EP2027290 - PREDICTIVE GENE EXPRESSION PATTERN FOR COLORECTAL CARCINOMAS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.08.2012 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.07.2014 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 20.08.2014 [2014/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Friedrich-Alexander-Universität Erlangen-Nürnberg Schlossplatz 4 91054 Erlangen / DE | [2009/09] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CRONER, Roland Gartenstrasse 2 91341 Roettenbach / DE | 02 /
HOHENBERGER, Werner Am Gruendle 23 91074 Herzogenaurach / DE | 03 /
REINGRUBER, Bertram Benediktusweg 22 93049 Regensburg / DE | 04 /
LAUSEN, Berthold Altstaedterkirchenplatz 2 91084 Erlangen / DE | [2009/16] |
Former [2009/09] | 01 /
CRONER, Roland Gartenstrasse 2 91341 Roettenbach / DE | ||
02 /
HOHENBERGER, Werner Am Gruendle 23 91074 Herzogenaurach / DE | |||
03 /
REINGRUBER, Bertram Tulgenstrasse 5 90542 Eckental / DE | |||
04 /
LAUSEN, Berthold Altstaedterkirchenplatz 2 91084 Erlangen / DE | Representative(s) | Isarpatent Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Barth Charles Hassa Peckmann & Partner mbB Postfach 44 01 51 80750 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/18] | Isarpatent Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Postfach 44 01 51 80750 München / DE | ||
Former [2011/40] | Sandmann, Wolfgang Reinhard, Skuhra, Weise & Partner GbR Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Friedrichstrasse 31 80801 München / DE | ||
Former [2009/09] | Sandmann, Wolfgang Reinhard, Skuhra, Weise & Partner GbR Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Friedrichstrasse 31 80801 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 07729452.8 | 23.05.2007 | [2009/09] | WO2007EP55017 | Priority number, date | DE20061024416 | 24.05.2006 Original published format: DE102006024416 | [2009/09] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2007135174 | Date: | 29.11.2007 | Language: | DE | [2007/48] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2027290 | Date: | 25.02.2009 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.11.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/09] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2027290 | Date: | 05.10.2011 | Language: | DE | [2011/40] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 29.11.2007 | Classification | IPC: | C12Q1/68 | [2009/09] | CPC: |
C12Q1/6886 (EP,US);
A61P35/00 (EP);
C12Q1/6837 (EP,US);
C12Q2600/112 (EP,US);
C12Q2600/118 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/09] | Title | German: | PRAEDIKTIVES GENEXPRESSIONSMUSTER FUER KOLOREKTALE KARZINOME | [2009/09] | English: | PREDICTIVE GENE EXPRESSION PATTERN FOR COLORECTAL CARCINOMAS | [2009/09] | French: | MODÈLE D'EXPRESSION GÉNIQUE PRÉDICTIF POUR LE CANCER COLORECTAL | [2009/09] | Entry into regional phase | 19.11.2008 | National basic fee paid | 19.11.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.11.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.03.2008 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 19.11.2008 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 19.11.2008 | Examination requested [2009/09] | 23.04.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.07.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.03.2011 | Date of oral proceedings | 20.04.2011 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 03.05.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.08.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 16.08.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 23.04.2009 | Opposition(s) | 06.07.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/37] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.05.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.05.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 23.05.2007 | CY | 05.10.2011 | CZ | 05.10.2011 | DK | 05.10.2011 | EE | 05.10.2011 | FI | 05.10.2011 | IE | 05.10.2011 | IT | 05.10.2011 | LT | 05.10.2011 | LV | 05.10.2011 | MT | 05.10.2011 | NL | 05.10.2011 | PL | 05.10.2011 | RO | 05.10.2011 | SE | 05.10.2011 | SI | 05.10.2011 | SK | 05.10.2011 | TR | 05.10.2011 | BG | 05.01.2012 | GR | 06.01.2012 | ES | 16.01.2012 | IS | 05.02.2012 | PT | 06.02.2012 | AT | 23.05.2012 | LU | 23.05.2012 | BE | 31.05.2012 | CH | 31.05.2012 | FR | 31.05.2012 | LI | 31.05.2012 | MC | 31.05.2012 | [2014/34] |
Former [2014/27] | CY | 05.10.2011 | |
CZ | 05.10.2011 | ||
DK | 05.10.2011 | ||
EE | 05.10.2011 | ||
FI | 05.10.2011 | ||
IE | 05.10.2011 | ||
IT | 05.10.2011 | ||
LT | 05.10.2011 | ||
LV | 05.10.2011 | ||
MT | 05.10.2011 | ||
NL | 05.10.2011 | ||
PL | 05.10.2011 | ||
RO | 05.10.2011 | ||
SE | 05.10.2011 | ||
SI | 05.10.2011 | ||
SK | 05.10.2011 | ||
TR | 05.10.2011 | ||
BG | 05.01.2012 | ||
GR | 06.01.2012 | ||
ES | 16.01.2012 | ||
IS | 05.02.2012 | ||
PT | 06.02.2012 | ||
AT | 23.05.2012 | ||
LU | 23.05.2012 | ||
BE | 31.05.2012 | ||
CH | 31.05.2012 | ||
FR | 31.05.2012 | ||
LI | 31.05.2012 | ||
MC | 31.05.2012 | ||
Former [2014/21] | CY | 05.10.2011 | |
CZ | 05.10.2011 | ||
DK | 05.10.2011 | ||
EE | 05.10.2011 | ||
FI | 05.10.2011 | ||
IE | 05.10.2011 | ||
IT | 05.10.2011 | ||
LT | 05.10.2011 | ||
LV | 05.10.2011 | ||
MT | 05.10.2011 | ||
NL | 05.10.2011 | ||
PL | 05.10.2011 | ||
RO | 05.10.2011 | ||
SE | 05.10.2011 | ||
SI | 05.10.2011 | ||
SK | 05.10.2011 | ||
TR | 05.10.2011 | ||
BG | 05.01.2012 | ||
GR | 06.01.2012 | ||
ES | 16.01.2012 | ||
IS | 05.02.2012 | ||
PT | 06.02.2012 | ||
AT | 23.05.2012 | ||
BE | 31.05.2012 | ||
CH | 31.05.2012 | ||
FR | 31.05.2012 | ||
LI | 31.05.2012 | ||
MC | 31.05.2012 | ||
Former [2013/36] | CY | 05.10.2011 | |
CZ | 05.10.2011 | ||
DK | 05.10.2011 | ||
EE | 05.10.2011 | ||
FI | 05.10.2011 | ||
IE | 05.10.2011 | ||
IT | 05.10.2011 | ||
LT | 05.10.2011 | ||
LV | 05.10.2011 | ||
MT | 05.10.2011 | ||
NL | 05.10.2011 | ||
PL | 05.10.2011 | ||
RO | 05.10.2011 | ||
SE | 05.10.2011 | ||
SI | 05.10.2011 | ||
SK | 05.10.2011 | ||
BG | 05.01.2012 | ||
GR | 06.01.2012 | ||
ES | 16.01.2012 | ||
IS | 05.02.2012 | ||
PT | 06.02.2012 | ||
AT | 23.05.2012 | ||
BE | 31.05.2012 | ||
CH | 31.05.2012 | ||
FR | 31.05.2012 | ||
LI | 31.05.2012 | ||
MC | 31.05.2012 | ||
Former [2013/35] | CY | 05.10.2011 | |
CZ | 05.10.2011 | ||
DK | 05.10.2011 | ||
EE | 05.10.2011 | ||
FI | 05.10.2011 | ||
IE | 05.10.2011 | ||
IT | 05.10.2011 | ||
LT | 05.10.2011 | ||
LV | 05.10.2011 | ||
MT | 05.10.2011 | ||
NL | 05.10.2011 | ||
PL | 05.10.2011 | ||
RO | 05.10.2011 | ||
SE | 05.10.2011 | ||
SI | 05.10.2011 | ||
SK | 05.10.2011 | ||
BG | 05.01.2012 | ||
GR | 06.01.2012 | ||
ES | 16.01.2012 | ||
IS | 05.02.2012 | ||
PT | 06.02.2012 | ||
BE | 31.05.2012 | ||
CH | 31.05.2012 | ||
FR | 31.05.2012 | ||
LI | 31.05.2012 | ||
MC | 31.05.2012 | ||
Former [2013/29] | CY | 05.10.2011 | |
CZ | 05.10.2011 | ||
DK | 05.10.2011 | ||
EE | 05.10.2011 | ||
FI | 05.10.2011 | ||
IE | 05.10.2011 | ||
IT | 05.10.2011 | ||
LT | 05.10.2011 | ||
LV | 05.10.2011 | ||
NL | 05.10.2011 | ||
PL | 05.10.2011 | ||
RO | 05.10.2011 | ||
SE | 05.10.2011 | ||
SI | 05.10.2011 | ||
SK | 05.10.2011 | ||
BG | 05.01.2012 | ||
GR | 06.01.2012 | ||
ES | 16.01.2012 | ||
IS | 05.02.2012 | ||
PT | 06.02.2012 | ||
BE | 31.05.2012 | ||
CH | 31.05.2012 | ||
FR | 31.05.2012 | ||
LI | 31.05.2012 | ||
MC | 31.05.2012 | ||
Former [2013/23] | CY | 05.10.2011 | |
CZ | 05.10.2011 | ||
DK | 05.10.2011 | ||
EE | 05.10.2011 | ||
IE | 05.10.2011 | ||
IT | 05.10.2011 | ||
LT | 05.10.2011 | ||
LV | 05.10.2011 | ||
NL | 05.10.2011 | ||
PL | 05.10.2011 | ||
RO | 05.10.2011 | ||
SE | 05.10.2011 | ||
SI | 05.10.2011 | ||
SK | 05.10.2011 | ||
BG | 05.01.2012 | ||
GR | 06.01.2012 | ||
ES | 16.01.2012 | ||
IS | 05.02.2012 | ||
PT | 06.02.2012 | ||
BE | 31.05.2012 | ||
CH | 31.05.2012 | ||
FR | 31.05.2012 | ||
LI | 31.05.2012 | ||
MC | 31.05.2012 | ||
Former [2013/22] | CY | 05.10.2011 | |
CZ | 05.10.2011 | ||
DK | 05.10.2011 | ||
EE | 05.10.2011 | ||
IE | 05.10.2011 | ||
IT | 05.10.2011 | ||
LT | 05.10.2011 | ||
LV | 05.10.2011 | ||
NL | 05.10.2011 | ||
PL | 05.10.2011 | ||
RO | 05.10.2011 | ||
SE | 05.10.2011 | ||
SI | 05.10.2011 | ||
SK | 05.10.2011 | ||
BG | 05.01.2012 | ||
GR | 06.01.2012 | ||
ES | 16.01.2012 | ||
IS | 05.02.2012 | ||
PT | 06.02.2012 | ||
BE | 31.05.2012 | ||
CH | 31.05.2012 | ||
LI | 31.05.2012 | ||
MC | 31.05.2012 | ||
Former [2013/12] | CY | 05.10.2011 | |
CZ | 05.10.2011 | ||
DK | 05.10.2011 | ||
EE | 05.10.2011 | ||
IE | 05.10.2011 | ||
IT | 05.10.2011 | ||
LT | 05.10.2011 | ||
LV | 05.10.2011 | ||
NL | 05.10.2011 | ||
PL | 05.10.2011 | ||
RO | 05.10.2011 | ||
SE | 05.10.2011 | ||
SI | 05.10.2011 | ||
SK | 05.10.2011 | ||
BG | 05.01.2012 | ||
GR | 06.01.2012 | ||
IS | 05.02.2012 | ||
PT | 06.02.2012 | ||
BE | 31.05.2012 | ||
CH | 31.05.2012 | ||
LI | 31.05.2012 | ||
MC | 31.05.2012 | ||
Former [2013/07] | CY | 05.10.2011 | |
CZ | 05.10.2011 | ||
DK | 05.10.2011 | ||
EE | 05.10.2011 | ||
IE | 05.10.2011 | ||
IT | 05.10.2011 | ||
LT | 05.10.2011 | ||
LV | 05.10.2011 | ||
NL | 05.10.2011 | ||
PL | 05.10.2011 | ||
RO | 05.10.2011 | ||
SE | 05.10.2011 | ||
SI | 05.10.2011 | ||
SK | 05.10.2011 | ||
BG | 05.01.2012 | ||
GR | 06.01.2012 | ||
IS | 05.02.2012 | ||
PT | 06.02.2012 | ||
CH | 31.05.2012 | ||
LI | 31.05.2012 | ||
MC | 31.05.2012 | ||
Former [2013/03] | CY | 05.10.2011 | |
CZ | 05.10.2011 | ||
DK | 05.10.2011 | ||
EE | 05.10.2011 | ||
IE | 05.10.2011 | ||
IT | 05.10.2011 | ||
LT | 05.10.2011 | ||
LV | 05.10.2011 | ||
NL | 05.10.2011 | ||
PL | 05.10.2011 | ||
RO | 05.10.2011 | ||
SE | 05.10.2011 | ||
SI | 05.10.2011 | ||
SK | 05.10.2011 | ||
BG | 05.01.2012 | ||
GR | 06.01.2012 | ||
IS | 05.02.2012 | ||
PT | 06.02.2012 | ||
MC | 31.05.2012 | ||
Former [2012/37] | CY | 05.10.2011 | |
CZ | 05.10.2011 | ||
DK | 05.10.2011 | ||
EE | 05.10.2011 | ||
IE | 05.10.2011 | ||
IT | 05.10.2011 | ||
LT | 05.10.2011 | ||
LV | 05.10.2011 | ||
NL | 05.10.2011 | ||
PL | 05.10.2011 | ||
RO | 05.10.2011 | ||
SE | 05.10.2011 | ||
SI | 05.10.2011 | ||
SK | 05.10.2011 | ||
BG | 05.01.2012 | ||
GR | 06.01.2012 | ||
IS | 05.02.2012 | ||
PT | 06.02.2012 | ||
Former [2012/36] | CY | 05.10.2011 | |
CZ | 05.10.2011 | ||
DK | 05.10.2011 | ||
EE | 05.10.2011 | ||
IE | 05.10.2011 | ||
LT | 05.10.2011 | ||
LV | 05.10.2011 | ||
NL | 05.10.2011 | ||
RO | 05.10.2011 | ||
SE | 05.10.2011 | ||
SI | 05.10.2011 | ||
SK | 05.10.2011 | ||
BG | 05.01.2012 | ||
GR | 06.01.2012 | ||
IS | 05.02.2012 | ||
PT | 06.02.2012 | ||
Former [2012/35] | CY | 05.10.2011 | |
CZ | 05.10.2011 | ||
DK | 05.10.2011 | ||
EE | 05.10.2011 | ||
IE | 05.10.2011 | ||
LT | 05.10.2011 | ||
LV | 05.10.2011 | ||
NL | 05.10.2011 | ||
SE | 05.10.2011 | ||
SI | 05.10.2011 | ||
BG | 05.01.2012 | ||
GR | 06.01.2012 | ||
IS | 05.02.2012 | ||
PT | 06.02.2012 | ||
Former [2012/34] | CY | 05.10.2011 | |
CZ | 05.10.2011 | ||
LT | 05.10.2011 | ||
LV | 05.10.2011 | ||
NL | 05.10.2011 | ||
SE | 05.10.2011 | ||
SI | 05.10.2011 | ||
GR | 06.01.2012 | ||
IS | 05.02.2012 | ||
PT | 06.02.2012 | ||
Former [2012/28] | CY | 05.10.2011 | |
LT | 05.10.2011 | ||
LV | 05.10.2011 | ||
NL | 05.10.2011 | ||
SE | 05.10.2011 | ||
SI | 05.10.2011 | ||
GR | 06.01.2012 | ||
IS | 05.02.2012 | ||
PT | 06.02.2012 | ||
Former [2012/24] | LT | 05.10.2011 | |
LV | 05.10.2011 | ||
NL | 05.10.2011 | ||
SE | 05.10.2011 | ||
SI | 05.10.2011 | ||
GR | 06.01.2012 | ||
IS | 05.02.2012 | ||
PT | 06.02.2012 | ||
Former [2012/23] | LT | 05.10.2011 | |
NL | 05.10.2011 | ||
SI | 05.10.2011 | ||
GR | 06.01.2012 | ||
IS | 05.02.2012 | ||
PT | 06.02.2012 | ||
Former [2012/21] | LT | 05.10.2011 | |
SI | 05.10.2011 | ||
IS | 05.02.2012 | ||
Former [2012/20] | LT | 05.10.2011 | |
SI | 05.10.2011 | ||
Former [2012/11] | SI | 05.10.2011 | Cited in | International search | [A] - GREENBAUM D ET AL, "COMPARING PROTEIN ABUNDANCE AND MRNA EXPRESSION LEVELS ON A GENOMIC SCALE", GENOME BIOLOGY (ONLINE), GB, (2003), vol. 40, no. 9, ISSN 1465-6914, pages 11701 - 11708, XP008036618 [A] 15,16 * page 4, column L - page 5, column R; figure 1 * | [A] - GREENBAUM D ET AL, "Interrelating different types of genomic data, from proteome to secretome: 'oming in on function.", GENOME RESEARCH SEP 2001, (200109), vol. 11, no. 9, ISSN 1088-9051, pages 1463 - 1468, XP009088703 [A] 15,16 * page 1467, column R - page 1467, column L; figure 2a * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1101/gr.207401 | [A] - OERNTOFT T F ET AL, "GENOME-WIDE STUDY OF GENE COPY NUMBERS, TRANSCRIPTS, AND PROTEIN LEVELS IN PAIRS OF NON-INVASIVE AND INVASIVE HUMAN TRANSITIONAL CELL CARCINOMAS", MOLECULAR AND CELLULAR PROTEOMICS, AMERICAN SOCIETY FOR BIOCHEMISTRY AND MOLECULAR BIOLOGY, US, (2002), vol. 1, no. 1, ISSN 1535-9476, pages 37 - 45, XP008015037 [A] 15,16 * page 44, column R * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1074/mcp.M100019-MCP200 | [A] - CELIS A J E ET AL, "Gene expression profiling: monitoring transcription and translation products using DNA microarrays and proteomics", FEBS LETTERS, ELSEVIER, AMSTERDAM, NL, (20000825), vol. 480, no. 1, ISSN 0014-5793, pages 2 - 16, XP004337487 [A] 15,16 * page 13, column L * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0014-5793(00)01771-3 | [X] - CRONER ROLAND S ET AL, "Microarray versus conventional prediction of lymph node metastasis in colorectal carcinoma.", CANCER 15 JUL 2005, (20050715), vol. 104, no. 2, ISSN 0008-543X, pages 395 - 404, XP009088697 [X] 1,2,6-8,10-12,14 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/cncr.21170 | [A] - LI M ET AL, "GENES ASSOCIATED WITH LIVER METASTASIS OF COLON CANCER, IDENTIFIED BY GENOME-WIDE CDNA MICROARRAY", INTERNATIONAL JOURNAL OF ONCOLOGY, EDITORIAL ACADEMY OF THE INTERNATIONAL JOURNAL OF ONCOLOGY,, GR, (200402), vol. 24, no. 2, ISSN 1019-6439, pages 305 - 312, XP009027443 [A] 1-14 * the whole document * | [A] - FREDERIKSEN CASPER MOLLER ET AL, "Classification of Dukes' B and C colorectal cancers using expression arrays", JOURNAL OF CANCER RESEARCH AND CLINICAL ONCOLOGY, SPRINGER INTERNATIONAL, BERLIN, DE, (20030515), vol. 129, no. 5, ISSN 0171-5216, pages 263 - 271, XP009088733 [A] * the whole document * | [A] - KWON HYUK-CHAN ET AL, "Gene expression profiling in lymph node-positive and lymph node-negative colorectal cancer", DISEASES OF THE COLON AND RECTUM, J.B. LIPPINCOT CO., PHILADELPHIA, US, (200402), vol. 47, no. 2, ISSN 0012-3706, pages 141 - 152, XP009088734 [A] * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/s10350-003-0032-7 | [A] - KOEHLER ASTRID ET AL, "Gene expression profiling of colorectal cancer and metastases divides tumours according to their clinicopathological stage", JOURNAL OF PATHOLOGY, CHICHESTER, SUSSEX, GB, (200409), vol. 204, no. 1, ISSN 0022-3417, pages 65 - 74, XP009088735 [A] * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/path.1606 | Examination | - KOMURO K ET AL, "Right- and left-sided colorectal cancers display distinct expression profiles and the anatomical stratification allows a high accuracy prediction of lymph node metastasis", JOURNAL OF SURGICAL RESEARCH, ACADEMIC PRESS INC., SAN DIEGO, CA, US LNKD- DOI:10.1016/J.JSS.2004.10.009, (20050401), vol. 124, no. 2, ISSN 0022-4804, pages 216 - 224, XP004835905 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.jss.2004.10.009 | - LI M ET AL, "GENES ASSOCIATED WITH LIVER METASTASIS OF COLON CANCER, IDENTIFIED BY GENOME-WIDE CDNA MICROARRAY", INTERNATIONAL JOURNAL OF ONCOLOGY, SPANDIDOS PUBLICATIONS, GR, (20040201), vol. 24, no. 2, ISSN 1019-6439, pages 305 - 312, XP009027443 |