EP2010845 - SHELF BOTTOM FOR A REFRIGERATOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.11.2018 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 15.12.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 17.09.2017 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 05.09.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 05.06.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.06.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU, PT | published on 08.07.2020 [2020/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BSH Hausgeräte GmbH Carl-Wery-Strasse 34 81739 München / DE | [2015/13] |
Former [2009/02] | For all designated states BSH Bosch und Siemens Hausgeräte GmbH Carl-Wery-Str. 34 81739 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KNÖLL, Sebastian Jella Lepman Strasse 15 81673 München / DE | 02 /
RICKET, Matthew 3301 Hedgerow Circle 28562 New Bern, Nc / US | 03 /
BUSALT, Gerhard Aubergstrasse 1 83352 Altenmarkt/Alz / DE | 04 /
SCHRANKL, Hermann Gewerbering 4 84518 Garching / DE | 05 /
LINKE, Christine Bächinger Strasse 34a 89423 Gundelfingen / DE | [2009/11] |
Former [2009/02] | 01 /
KNÖLL, Sebastian Plecherstr. 6 81541 München / DE | ||
02 /
RICKET, Matthew 3301 Hedgerow Circle 28562 New Bern, Nc / US | |||
03 /
BUSALT, Gerhard Aubergstrasse 1 83352 Altenmarkt/Alz / DE | |||
04 /
SCHRANKL, Hermann Gewerbering 4 84518 Garching / DE | |||
05 /
LINKE, Christine Bächinger Strasse 34a 89423 Gundelfingen / DE | Application number, filing date | 07727852.1 | 05.04.2007 | [2009/02] | WO2007EP53384 | Priority number, date | DE20061018203 | 19.04.2006 Original published format: DE102006018203 | [2009/02] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2007118805 | Date: | 25.10.2007 | Language: | DE | [2007/43] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2010845 | Date: | 07.01.2009 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.10.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/02] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2010845 | Date: | 17.01.2018 | Language: | DE | [2018/03] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 13.12.2007 | Classification | IPC: | F25D25/02, A47B96/02 | [2009/02] | CPC: |
F25D25/024 (EP);
A47B2210/01 (EP);
A47B2210/04 (EP);
F25D2325/022 (EP);
F25D2325/023 (EP);
F25D2331/803 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2018/03] |
Former [2009/02] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | FACHBODEN FÜR EIN KÄLTEGERÄT | [2009/02] | English: | SHELF BOTTOM FOR A REFRIGERATOR | [2009/02] | French: | ÉTAGÈRE POUR UN APPAREIL DE RÉFRIGÉRATION | [2009/02] | Entry into regional phase | 19.11.2008 | National basic fee paid | 19.11.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.11.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.11.2008 | Examination requested [2009/02] | 15.04.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 25.09.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.06.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.08.2017 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 18.09.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.12.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 01.12.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 01.12.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 15.04.2015 | Opposition(s) | 18.10.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/52] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 04.05.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 03.05.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.05.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 02.05.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 02.05.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 30.04.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 30.04.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 02.05.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 02.05.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 11 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 05.04.2007 | CY | 17.01.2018 | CZ | 17.01.2018 | DK | 17.01.2018 | EE | 17.01.2018 | ES | 17.01.2018 | FI | 17.01.2018 | LT | 17.01.2018 | LV | 17.01.2018 | MC | 17.01.2018 | MT | 17.01.2018 | NL | 17.01.2018 | PT | 17.01.2018 | RO | 17.01.2018 | SE | 17.01.2018 | SI | 17.01.2018 | SK | 17.01.2018 | AT | 05.04.2018 | IE | 05.04.2018 | LU | 05.04.2018 | BG | 17.04.2018 | GB | 17.04.2018 | GR | 18.04.2018 | BE | 30.04.2018 | CH | 30.04.2018 | FR | 30.04.2018 | LI | 30.04.2018 | IS | 17.05.2018 | [2020/27] |
Former [2019/46] | CY | 17.01.2018 | |
CZ | 17.01.2018 | ||
DK | 17.01.2018 | ||
EE | 17.01.2018 | ||
ES | 17.01.2018 | ||
FI | 17.01.2018 | ||
LT | 17.01.2018 | ||
LV | 17.01.2018 | ||
MC | 17.01.2018 | ||
MT | 17.01.2018 | ||
NL | 17.01.2018 | ||
RO | 17.01.2018 | ||
SE | 17.01.2018 | ||
SI | 17.01.2018 | ||
SK | 17.01.2018 | ||
AT | 05.04.2018 | ||
IE | 05.04.2018 | ||
LU | 05.04.2018 | ||
BG | 17.04.2018 | ||
GB | 17.04.2018 | ||
GR | 18.04.2018 | ||
BE | 30.04.2018 | ||
CH | 30.04.2018 | ||
FR | 30.04.2018 | ||
LI | 30.04.2018 | ||
IS | 17.05.2018 | ||
Former [2019/23] | CY | 17.01.2018 | |
CZ | 17.01.2018 | ||
DK | 17.01.2018 | ||
EE | 17.01.2018 | ||
ES | 17.01.2018 | ||
FI | 17.01.2018 | ||
LT | 17.01.2018 | ||
LV | 17.01.2018 | ||
MC | 17.01.2018 | ||
MT | 17.01.2018 | ||
NL | 17.01.2018 | ||
RO | 17.01.2018 | ||
SE | 17.01.2018 | ||
SI | 17.01.2018 | ||
SK | 17.01.2018 | ||
IE | 05.04.2018 | ||
LU | 05.04.2018 | ||
BG | 17.04.2018 | ||
GB | 17.04.2018 | ||
GR | 18.04.2018 | ||
BE | 30.04.2018 | ||
CH | 30.04.2018 | ||
FR | 30.04.2018 | ||
LI | 30.04.2018 | ||
IS | 17.05.2018 | ||
Former [2019/19] | CY | 17.01.2018 | |
CZ | 17.01.2018 | ||
DK | 17.01.2018 | ||
EE | 17.01.2018 | ||
ES | 17.01.2018 | ||
FI | 17.01.2018 | ||
LT | 17.01.2018 | ||
LV | 17.01.2018 | ||
MC | 17.01.2018 | ||
MT | 17.01.2018 | ||
NL | 17.01.2018 | ||
RO | 17.01.2018 | ||
SE | 17.01.2018 | ||
SI | 17.01.2018 | ||
SK | 17.01.2018 | ||
IE | 05.04.2018 | ||
LU | 05.04.2018 | ||
BG | 17.04.2018 | ||
GB | 17.04.2018 | ||
GR | 18.04.2018 | ||
BE | 30.04.2018 | ||
CH | 30.04.2018 | ||
LI | 30.04.2018 | ||
IS | 17.05.2018 | ||
Former [2019/12] | CY | 17.01.2018 | |
CZ | 17.01.2018 | ||
DK | 17.01.2018 | ||
EE | 17.01.2018 | ||
ES | 17.01.2018 | ||
FI | 17.01.2018 | ||
LT | 17.01.2018 | ||
LV | 17.01.2018 | ||
MC | 17.01.2018 | ||
MT | 17.01.2018 | ||
NL | 17.01.2018 | ||
RO | 17.01.2018 | ||
SE | 17.01.2018 | ||
SI | 17.01.2018 | ||
SK | 17.01.2018 | ||
LU | 05.04.2018 | ||
BG | 17.04.2018 | ||
GB | 17.04.2018 | ||
GR | 18.04.2018 | ||
BE | 30.04.2018 | ||
CH | 30.04.2018 | ||
LI | 30.04.2018 | ||
IS | 17.05.2018 | ||
Former [2019/08] | CY | 17.01.2018 | |
CZ | 17.01.2018 | ||
DK | 17.01.2018 | ||
EE | 17.01.2018 | ||
ES | 17.01.2018 | ||
FI | 17.01.2018 | ||
LT | 17.01.2018 | ||
LV | 17.01.2018 | ||
MC | 17.01.2018 | ||
MT | 17.01.2018 | ||
NL | 17.01.2018 | ||
RO | 17.01.2018 | ||
SE | 17.01.2018 | ||
SK | 17.01.2018 | ||
LU | 05.04.2018 | ||
BG | 17.04.2018 | ||
GR | 18.04.2018 | ||
IS | 17.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/52] | CY | 17.01.2018 | |
CZ | 17.01.2018 | ||
DK | 17.01.2018 | ||
EE | 17.01.2018 | ||
ES | 17.01.2018 | ||
FI | 17.01.2018 | ||
LT | 17.01.2018 | ||
LV | 17.01.2018 | ||
MC | 17.01.2018 | ||
MT | 17.01.2018 | ||
NL | 17.01.2018 | ||
RO | 17.01.2018 | ||
SE | 17.01.2018 | ||
SK | 17.01.2018 | ||
BG | 17.04.2018 | ||
GR | 18.04.2018 | ||
IS | 17.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/51] | CY | 17.01.2018 | |
CZ | 17.01.2018 | ||
DK | 17.01.2018 | ||
EE | 17.01.2018 | ||
ES | 17.01.2018 | ||
FI | 17.01.2018 | ||
LT | 17.01.2018 | ||
LV | 17.01.2018 | ||
MT | 17.01.2018 | ||
NL | 17.01.2018 | ||
RO | 17.01.2018 | ||
SE | 17.01.2018 | ||
SK | 17.01.2018 | ||
BG | 17.04.2018 | ||
GR | 18.04.2018 | ||
IS | 17.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/50] | CY | 17.01.2018 | |
CZ | 17.01.2018 | ||
EE | 17.01.2018 | ||
ES | 17.01.2018 | ||
FI | 17.01.2018 | ||
LT | 17.01.2018 | ||
LV | 17.01.2018 | ||
MT | 17.01.2018 | ||
NL | 17.01.2018 | ||
RO | 17.01.2018 | ||
SE | 17.01.2018 | ||
SK | 17.01.2018 | ||
BG | 17.04.2018 | ||
GR | 18.04.2018 | ||
IS | 17.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/49] | CY | 17.01.2018 | |
EE | 17.01.2018 | ||
ES | 17.01.2018 | ||
FI | 17.01.2018 | ||
LT | 17.01.2018 | ||
LV | 17.01.2018 | ||
MT | 17.01.2018 | ||
NL | 17.01.2018 | ||
RO | 17.01.2018 | ||
SE | 17.01.2018 | ||
BG | 17.04.2018 | ||
GR | 18.04.2018 | ||
IS | 17.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/43] | CY | 17.01.2018 | |
ES | 17.01.2018 | ||
FI | 17.01.2018 | ||
LT | 17.01.2018 | ||
LV | 17.01.2018 | ||
MT | 17.01.2018 | ||
NL | 17.01.2018 | ||
SE | 17.01.2018 | ||
BG | 17.04.2018 | ||
GR | 18.04.2018 | ||
IS | 17.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/40] | CY | 17.01.2018 | |
ES | 17.01.2018 | ||
FI | 17.01.2018 | ||
LT | 17.01.2018 | ||
LV | 17.01.2018 | ||
NL | 17.01.2018 | ||
SE | 17.01.2018 | ||
BG | 17.04.2018 | ||
GR | 18.04.2018 | ||
IS | 17.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/38] | CY | 17.01.2018 | |
ES | 17.01.2018 | ||
FI | 17.01.2018 | ||
LT | 17.01.2018 | ||
NL | 17.01.2018 | ||
GR | 18.04.2018 | ||
IS | 17.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/37] | CY | 17.01.2018 | |
ES | 17.01.2018 | ||
FI | 17.01.2018 | ||
LT | 17.01.2018 | ||
NL | 17.01.2018 | ||
GR | 18.04.2018 | ||
Former [2018/36] | CY | 17.01.2018 | |
ES | 17.01.2018 | ||
FI | 17.01.2018 | ||
LT | 17.01.2018 | ||
NL | 17.01.2018 | ||
Former [2018/35] | CY | 17.01.2018 | |
FI | 17.01.2018 | ||
LT | 17.01.2018 | ||
NL | 17.01.2018 | ||
Former [2018/34] | FI | 17.01.2018 | |
LT | 17.01.2018 | ||
NL | 17.01.2018 | Cited in | International search | [X]DE9420292U (STELZER RUEHRTECHNIK GMBH [DE]) [X] 1-10 * the whole document *; | [X]EP1431688 (BSH BOSCH SIEMENS HAUSGERAETE [DE]) [X] 1-3,6,7 * the whole document *; | [XAY]US3633983 (WHITCOMB STUART P) [X] 1-3,6 * column 2, line 6 - line 26; figures 1-6 * [A] 12 [Y] 11; | [Y]DE10339935 (BSH BOSCH SIEMENS HAUSGERAETE [DE]) [Y] 11 * figures 4,5 *; | [X]US5332611 (SHANOK WILLIAM [US] ET AL) [X] 1-3,6 * the whole document *; | [X]EP0856712 (PROGRESS S R L [IT]) [X] 1-3,6 * the whole document *; | [X]GB2223671 (GEORGE OLDFIELD LIMITED [GB]) [X] 1 * the whole document *; | [PX]DE202006001832U (BSH BOSCH SIEMENS HAUSGERAETE [DE]) [PX] 1 * the whole document *; | [PX]DE202006001830U (BSH BOSCH SIEMENS HAUSGERAETE [DE]) [PX] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]DE19706285 (BOSCH SIEMENS HAUSGERAETE [DE]) [A] 1,6 * figures 1,2 *; | [A]DE202004013113U (SCHERLE JUERGEN [DE]) [A] 11 * figure 2 *; | [A]US2003173882 (KOONS BILL J [US]) [A] 11 * figure 5 *; | [A]WO03016802 (BSH BOSCH SIEMENS HAUSGERAETE [DE]) [A] 11 * the whole document *; | [A]WO03023295 (BSH BOSCH SIEMENS HAUSGERAETE [DE]; BRACHERT RAINER [DE]; MAYERSHOFER) | Examination | DE9420293U |