EP2041005 - APPARATUS AND METHOD FOR STORING STORAGE UNITS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.02.2011 Database last updated on 19.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.08.2014 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): GR | published on 17.09.2014 [2014/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Werner-von-Siemens-Str. 1 DE-80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/14] | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Wittelsbacherplatz 2 80333 München / DE | ||
Former [2008/31] | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Wittelsbacherplatz 2 80333 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KLEIN, Matthias Albrecht-Dürer-Str. 36 63456 Hanau / DE | [2009/14] | Application number, filing date | 07729742.2 | 31.05.2007 | [2009/14] | WO2007EP55340 | Priority number, date | DE20061033099 | 14.07.2006 Original published format: DE102006033099 | EP20070100696 | 17.01.2007 Original published format: EP 07100696 | [2009/14] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2008006644 | Date: | 17.01.2008 | Language: | DE | [2008/03] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2041005 | Date: | 01.04.2009 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.01.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/14] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2041005 | Date: | 31.03.2010 | Language: | DE | [2010/13] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 17.01.2008 | Classification | IPC: | B65G1/127, B65G47/51 | [2009/14] | CPC: |
B65G1/127 (EP);
B65G1/045 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/14] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUR LAGERUNG VON LAGEREINHEITEN | [2009/14] | English: | APPARATUS AND METHOD FOR STORING STORAGE UNITS | [2009/14] | French: | DISPOSITIF ET PROCÉDÉ D'ENTREPOSAGE D'UNITÉS DE STOCKAGE | [2009/14] | Entry into regional phase | 08.01.2009 | National basic fee paid | 08.01.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.01.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.04.2008 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 08.01.2009 | Examination requested [2009/14] | 03.11.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.02.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 19.02.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 04.01.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/10] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.05.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 31.03.2010 | CZ | 31.03.2010 | DK | 31.03.2010 | EE | 31.03.2010 | FI | 31.03.2010 | GR | 31.03.2010 | IE | 31.03.2010 | LT | 31.03.2010 | LV | 31.03.2010 | MT | 31.03.2010 | PL | 31.03.2010 | RO | 31.03.2010 | SE | 31.03.2010 | SI | 31.03.2010 | SK | 31.03.2010 | TR | 31.03.2010 | BE | 31.05.2010 | FR | 31.05.2010 | LU | 31.05.2010 | MC | 31.05.2010 | BG | 30.06.2010 | IS | 31.07.2010 | PT | 02.08.2010 | HU | 01.10.2010 | [2014/38] |
Former [2013/42] | CY | 31.03.2010 | |
CZ | 31.03.2010 | ||
DK | 31.03.2010 | ||
EE | 31.03.2010 | ||
FI | 31.03.2010 | ||
IE | 31.03.2010 | ||
LT | 31.03.2010 | ||
LV | 31.03.2010 | ||
MT | 31.03.2010 | ||
PL | 31.03.2010 | ||
RO | 31.03.2010 | ||
SE | 31.03.2010 | ||
SI | 31.03.2010 | ||
SK | 31.03.2010 | ||
TR | 31.03.2010 | ||
BE | 31.05.2010 | ||
FR | 31.05.2010 | ||
LU | 31.05.2010 | ||
MC | 31.05.2010 | ||
BG | 30.06.2010 | ||
IS | 31.07.2010 | ||
PT | 02.08.2010 | ||
HU | 01.10.2010 | ||
Former [2012/47] | BG | 31.03.2010 | |
CY | 31.03.2010 | ||
CZ | 31.03.2010 | ||
DK | 31.03.2010 | ||
EE | 31.03.2010 | ||
FI | 31.03.2010 | ||
IE | 31.03.2010 | ||
LT | 31.03.2010 | ||
LV | 31.03.2010 | ||
MT | 31.03.2010 | ||
PL | 31.03.2010 | ||
RO | 31.03.2010 | ||
SE | 31.03.2010 | ||
SI | 31.03.2010 | ||
SK | 31.03.2010 | ||
TR | 31.03.2010 | ||
BE | 31.05.2010 | ||
FR | 31.05.2010 | ||
LU | 31.05.2010 | ||
MC | 31.05.2010 | ||
IS | 31.07.2010 | ||
PT | 02.08.2010 | ||
HU | 01.10.2010 | ||
Former [2012/43] | BG | 31.03.2010 | |
CY | 31.03.2010 | ||
CZ | 31.03.2010 | ||
DK | 31.03.2010 | ||
EE | 31.03.2010 | ||
FI | 31.03.2010 | ||
IE | 31.03.2010 | ||
LT | 31.03.2010 | ||
LV | 31.03.2010 | ||
MT | 31.03.2010 | ||
PL | 31.03.2010 | ||
RO | 31.03.2010 | ||
SE | 31.03.2010 | ||
SI | 31.03.2010 | ||
SK | 31.03.2010 | ||
BE | 31.05.2010 | ||
FR | 31.05.2010 | ||
LU | 31.05.2010 | ||
MC | 31.05.2010 | ||
IS | 31.07.2010 | ||
PT | 02.08.2010 | ||
HU | 01.10.2010 | ||
Former [2012/42] | BG | 31.03.2010 | |
CY | 31.03.2010 | ||
CZ | 31.03.2010 | ||
DK | 31.03.2010 | ||
EE | 31.03.2010 | ||
FI | 31.03.2010 | ||
IE | 31.03.2010 | ||
LT | 31.03.2010 | ||
LV | 31.03.2010 | ||
MT | 31.03.2010 | ||
PL | 31.03.2010 | ||
RO | 31.03.2010 | ||
SE | 31.03.2010 | ||
SI | 31.03.2010 | ||
SK | 31.03.2010 | ||
BE | 31.05.2010 | ||
FR | 31.05.2010 | ||
MC | 31.05.2010 | ||
IS | 31.07.2010 | ||
PT | 02.08.2010 | ||
HU | 01.10.2010 | ||
Former [2012/41] | BG | 31.03.2010 | |
CY | 31.03.2010 | ||
CZ | 31.03.2010 | ||
DK | 31.03.2010 | ||
EE | 31.03.2010 | ||
FI | 31.03.2010 | ||
IE | 31.03.2010 | ||
LT | 31.03.2010 | ||
LV | 31.03.2010 | ||
MT | 31.03.2010 | ||
PL | 31.03.2010 | ||
RO | 31.03.2010 | ||
SE | 31.03.2010 | ||
SI | 31.03.2010 | ||
SK | 31.03.2010 | ||
BE | 31.05.2010 | ||
FR | 31.05.2010 | ||
MC | 31.05.2010 | ||
IS | 31.07.2010 | ||
PT | 02.08.2010 | ||
Former [2011/41] | CY | 31.03.2010 | |
CZ | 31.03.2010 | ||
DK | 31.03.2010 | ||
EE | 31.03.2010 | ||
FI | 31.03.2010 | ||
IE | 31.03.2010 | ||
LT | 31.03.2010 | ||
LV | 31.03.2010 | ||
MT | 31.03.2010 | ||
PL | 31.03.2010 | ||
RO | 31.03.2010 | ||
SE | 31.03.2010 | ||
SI | 31.03.2010 | ||
SK | 31.03.2010 | ||
BE | 31.05.2010 | ||
FR | 31.05.2010 | ||
MC | 31.05.2010 | ||
IS | 31.07.2010 | ||
PT | 02.08.2010 | ||
Former [2011/25] | CY | 31.03.2010 | |
CZ | 31.03.2010 | ||
DK | 31.03.2010 | ||
EE | 31.03.2010 | ||
FI | 31.03.2010 | ||
IE | 31.03.2010 | ||
LT | 31.03.2010 | ||
LV | 31.03.2010 | ||
MT | 31.03.2010 | ||
PL | 31.03.2010 | ||
RO | 31.03.2010 | ||
SE | 31.03.2010 | ||
SI | 31.03.2010 | ||
SK | 31.03.2010 | ||
BE | 31.05.2010 | ||
FR | 31.05.2010 | ||
IT | 31.05.2010 | ||
MC | 31.05.2010 | ||
IS | 31.07.2010 | ||
PT | 02.08.2010 | ||
Former [2010/43] | FI | 31.03.2010 | |
LT | 31.03.2010 | ||
LV | 31.03.2010 | ||
PL | 31.03.2010 | ||
SI | 31.03.2010 | Cited in | International search | [X]DE4133672 (BARTOCHA ROMUALD [DE]) [X] 1-3,5-15 * figure 4 *; | [X]DE4431943 (GUGU HANS [DE]) [X] 1-3,5-17 * column 2, line 2 - line 10; figure 2 *; | [X]US6102647 (YAP HOON-YENG [US]) [X] 1-3,5-17* column 2, line 41 - line 47; figure 4 * |