EP2035981 - IMAGE DATA CONVERSION SYSTEM AND METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 02.04.2010 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.04.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 05.05.2010 [2010/18] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states AGFA INC. 77 Belfield Road Etobicoke, Ontario M9W 1G6 / CA | [2009/12] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DENNISON, D. 205 Fern Crescent Waterloo, Ontario N2V 2P9 / CA | 02 /
POTWARKA, J. 5 Father David Bauer Drive Waterloo, Ontario N2L 6M2 / CA | [2009/12] | Representative(s) | Verbrugghe, Anne Marie L. AGFA-GEVAERT Corporate IP Department 3800, Patent Administration, Septestraat 27 2640 Mortsel / BE | [2009/12] | Application number, filing date | 07729376.9 | 22.05.2007 | [2009/12] | WO2007EP54937 | Priority number, date | US20060443359 | 31.05.2006 Original published format: US 443359 | [2009/12] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2007137967 | Date: | 06.12.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/49] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2035981 | Date: | 18.03.2009 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.12.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/12] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 06.12.2007 | Classification | IPC: | G06F19/00 | [2009/12] | CPC: |
G16H30/40 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2009/34] |
Former [2009/12] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | BILDDATENUMSETZUNGSSYSTEM UND VERFAHREN | [2009/12] | English: | IMAGE DATA CONVERSION SYSTEM AND METHOD | [2009/12] | French: | SYSTÈME ET PROCÉDÉ DE CONVERSION DE DONNÉES D'IMAGE | [2009/12] | Entry into regional phase | 05.01.2009 | National basic fee paid | 05.01.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.01.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.01.2009 | Examination requested [2009/12] | 06.01.2009 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 03.04.2009 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 03.07.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.11.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2010/18] | 18.12.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2010/18] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.06.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]US2003229520 (WISE KELLEY [US], et al) [X] 1,2,5,6,9 * paragraph [0009] - paragraph [0010] * * paragraph [0034] - paragraph [0035] * * figures 1,2 * |