EP2019957 - ALUMINIUM HEAT EXCHANGER FOR AN "EGR" SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 09.03.2018 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 03.12.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.03.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 11.04.2018 [2018/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BORGWARNER EMISSIONS SYSTEMS SPAIN, S.L. Carretera de Zamanes 20 36315 Vigo, Pontevedra / ES | [2014/30] |
Former [2009/49] | For all designated states Dytech Ensa, S.L. Carretera de Zamanes 20 36315 Vigo, Pontevedra / ES | ||
Former [2009/06] | For all designated states Dayco Ensa, S.L. Carretera De Zamanes 20 36315 Vigo Pontevedra / ES | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CASTAÑO GONZÁLEZ, Carlos Manuel C/ Costa Castrelos, 2-P, 2·B 36314 Vigo / ES | 02 /
GRANDE FERNÁNDEZ, José Antonio C/ Aragón, 221, 2·C 36210 Vigo / ES | [2009/06] | Representative(s) | Calvo Ramón, Pablo, et al ABG Intellectual Property Avenida de Burgos 16D Edificio Euromor 28036 Madrid / ES | [N/P] |
Former [2011/13] | Calvo Ramón, Pablo, et al ABG Patentes S.L. Avenida de Burgos 16D Edificio Euromor 28036 Madrid / ES | ||
Former [2009/06] | Franzolin, Luigi, et al STUDIO TORTA Via Viotti 9 10121 Torino / IT | Application number, filing date | 07728654.0 | 27.04.2007 | [2009/06] | WO2007EP54200 | Priority number, date | ES20060001102 | 28.04.2006 Original published format: ES 200601102 | [2009/06] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2007125118 | Date: | 08.11.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/45] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2019957 | Date: | 04.02.2009 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.11.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/06] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 08.11.2007 | Classification | IPC: | F28D7/10, F28F1/02, F02M25/07 | [2009/06] | CPC: |
F28F1/022 (EP);
F28D7/106 (ES);
F02M26/26 (EP);
F02M26/32 (EP);
F28D7/10 (EP);
F28D7/103 (EP);
F28D7/16 (ES);
F28F1/42 (ES);
F02M26/11 (EP);
F28D21/0003 (EP);
F28F21/08 (EP);
F28F2255/16 (EP);
F28F9/0219 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/06] | Title | German: | ALUMINIUMWÄRMETAUSCHER FÜR EIN AGR-SYSTEM | [2009/06] | English: | ALUMINIUM HEAT EXCHANGER FOR AN "EGR" SYSTEM | [2009/06] | French: | ECHANGEUR DE CHALEUR EN ALUMINIUM DESTINE A UN SYSTEME 'EGR' | [2009/06] | Entry into regional phase | 28.11.2008 | National basic fee paid | 28.11.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.11.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.11.2008 | Examination requested [2009/06] | 01.08.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 30.01.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.11.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2018/15] | 04.12.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2018/15] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 01.08.2014 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.04.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 21.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 26.03.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 26.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 08.04.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 30.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.2017 | 11   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US3387653 (COE THOMAS D); | [A]EP0218930 (NORSK HYDRO AS [NO]); | [A]DE3731669 (SUEDDEUTSCHE KUEHLER BEHR [DE]); | [A]US4862955 (ITAKURA MASATO [JP]); | [XY]EP0582835 (STEYR NUTZFAHRZEUGE [AT]); | [Y]WO9525937 (HOVAL INTERLIZ AG [LI], et al); | [A]WO9744628 (NITTA MINORU [US]); | [A]WO2004068053 (SAPA PROFILER AB [SE], et al); | [A]US2005016722 (SANDERS CHARLES [US]); | [A]EP1505360 (USUI KOKUSAISANGYO KAISHA LTD [JP]); | [Y]DE10349887 (BENTELER AUTOMOBILTECHNIK GMBH [DE]); | [A]WO2005075928 (BEHR GMBH & CO KG [DE], et al) |