EP2027166 - METHOD FOR PRODUCING ETHYLENE COPOLYMERS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent revoked Status updated on 09.08.2013 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): ES | published on 12.08.2020 [2020/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BASF SE Carl-Bosch-Strasse 38 67056 Ludwigshafen am Rhein / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/09] | For all designated states BASF SE 67056 Ludwigshafen / DE | ||
Former [2008/31] | For all designated states BASF Aktiengesellschaft 67056 Ludwigshafen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MÄHLING, Frank-Olaf Richard-Wagner-Str. 55 68165 Mannheim / DE | 02 /
KASEL, Wolfgang Albert-Schweitzer-Ring 39 69226 Nussloch / DE | 03 /
ZELINSKI, Thomas Kirchengasse 16 67271 Neuleiningen / DE | [2009/09] | Representative(s) | Upschulte, Manfred Alois BASF Schweiz AG Patent Department Klybeckstrasse 141 4057 Basel / CH | [2012/13] | Application number, filing date | 07729178.9 | 16.05.2007 | [2009/09] | WO2007EP54730 | Priority number, date | EP20060114396 | 23.05.2006 Original published format: EP 06114396 | [2009/09] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2007135038 | Date: | 29.11.2007 | Language: | DE | [2007/48] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2027166 | Date: | 25.02.2009 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.11.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/09] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2027166 | Date: | 28.10.2009 | Language: | DE | [2009/44] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 29.11.2007 | Classification | IPC: | C08F210/02, C08F2/00, C08F4/34 | [2009/26] | CPC: |
C08F210/02 (EP,KR,US);
C08F2/00 (KR);
C08F2/40 (KR)
| C-Set: |
C08F210/02, C08F2/00 (EP,US);
C08F210/02, C08F2/001 (US,EP);
C08F210/02, C08F4/34 (US,EP);
C08F210/02, C08F220/00 (EP,US); |
Former IPC [2009/09] | C08F210/02 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/09] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON ETHYLENCOPOLYMEREN | [2009/09] | English: | METHOD FOR PRODUCING ETHYLENE COPOLYMERS | [2009/09] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE PRODUCTION DE COPOLYMÈRES D'ÉTHYLÈNE | [2009/09] | Entry into regional phase | 23.12.2008 | National basic fee paid | 23.12.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.12.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.11.2007 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 23.12.2008 | Examination requested [2009/09] | 22.06.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.09.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 21.09.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
26.07.2010
03.08.2010
ADMISSIBLE THE DOW CHEMICAL CO. 2030 Dow Center Midland, Michigan 48674 / US Opponent's representative Jansen, Cornelis Marinus, et al, et al V.O. Johan de Wittlaan 7 2517 JR Den Haag / NL | [2013/32] |
Former [2010/35] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
26.07.2010
THE DOW CHEMICAL CO. 2030 Dow Center Midland, Michigan 48674 / US Opponent's representative Hatzmann, Martin, et al, et al Vereenigde Johan de Wittlaan 7 2517 JR Den Haag / NL | 03.09.2010 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 10.03.2011 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 18.05.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M06) | 28.09.2011 | Reply to a communication from the opposition division | 18.10.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M06) | 17.07.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M04) | 23.08.2012 | Reply to a communication from the opposition division | 23.04.2013 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked | 03.05.2013 | Legal effect of revocation of patent [2013/37] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.06.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 28.10.2009 | CZ | 28.10.2009 | DK | 28.10.2009 | EE | 28.10.2009 | FI | 28.10.2009 | IE | 28.10.2009 | IT | 28.10.2009 | LT | 28.10.2009 | LV | 28.10.2009 | MT | 28.10.2009 | NL | 28.10.2009 | PL | 28.10.2009 | RO | 28.10.2009 | SE | 28.10.2009 | SI | 28.10.2009 | SK | 28.10.2009 | TR | 28.10.2009 | BG | 28.01.2010 | GR | 29.01.2010 | IS | 28.02.2010 | PT | 01.03.2010 | HU | 29.04.2010 | LU | 16.05.2010 | BE | 31.05.2010 | MC | 31.05.2010 | CH | 31.05.2011 | LI | 31.05.2011 | AT | 16.05.2012 | GB | 16.05.2012 | ES | 17.05.2012 | FR | 31.05.2012 | DE | 01.12.2012 | [2020/33] |
Former [2013/36] | CY | 28.10.2009 | |
CZ | 28.10.2009 | ||
DK | 28.10.2009 | ||
EE | 28.10.2009 | ||
FI | 28.10.2009 | ||
IE | 28.10.2009 | ||
IT | 28.10.2009 | ||
LT | 28.10.2009 | ||
LV | 28.10.2009 | ||
MT | 28.10.2009 | ||
NL | 28.10.2009 | ||
PL | 28.10.2009 | ||
RO | 28.10.2009 | ||
SE | 28.10.2009 | ||
SI | 28.10.2009 | ||
SK | 28.10.2009 | ||
TR | 28.10.2009 | ||
BG | 28.01.2010 | ||
GR | 29.01.2010 | ||
IS | 28.02.2010 | ||
PT | 01.03.2010 | ||
HU | 29.04.2010 | ||
LU | 16.05.2010 | ||
BE | 31.05.2010 | ||
MC | 31.05.2010 | ||
CH | 31.05.2011 | ||
LI | 31.05.2011 | ||
AT | 16.05.2012 | ||
GB | 16.05.2012 | ||
FR | 31.05.2012 | ||
DE | 01.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/30] | CY | 28.10.2009 | |
CZ | 28.10.2009 | ||
DK | 28.10.2009 | ||
EE | 28.10.2009 | ||
FI | 28.10.2009 | ||
IE | 28.10.2009 | ||
IT | 28.10.2009 | ||
LT | 28.10.2009 | ||
LV | 28.10.2009 | ||
MT | 28.10.2009 | ||
NL | 28.10.2009 | ||
PL | 28.10.2009 | ||
RO | 28.10.2009 | ||
SE | 28.10.2009 | ||
SI | 28.10.2009 | ||
SK | 28.10.2009 | ||
TR | 28.10.2009 | ||
BG | 28.01.2010 | ||
GR | 29.01.2010 | ||
IS | 28.02.2010 | ||
PT | 01.03.2010 | ||
HU | 29.04.2010 | ||
LU | 16.05.2010 | ||
BE | 31.05.2010 | ||
MC | 31.05.2010 | ||
CH | 31.05.2011 | ||
LI | 31.05.2011 | ||
GB | 16.05.2012 | ||
FR | 31.05.2012 | ||
DE | 01.12.2012 | ||
Former [2011/25] | CY | 28.10.2009 | |
CZ | 28.10.2009 | ||
DK | 28.10.2009 | ||
EE | 28.10.2009 | ||
FI | 28.10.2009 | ||
IE | 28.10.2009 | ||
IT | 28.10.2009 | ||
LT | 28.10.2009 | ||
LV | 28.10.2009 | ||
MT | 28.10.2009 | ||
PL | 28.10.2009 | ||
RO | 28.10.2009 | ||
SE | 28.10.2009 | ||
SI | 28.10.2009 | ||
SK | 28.10.2009 | ||
BG | 28.01.2010 | ||
GR | 29.01.2010 | ||
IS | 28.02.2010 | ||
PT | 01.03.2010 | ||
BE | 31.05.2010 | ||
MC | 31.05.2010 | ||
Former [2010/43] | CY | 28.10.2009 | |
CZ | 28.10.2009 | ||
DK | 28.10.2009 | ||
EE | 28.10.2009 | ||
FI | 28.10.2009 | ||
IE | 28.10.2009 | ||
LT | 28.10.2009 | ||
LV | 28.10.2009 | ||
PL | 28.10.2009 | ||
RO | 28.10.2009 | ||
SE | 28.10.2009 | ||
SI | 28.10.2009 | ||
SK | 28.10.2009 | ||
BG | 28.01.2010 | ||
IS | 28.02.2010 | ||
PT | 01.03.2010 | ||
Former [2010/27] | CY | 28.10.2009 | |
FI | 28.10.2009 | ||
LT | 28.10.2009 | ||
LV | 28.10.2009 | ||
PL | 28.10.2009 | ||
SE | 28.10.2009 | ||
SI | 28.10.2009 | ||
IS | 28.02.2010 | ||
PT | 01.03.2010 | Cited in | International search | [A]EP0017230 (DU PONT [US]) [A] 1-13 * the whole document *; | [X]EP0315010 (ERDOELCHEMIE GMBH [DE], et al) [X] 1-13 * the whole document *; | [A]EP0341499 (BAYER AG [DE]) [A] 1,11* the whole document *; | [A]EP0374666 (BAYER AG [DE]) [A] 1,11 * the whole document * |