EP2021588 - CONTROL VALVE FOR A CAMSHAFT ADJUSTER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.08.2011 Database last updated on 15.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.08.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 14.09.2011 [2011/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Schaeffler Technologies AG & Co. KG Industriestrasse 1-3 91074 Herzogenaurach / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2010/41] | For all designated states Schaeffler Technologies GmbH & Co. KG Industriestrasse 1-3 91074 Herzogenaurach / DE | ||
Former [2010/40] | For all designated states Schaeffler KG Industriestrasse 1-3 91074 Herzogenaurach / DE | ||
Former [2010/40] | For all designated states Schaeffler KG Industriestrasse 1-3 91074 Herzogenaurach / DE | ||
Former [2009/07] | For all designated states Schaeffler KG Industriestrasse 1-3 91074 Herzogenaurach / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HOPPE, Jens Dorfmeisterstrasse 12 91056 Erlangen / DE | 02 /
KONIAS, Stefan Krugstr. 33 90419 Nürnberg / DE | [2009/07] | Application number, filing date | 07728512.0 | 25.04.2007 | [2009/07] | WO2007EP54057 | Priority number, date | DE20061022402 | 13.05.2006 Original published format: DE102006022402 | [2009/07] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2007131866 | Date: | 22.11.2007 | Language: | DE | [2007/47] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2021588 | Date: | 11.02.2009 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.11.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/07] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2021588 | Date: | 06.10.2010 | Language: | DE | [2010/40] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 22.11.2007 | Classification | IPC: | F01L1/34, F16K31/06 | [2009/07] | CPC: |
F01L1/34 (EP,KR,US);
F16K31/06 (KR);
F01L2001/34426 (EP,US);
Y10T137/86702 (EP,US);
Y10T137/8671 (EP,US);
Y10T137/87394 (EP,US);
Y10T137/88054 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, HU, IT, RO [2009/23] |
Former [2009/07] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | STEUERVENTIL FÜR EINEN NOCKENWELLENVERSTELLER | [2009/07] | English: | CONTROL VALVE FOR A CAMSHAFT ADJUSTER | [2009/07] | French: | SOUPAPE DE COMMANDE POUR UN DISPOSITIF DE RÉGLAGE D'ARBRE À CAMES | [2009/07] | Entry into regional phase | 15.12.2008 | National basic fee paid | 15.12.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.12.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.12.2008 | Examination requested [2009/07] | 01.01.2009 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 19.01.2009 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GB, GR, IE, IS, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, SE, SI, SK, TR | 06.08.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.11.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.05.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.08.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 25.08.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 07.07.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/37] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.04.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]EP1447602 (DELPHI TECH INC [US]) [X] 1,3 * figures 2-4 * * abstract *; | [XD]EP1291563 (HYDRAULIK RING GMBH [DE]) [XD] 1,3 * figures 1-4 * * abstract *; | [X]DE2413884 (GEN SIGNAL CORP) [X] 1,2 * figures 1-5 * * abstract * |