EP2134762 - INSULATED PIPES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent revoked Status updated on 22.07.2016 Database last updated on 19.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.06.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 27.07.2022 [2022/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BASF SE Carl-Bosch-Strasse 38 67056 Ludwigshafen am Rhein / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2014/21] | For all designated states BASF SE 67056 Ludwigshafen / DE | ||
Former [2009/52] | For all designated states BASF SE 67056 Ludwigshafen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GRIESER-SCHMITZ, Christof Richthofenweg 43 49088 Osnabrück / DE | 02 /
LINDEMANN, Wilhelm Bergstrasse 37 32361 Preussisch Oldendorf / DE | [2009/52] | Representative(s) | Altmann Stößel Dick Patentanwälte PartG mbB Isartorplatz 1 80331 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/40] | Altmann, Andreas Herzog Fiesser & Partner Patentanwälte Isartorplatz 1 80331 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 07727639.2 | 02.04.2007 | [2009/52] | WO2007EP53167 | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2008119388 | Date: | 09.10.2008 | Language: | DE | [2008/41] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2134762 | Date: | 23.12.2009 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.10.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/52] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2134762 | Date: | 21.05.2014 | Language: | DE | [2014/21] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 09.10.2008 | Classification | IPC: | C08G18/66, F16L59/14, B29C44/12 | [2009/52] | CPC: |
C08G18/48 (EP,US);
B29C44/12 (KR);
B29C44/1242 (EP,US);
C08G18/66 (KR);
C08G18/6674 (EP,US);
F16L59/14 (KR);
B29L2023/225 (EP,US);
C08G2110/0025 (EP,US);
C08G2115/02 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/52] | Title | German: | GEDÄMMTE ROHRE | [2009/52] | English: | INSULATED PIPES | [2009/52] | French: | TUBES ISOLÉS | [2009/52] | Entry into regional phase | 02.11.2009 | National basic fee paid | 02.11.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.11.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.01.2009 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 02.11.2009 | Examination requested [2009/52] | 05.12.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.04.2014 | Fee for grant paid | 10.04.2014 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 10.04.2014 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 05.12.2013 | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
20.02.2015
25.02.2015
ADMISSIBLE Covestro Deutschland AG Kaiser-Wilhelm-Allee 60 51373 Leverkussen / DE Opponent's representative Michalski Hüttermann & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Kaistraße 16A 40221 Düsseldorf / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2015/44] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
20.02.2015
25.02.2015
ADMISSIBLE Covestro Deutschland AG Kaiser-Wilhelm-Allee 60 51373 Leverkussen / DE Opponent's representative Michalski Hüttermann & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Speditionstraße 21 40221 Düsseldorf / DE | ||
Former [2015/14] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
20.02.2015
25.02.2015
ADMISSIBLE Bayer MaterialScience AG Kaiser-Wilhelm-Allee 60 51373 Leverkusen / DE Opponent's representative Michalski Hüttermann & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Speditionstraße 21 40221 Düsseldorf / DE | 31.03.2015 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 06.08.2015 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 04.04.2016 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked | 14.04.2016 | Legal effect of revocation of patent [2016/34] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.11.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.05.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 02.05.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 02.05.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 31.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | BG | 21.05.2014 | CH | 21.05.2014 | CY | 21.05.2014 | CZ | 21.05.2014 | EE | 21.05.2014 | ES | 21.05.2014 | LI | 21.05.2014 | LT | 21.05.2014 | LV | 21.05.2014 | MC | 21.05.2014 | MT | 21.05.2014 | RO | 21.05.2014 | SI | 21.05.2014 | SK | 21.05.2014 | GR | 22.08.2014 | PT | 22.09.2014 | IE | 02.04.2015 | LU | 02.04.2015 | IT | 02.04.2016 | TR | 02.04.2016 | HU | 03.04.2016 | [2022/30] |
Former [2020/21] | BG | 21.05.2014 | |
CH | 21.05.2014 | ||
CY | 21.05.2014 | ||
CZ | 21.05.2014 | ||
EE | 21.05.2014 | ||
ES | 21.05.2014 | ||
LI | 21.05.2014 | ||
LT | 21.05.2014 | ||
LV | 21.05.2014 | ||
MC | 21.05.2014 | ||
MT | 21.05.2014 | ||
RO | 21.05.2014 | ||
SI | 21.05.2014 | ||
SK | 21.05.2014 | ||
GR | 22.08.2014 | ||
PT | 22.09.2014 | ||
IE | 02.04.2015 | ||
LU | 02.04.2015 | ||
IT | 02.04.2016 | ||
HU | 03.04.2016 | ||
Former [2019/38] | BG | 21.05.2014 | |
CH | 21.05.2014 | ||
CZ | 21.05.2014 | ||
EE | 21.05.2014 | ||
ES | 21.05.2014 | ||
LI | 21.05.2014 | ||
LT | 21.05.2014 | ||
LV | 21.05.2014 | ||
MC | 21.05.2014 | ||
MT | 21.05.2014 | ||
RO | 21.05.2014 | ||
SI | 21.05.2014 | ||
SK | 21.05.2014 | ||
GR | 22.08.2014 | ||
PT | 22.09.2014 | ||
IE | 02.04.2015 | ||
LU | 02.04.2015 | ||
IT | 02.04.2016 | ||
HU | 03.04.2016 | ||
Former [2018/35] | CH | 21.05.2014 | |
CZ | 21.05.2014 | ||
EE | 21.05.2014 | ||
ES | 21.05.2014 | ||
LI | 21.05.2014 | ||
LT | 21.05.2014 | ||
LV | 21.05.2014 | ||
MC | 21.05.2014 | ||
MT | 21.05.2014 | ||
RO | 21.05.2014 | ||
SI | 21.05.2014 | ||
SK | 21.05.2014 | ||
GR | 22.08.2014 | ||
PT | 22.09.2014 | ||
IE | 02.04.2015 | ||
LU | 02.04.2015 | ||
IT | 02.04.2016 | ||
HU | 03.04.2016 | ||
Former [2017/13] | CH | 21.05.2014 | |
CZ | 21.05.2014 | ||
EE | 21.05.2014 | ||
ES | 21.05.2014 | ||
LI | 21.05.2014 | ||
LT | 21.05.2014 | ||
LV | 21.05.2014 | ||
MC | 21.05.2014 | ||
RO | 21.05.2014 | ||
SI | 21.05.2014 | ||
SK | 21.05.2014 | ||
GR | 22.08.2014 | ||
PT | 22.09.2014 | ||
IE | 02.04.2015 | ||
LU | 02.04.2015 | ||
IT | 02.04.2016 | ||
HU | 03.04.2016 | ||
Former [2017/08] | CH | 21.05.2014 | |
CZ | 21.05.2014 | ||
EE | 21.05.2014 | ||
ES | 21.05.2014 | ||
LI | 21.05.2014 | ||
LT | 21.05.2014 | ||
LV | 21.05.2014 | ||
MC | 21.05.2014 | ||
RO | 21.05.2014 | ||
SI | 21.05.2014 | ||
SK | 21.05.2014 | ||
GR | 22.08.2014 | ||
PT | 22.09.2014 | ||
IE | 02.04.2015 | ||
LU | 02.04.2015 | ||
HU | 03.04.2016 | ||
Former [2016/46] | CH | 21.05.2014 | |
CZ | 21.05.2014 | ||
EE | 21.05.2014 | ||
ES | 21.05.2014 | ||
LI | 21.05.2014 | ||
LT | 21.05.2014 | ||
LV | 21.05.2014 | ||
MC | 21.05.2014 | ||
RO | 21.05.2014 | ||
SI | 21.05.2014 | ||
SK | 21.05.2014 | ||
GR | 22.08.2014 | ||
PT | 22.09.2014 | ||
IE | 02.04.2015 | ||
LU | 02.04.2015 | ||
Former [2016/20] | CZ | 21.05.2014 | |
EE | 21.05.2014 | ||
ES | 21.05.2014 | ||
LT | 21.05.2014 | ||
LV | 21.05.2014 | ||
MC | 21.05.2014 | ||
RO | 21.05.2014 | ||
SI | 21.05.2014 | ||
SK | 21.05.2014 | ||
GR | 22.08.2014 | ||
PT | 22.09.2014 | ||
IE | 02.04.2015 | ||
LU | 02.04.2015 | ||
Former [2016/01] | CZ | 21.05.2014 | |
EE | 21.05.2014 | ||
ES | 21.05.2014 | ||
LT | 21.05.2014 | ||
LV | 21.05.2014 | ||
MC | 21.05.2014 | ||
RO | 21.05.2014 | ||
SI | 21.05.2014 | ||
SK | 21.05.2014 | ||
GR | 22.08.2014 | ||
PT | 22.09.2014 | ||
LU | 02.04.2015 | ||
Former [2015/52] | CZ | 21.05.2014 | |
EE | 21.05.2014 | ||
ES | 21.05.2014 | ||
LT | 21.05.2014 | ||
LV | 21.05.2014 | ||
RO | 21.05.2014 | ||
SI | 21.05.2014 | ||
SK | 21.05.2014 | ||
GR | 22.08.2014 | ||
PT | 22.09.2014 | ||
LU | 02.04.2015 | ||
Former [2015/36] | CZ | 21.05.2014 | |
EE | 21.05.2014 | ||
ES | 21.05.2014 | ||
LT | 21.05.2014 | ||
LV | 21.05.2014 | ||
RO | 21.05.2014 | ||
SI | 21.05.2014 | ||
SK | 21.05.2014 | ||
GR | 22.08.2014 | ||
PT | 22.09.2014 | ||
Former [2015/11] | CZ | 21.05.2014 | |
EE | 21.05.2014 | ||
ES | 21.05.2014 | ||
LT | 21.05.2014 | ||
LV | 21.05.2014 | ||
RO | 21.05.2014 | ||
SK | 21.05.2014 | ||
GR | 22.08.2014 | ||
PT | 22.09.2014 | ||
Former [2015/10] | CZ | 21.05.2014 | |
EE | 21.05.2014 | ||
ES | 21.05.2014 | ||
LT | 21.05.2014 | ||
LV | 21.05.2014 | ||
SK | 21.05.2014 | ||
GR | 22.08.2014 | ||
PT | 22.09.2014 | ||
Former [2015/02] | ES | 21.05.2014 | |
LT | 21.05.2014 | ||
LV | 21.05.2014 | ||
GR | 22.08.2014 | ||
PT | 22.09.2014 | ||
Former [2014/50] | ES | 21.05.2014 | |
LT | 21.05.2014 | ||
LV | 21.05.2014 | ||
GR | 22.08.2014 | ||
Former [2014/48] | LT | 21.05.2014 | Cited in | International search | [X]WO0039497 (SHELL INT RESEARCH [NL], et al) [X] 1,10,12 * page 2, line 32 - page 6, line 30 * * page 9, line 7 - line 27; example 1; claims 1-4,6 *; | [X]US2004048015 (BERGER NOEELLE [FR]) [X] 1 * paragraph [0017] - paragraph [0046]; examples 7,8 * * paragraph [0070] - paragraph [0075]; figures 1-8; claims 1-6 *; | [E]EP1783152 (BASF AG [DE]) [E] 1-12 * the whole document *; | [E]EP1777244 (BASF AG [DE]) [E] 1 * paragraph [0006] - paragraph [0010]; claims 1-16 *; | [Y]US4307756 (VOIGT HERMANN-UWE, et al) [Y] 1-12 * claim 1 *; | [DY]DE102004001317 (BASF AG [DE]) [DY] 1 * paragraph [0011] - paragraph [0052]; claims 1-10 *; | [Y]EP1595904 (BASF AG [DE]) [Y] 1-12 * paragraph [0007] - paragraph [0061]; claims 1-6 * |