008 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.10.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/52] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 18.10.2007 | Classification | IPC: | B29C47/92, B29C47/22, B29C49/04 | [2008/52] | CPC: |
B29C48/2528 (EP,US);
B29C48/09 (EP,US);
B29C48/10 (US);
B29C48/13 (EP,US);
B29C48/92 (EP,US);
B29C2948/92533 (EP,US);
B29C2948/9259 (EP,US);
B29C2948/926 (EP,US);
B29C2948/92609 (EP,US);
B29C2948/92647 (EP,US);
B29C2948/92809 (EP,US);
B29C2948/92904 (EP,US);
B29C2948/92923 (EP,US);
B29C48/325 (EP,US);
B29C49/04 (EP,US);
B29C49/04108 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/52] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VARIABLER MEHRFACHVORFORMLINGEXTRUSIONSKOPF MIT EINEM ELEKTRISCH BETRIEBENEN STELLGLIED | [2008/52] | English: | VARIABLE MULTIPLE PARISON EXTRUSION HEAD HAVING AN ELECTRICALLY OPERATED ACTUATOR | [2008/52] | French: | TETE D'EXTRUDEUSE VARIABLE A PARAISONS MULTIPLES EQUIPEE D'UN ACTIONNEUR A COMMANDE ELECTRIQUE | [2008/52] | Entry into regional phase | 16.10.2008 | National basic fee paid | 16.10.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.10.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.10.2008 | Examination requested [2008/52] | 15.01.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.04.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.10.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2011/16] | 05.11.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2011/16] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.03.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2010 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [YA]US3186032 (FREDERICK HARWOOD NORMAN) [Y] 1 * column 2, line 55 - column 3, line 39; figure 3 * [A] 2; | [A]US3564653 (SPARKS GEORGE H, et al) [A] 1,2* column 3, line 41 - line 71; figures 1-3 *; | [YA]GB1431083 (BONE CRAVENS LTD) [Y] 1 * page 1, line 10 - page 2, line 12 * * page 2, line 58 - line 72 * [A] 2 |