EP2029519 - PROCESS FOR PREPARING SUBSTITUTED BIPHENYLS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 29.08.2014 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.08.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 01.10.2014 [2014/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BASF SE Carl-Bosch-Strasse 38 67056 Ludwigshafen am Rhein / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/10] | For all designated states BASF SE 67056 Ludwigshafen / DE | ||
Former [2008/31] | For all designated states BASF Aktiengesellschaft 67056 Ludwigshafen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SMIDT, Sebastian, Peer Rheindammstr. 34 68163 Mannheim / DE | 02 /
DIETZ, Jochen Spelzenstr. 2a 68167 Mannheim / DE | 03 /
KEIL, Michael Fontanestr. 4 67251 Freinsheim / DE | 04 /
GROTE, Thomas Im Höhnhausen 18 67157 Wachenheim / DE | [2009/10] | Application number, filing date | 07729695.2 | 31.05.2007 | [2009/10] | WO2007EP55283 | Priority number, date | EP20060114872 | 01.06.2006 Original published format: EP 06114872 | EP20060120319 | 07.09.2006 Original published format: EP 06120319 | [2009/10] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2007138089 | Date: | 06.12.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/49] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2029519 | Date: | 04.03.2009 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.12.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/10] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 06.12.2007 | Classification | IPC: | C07C201/12, C07C209/68, C07C205/12, C07C211/52 | [2009/10] | CPC: |
C07C201/12 (EP,KR,US);
C07C205/12 (KR);
C07C209/68 (EP,KR,US);
C07C211/52 (KR)
| C-Set: |
C07C201/12, C07C205/12 (US,EP);
C07C209/68, C07C211/52 (EP,US) | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/10] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN FÜR DIE ZUBEREITUNG SUBSTITUIERTER BIPHENYLE | [2009/10] | English: | PROCESS FOR PREPARING SUBSTITUTED BIPHENYLS | [2009/10] | French: | PROCEDE DE PREPARATION DES BIPHENYLS SUBSTITUES | [2009/10] | Entry into regional phase | 05.01.2009 | National basic fee paid | 05.01.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.01.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.06.2008 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 05.01.2009 | Examination requested [2009/10] | 29.05.2009 | Observations by third parties | 11.12.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 17.06.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.09.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 08.04.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2014/40] | 07.05.2014 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2014/40] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 11.12.2009 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.06.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.05.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.05.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.05.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2014 | 08   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]JP2001055360 ; | [A]JP2003119175 ; | [A] - DATABASE WPI, 0, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 2001, no. 37, Database accession no. 2001-347657, XP002406829 & JP2001055360 A 20010227 (HOKKO CHEM IND CO LTD) [A] 1-15 * abstract * | [A] - DATABASE WPI, 0, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 2003, no. 47, Database accession no. 2003-498709, XP002406830 & JP2003119175 A 20030423 (HOKKO CHEM IND CO LTD) [A] 1-15 * abstract * | [A] - TAKATOSHI ITO ET AL, "Palladium-Catalyzed Cross-Coupling Reaction of Potassium Diaryldifluoroborates with Aryl Halides", SYNLETT, (2003), no. 10, pages 1435 - 1438, XP002406825 [A] 1-15 * the whole document * | [A] - DERICK D. WINKLE AND KEVIN M. SCHAAB, "Suzuki Reaction of a Diarylborinic Acid: One-Pot Preparation and Cross-Coupling of Bis(3,5-dimethylphenyl)borinic Acid", ORGANIC PROCESS RESEARCH & DEVELOPMENT, (2001), vol. 5, pages 450 - 451, XP002406826 [A] 1-15 * table 1 * | other | WO9733846 | EP1285924 | WO03070705 | - "Structure, Properties and preparation of Boronic Acid Derivatives; Coupling Reactions of Areneboronic Acids or esters with aromatic Electrophiles", HALL D.G., Boronic Acids Preparation, Applications in Organic Synthesis and Medicine, WILEY-VCH, (2005), pages 28 - 32, ISBN 3-527-30991-8, XP003024858 | - COLE T.E. AND B.D. HALY, "Selective preparation of Borinic esters from Grignard reagents and selected Trialkoxyboranes", ORGANOMETALLICS, (1992), vol. 11, no. 2, pages 653 - 657, XP003024859 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/om00038a024 | - HAWTHORNE M.F., "Simple procedure for the conversion of Aryl halides to corresponding phenols", J. ORG. CHEM, (19570306), vol. 22, pages 1001 - 1006, XP003024860 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/jo01359a619 |