EP2004647 - HIV INHIBITING 3,4-DIHYDRO-IMIDAZOÝ4,5-B PYRIDIN-5-ONES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 19.04.2013 Database last updated on 13.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.04.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 22.05.2013 [2013/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Tibotec Pharmaceuticals Eastgate Village Eastgate Little Island Co Cork / IE | [2009/46] |
Former [2008/52] | For all designated states Tibotec Pharmaceuticals Ltd. Eastgate Village Eastgate Little Island Co Cork / IE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KESTELEYN, Bart Rudolf Romanie Weidelandstraat 18 9290 Berlare / BE | 02 /
SCHEPENS, Wim Bert Griet Guldenstraat 5 2800 Mechelen / BE | 03 /
AMSSOMS, Katie, Ingrid, Eduard Lijsterbessenweg 22 2540 Hove / BE | [2010/01] |
Former [2008/52] | 01 /
KESTELEYN, Bart Rudolf Romanie Weidelandstraat 18 9290 Berlare / BE | ||
02 /
SCHEPENS, Wim Bert Griet Eikem 8 9230 Wetteren / BE | |||
03 /
AMSSOMS, Katie, Ingrid, Eduard Lijsterbessenweg 22 2540 Hove / BE | Representative(s) | Daelemans, Frank F.R., et al J&J Patent Law Department Turnhoutseweg 30 2340 Beerse / BE | [2010/34] |
Former [2009/29] | Wante, Dirk Paul Maria Tibotec-Virco Comm. VA J&J Patent Law Department Generaal De Wittelaan L11 B3 2800 Mechelen / BE | ||
Former [2008/52] | Wante, Dirk Paul Maria Tibotec-Virco Comm. VA J&J Patent law department Generaal De Wittelaan L 11B 3 B-2800 Mechelen / BE | Application number, filing date | 07727678.0 | 03.04.2007 | [2008/52] | WO2007EP53207 | Priority number, date | EP20060112173 | 03.04.2006 Original published format: EP 06112173 | [2008/52] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2007113290 | Date: | 11.10.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/41] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2004647 | Date: | 24.12.2008 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.10.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/52] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 11.10.2007 | Classification | IPC: | C07D471/14, C07D471/22, C07D495/22, C07D513/14, C07D519/00, A61K31/437, A61K31/4375, A61K31/444, A61K31/496, A61K31/5025, A61K31/519, A61K31/5377, A61P31/18 | [2008/52] | CPC: |
C07D513/14 (EP,US);
A61P31/18 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP);
C07D471/14 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/52] | Extension states | AL | 03.11.2008 | BA | 03.11.2008 | HR | 03.11.2008 | MK | 03.11.2008 | RS | 03.11.2008 | Title | German: | HIV-INHIBIERENDE 3,4-DIHYDROIMIDAZO[4,5-B]PYRIDIN-5-ONE | [2008/52] | English: | HIV INHIBITING 3,4-DIHYDRO-IMIDAZOÝ4,5-B PYRIDIN-5-ONES | [2008/52] | French: | 3,4-DIHYDRO-IMIDAZOÝ4,5-B PYRIDIN-5-ONES INHIBANT LE VIH | [2008/52] | Entry into regional phase | 03.11.2008 | National basic fee paid | 03.11.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 03.11.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 03.11.2008 | Examination requested [2008/52] | 25.02.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 10.08.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.11.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2013/21] | 19.12.2012 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2013/21] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 25.02.2009 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 04.05.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 03.05.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.05.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.2012 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XD]WO2005110411 (TIBOTEC PHARM LTD [IE], et al) [XD] 1-11 * the whole document * |