EP2001536 - PACKAGING MEANS FOR MULTI-DOSE POWDER INHALERS WITH OPTIMIZED DISCHARGING PROPERTIES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 23.02.2018 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 28.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.02.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 28.03.2018 [2018/13] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Boehringer Ingelheim International GmbH Binger Strasse 173 55216 Ingelheim / DE | [2008/51] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WACHTEL, Herbert Im Muehlengarten 4 55218 Ingelheim am Rhein / DE | [2008/51] | Representative(s) | Simon, Elke Anna Maria, et al Boehringer Ingelheim GmbH Binger Strasse 173 55216 Ingelheim am Rhein / DE | [2012/40] |
Former [2008/51] | Hammann, Heinz Boehringer Ingelheim GmbH CD-Patents Binger Strasse 173 55216 Ingelheim am Rhein / DE | Application number, filing date | 07727327.4 | 26.03.2007 | [2008/51] | WO2007EP52854 | Priority number, date | DE20061014434 | 27.03.2006 Original published format: DE102006014434 | [2008/51] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2007110402 | Date: | 04.10.2007 | Language: | DE | [2007/40] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2001536 | Date: | 17.12.2008 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.10.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/51] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 04.10.2007 | Classification | IPC: | A61M15/00 | [2008/51] | CPC: |
A61M15/00 (KR);
A61M15/0045 (EP,US);
A61M15/0048 (EP,US);
A61M15/0051 (EP,US);
A61M2202/064 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/51] | Title | German: | PACKMITTEL FÜR MEHRDOSISPULVERINHALATOREN MIT OPTIMIERTEN ENTLEERUNGSEIGENSCHAFTEN | [2008/51] | English: | PACKAGING MEANS FOR MULTI-DOSE POWDER INHALERS WITH OPTIMIZED DISCHARGING PROPERTIES | [2008/51] | French: | EMBALLAGE POUR INHALATEUR DE POUDRE MULTIDOSE AVEC PROPRIETES OPTIMISEES DE PURGE | [2008/51] | Entry into regional phase | 27.10.2008 | National basic fee paid | 27.10.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.10.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.10.2008 | Examination requested [2008/51] | 07.02.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 07.08.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.09.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 18.03.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.07.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.11.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.06.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.10.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2018/13] | 14.11.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2018/13] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 07.02.2012 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.03.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 02.04.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 31.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 31.03.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 31.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 31.03.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 11 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]US6328034 (EISELE ROBERT F [US], et al) [X] 1-7,12 * figures 2,21 *; | [X]US2005103337 (HICKEY ANTHONY JAMES [US], et al) [X] 1-6,8,12 * figures 3A,4B *; | [X]US6810872 (OHKI HISATOMO [JP], et al) [X] 1-6,9,12 * figures 1,33 *; | [X]GB2340758 (BESPAK PLC [GB]) [X] 1-6,9,12 * figures 1A-1C,9A-9C * | Examination | US5921236 | WO02098495 |