EP2026650 - ANTI-MICROBIAL COMPOSITIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.01.2012 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.10.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 06.11.2013 [2013/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BASF SE Carl-Bosch-Strasse 38 67056 Ludwigshafen am Rhein / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2010/52] | For all designated states BASF SE 67056 Ludwigshafen / DE | ||
Former [2009/09] | For all designated states Ciba Holding Inc. Klybeckstrasse 141 4057 Basel / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ELDER, Stewart Todd 20 Stonybrook Court Butler, New Jersey 07405 / US | 02 /
PREUSS, Andrea Hochstrasse 35 CH-4053 Basel / CH | 03 /
SCHÖNING, Kai-Uwe Bienenstrasse 6 CH-4104 Oberwil / CH | 04 /
MÜHLBAUER, Karin Salzertstrasse 58 79540 Lörrach / DE | [2009/09] | Application number, filing date | 07729848.7 | 04.06.2007 | [2009/09] | WO2007EP55460 | Priority number, date | US20060813645P | 14.06.2006 Original published format: US 813645 P | [2009/09] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2007144286 | Date: | 21.12.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/51] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2026650 | Date: | 25.02.2009 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.12.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/09] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2026650 | Date: | 16.03.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/11] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 21.12.2007 | Classification | IPC: | A01N25/30, A01N43/50, A61K8/49, A61K8/39, A61Q17/00 | [2009/32] | CPC: |
A61Q17/005 (EP,US);
A01N43/50 (EP,KR,US);
A01N31/00 (KR);
A61K8/39 (EP,US);
A61K8/4946 (EP,US);
A61K8/86 (EP,US);
A61P31/00 (EP);
A61P31/04 (EP);
A61P31/10 (EP);
A61K2800/524 (EP,US)
(-)
| C-Set: |
A01N43/50, A01N2300/00 (US,EP);
A01N43/50, A01N25/30 (EP,US) |
Former IPC [2009/09] | A01N25/30, A01N43/50, A61K8/49, A61Q19/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/09] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ANTIMIKROBIELLE ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN | [2009/09] | English: | ANTI-MICROBIAL COMPOSITIONS | [2009/09] | French: | COMPOSITIONS ANTIMICROBIENNES | [2009/09] | Entry into regional phase | 14.11.2008 | National basic fee paid | 14.11.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.11.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.11.2008 | Examination requested [2009/09] | 28.07.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 02.02.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.09.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.02.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 01.02.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 19.12.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/08] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.04.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 16.03.2011 | BE | 16.03.2011 | CY | 16.03.2011 | CZ | 16.03.2011 | DK | 16.03.2011 | EE | 16.03.2011 | FI | 16.03.2011 | HU | 16.03.2011 | LT | 16.03.2011 | LV | 16.03.2011 | MT | 16.03.2011 | NL | 16.03.2011 | PL | 16.03.2011 | RO | 16.03.2011 | SE | 16.03.2011 | SI | 16.03.2011 | SK | 16.03.2011 | TR | 16.03.2011 | IE | 04.06.2011 | LU | 04.06.2011 | BG | 16.06.2011 | GR | 17.06.2011 | CH | 30.06.2011 | LI | 30.06.2011 | MC | 30.06.2011 | IS | 16.07.2011 | PT | 18.07.2011 | [2013/45] |
Former [2013/44] | AT | 16.03.2011 | |
BE | 16.03.2011 | ||
CY | 16.03.2011 | ||
CZ | 16.03.2011 | ||
DK | 16.03.2011 | ||
EE | 16.03.2011 | ||
FI | 16.03.2011 | ||
LT | 16.03.2011 | ||
LV | 16.03.2011 | ||
MT | 16.03.2011 | ||
NL | 16.03.2011 | ||
PL | 16.03.2011 | ||
RO | 16.03.2011 | ||
SE | 16.03.2011 | ||
SI | 16.03.2011 | ||
SK | 16.03.2011 | ||
TR | 16.03.2011 | ||
IE | 04.06.2011 | ||
LU | 04.06.2011 | ||
BG | 16.06.2011 | ||
GR | 17.06.2011 | ||
CH | 30.06.2011 | ||
LI | 30.06.2011 | ||
MC | 30.06.2011 | ||
IS | 16.07.2011 | ||
PT | 18.07.2011 | ||
Former [2013/25] | AT | 16.03.2011 | |
BE | 16.03.2011 | ||
CY | 16.03.2011 | ||
CZ | 16.03.2011 | ||
DK | 16.03.2011 | ||
EE | 16.03.2011 | ||
FI | 16.03.2011 | ||
LT | 16.03.2011 | ||
LV | 16.03.2011 | ||
MT | 16.03.2011 | ||
NL | 16.03.2011 | ||
PL | 16.03.2011 | ||
RO | 16.03.2011 | ||
SE | 16.03.2011 | ||
SI | 16.03.2011 | ||
SK | 16.03.2011 | ||
IE | 04.06.2011 | ||
LU | 04.06.2011 | ||
BG | 16.06.2011 | ||
GR | 17.06.2011 | ||
CH | 30.06.2011 | ||
LI | 30.06.2011 | ||
MC | 30.06.2011 | ||
IS | 16.07.2011 | ||
PT | 18.07.2011 | ||
Former [2013/21] | AT | 16.03.2011 | |
BE | 16.03.2011 | ||
CY | 16.03.2011 | ||
CZ | 16.03.2011 | ||
DK | 16.03.2011 | ||
EE | 16.03.2011 | ||
FI | 16.03.2011 | ||
LT | 16.03.2011 | ||
LV | 16.03.2011 | ||
MT | 16.03.2011 | ||
NL | 16.03.2011 | ||
PL | 16.03.2011 | ||
RO | 16.03.2011 | ||
SE | 16.03.2011 | ||
SI | 16.03.2011 | ||
SK | 16.03.2011 | ||
IE | 04.06.2011 | ||
BG | 16.06.2011 | ||
GR | 17.06.2011 | ||
CH | 30.06.2011 | ||
LI | 30.06.2011 | ||
MC | 30.06.2011 | ||
IS | 16.07.2011 | ||
PT | 18.07.2011 | ||
Former [2012/20] | AT | 16.03.2011 | |
BE | 16.03.2011 | ||
CY | 16.03.2011 | ||
CZ | 16.03.2011 | ||
DK | 16.03.2011 | ||
EE | 16.03.2011 | ||
FI | 16.03.2011 | ||
LT | 16.03.2011 | ||
LV | 16.03.2011 | ||
MT | 16.03.2011 | ||
NL | 16.03.2011 | ||
PL | 16.03.2011 | ||
RO | 16.03.2011 | ||
SE | 16.03.2011 | ||
SI | 16.03.2011 | ||
SK | 16.03.2011 | ||
IE | 04.06.2011 | ||
BG | 16.06.2011 | ||
GR | 17.06.2011 | ||
CH | 30.06.2011 | ||
LI | 30.06.2011 | ||
IS | 16.07.2011 | ||
PT | 18.07.2011 | ||
Former [2012/11] | AT | 16.03.2011 | |
BE | 16.03.2011 | ||
CY | 16.03.2011 | ||
CZ | 16.03.2011 | ||
DK | 16.03.2011 | ||
EE | 16.03.2011 | ||
FI | 16.03.2011 | ||
LT | 16.03.2011 | ||
LV | 16.03.2011 | ||
MT | 16.03.2011 | ||
NL | 16.03.2011 | ||
PL | 16.03.2011 | ||
RO | 16.03.2011 | ||
SE | 16.03.2011 | ||
SI | 16.03.2011 | ||
SK | 16.03.2011 | ||
BG | 16.06.2011 | ||
GR | 17.06.2011 | ||
IS | 16.07.2011 | ||
PT | 18.07.2011 | ||
Former [2012/05] | AT | 16.03.2011 | |
BE | 16.03.2011 | ||
CY | 16.03.2011 | ||
CZ | 16.03.2011 | ||
EE | 16.03.2011 | ||
FI | 16.03.2011 | ||
LT | 16.03.2011 | ||
LV | 16.03.2011 | ||
MT | 16.03.2011 | ||
NL | 16.03.2011 | ||
RO | 16.03.2011 | ||
SE | 16.03.2011 | ||
SI | 16.03.2011 | ||
SK | 16.03.2011 | ||
BG | 16.06.2011 | ||
GR | 17.06.2011 | ||
IS | 16.07.2011 | ||
PT | 18.07.2011 | ||
PL | 20.07.2011 | ||
Former [2012/02] | AT | 16.03.2011 | |
BE | 16.03.2011 | ||
CY | 16.03.2011 | ||
CZ | 16.03.2011 | ||
EE | 16.03.2011 | ||
FI | 16.03.2011 | ||
LT | 16.03.2011 | ||
LV | 16.03.2011 | ||
NL | 16.03.2011 | ||
RO | 16.03.2011 | ||
SE | 16.03.2011 | ||
SI | 16.03.2011 | ||
SK | 16.03.2011 | ||
BG | 16.06.2011 | ||
GR | 17.06.2011 | ||
IS | 16.07.2011 | ||
PT | 18.07.2011 | ||
PL | 20.07.2011 | ||
Former [2011/50] | AT | 16.03.2011 | |
BE | 16.03.2011 | ||
CY | 16.03.2011 | ||
CZ | 16.03.2011 | ||
EE | 16.03.2011 | ||
FI | 16.03.2011 | ||
LT | 16.03.2011 | ||
LV | 16.03.2011 | ||
RO | 16.03.2011 | ||
SE | 16.03.2011 | ||
SI | 16.03.2011 | ||
SK | 16.03.2011 | ||
BG | 16.06.2011 | ||
GR | 17.06.2011 | ||
IS | 16.07.2011 | ||
PT | 18.07.2011 | ||
PL | 20.07.2011 | ||
Former [2011/49] | AT | 16.03.2011 | |
BE | 16.03.2011 | ||
CY | 16.03.2011 | ||
CZ | 16.03.2011 | ||
EE | 16.03.2011 | ||
FI | 16.03.2011 | ||
LT | 16.03.2011 | ||
LV | 16.03.2011 | ||
RO | 16.03.2011 | ||
SE | 16.03.2011 | ||
SI | 16.03.2011 | ||
SK | 16.03.2011 | ||
BG | 16.06.2011 | ||
GR | 17.06.2011 | ||
PT | 18.07.2011 | ||
Former [2011/47] | AT | 16.03.2011 | |
BE | 16.03.2011 | ||
CY | 16.03.2011 | ||
EE | 16.03.2011 | ||
FI | 16.03.2011 | ||
LT | 16.03.2011 | ||
LV | 16.03.2011 | ||
SE | 16.03.2011 | ||
SI | 16.03.2011 | ||
BG | 16.06.2011 | ||
GR | 17.06.2011 | ||
PT | 18.07.2011 | ||
Former [2011/41] | AT | 16.03.2011 | |
BE | 16.03.2011 | ||
CY | 16.03.2011 | ||
FI | 16.03.2011 | ||
LT | 16.03.2011 | ||
LV | 16.03.2011 | ||
SE | 16.03.2011 | ||
SI | 16.03.2011 | ||
BG | 16.06.2011 | ||
GR | 17.06.2011 | ||
Former [2011/38] | AT | 16.03.2011 | |
CY | 16.03.2011 | ||
FI | 16.03.2011 | ||
LT | 16.03.2011 | ||
LV | 16.03.2011 | ||
SE | 16.03.2011 | ||
SI | 16.03.2011 | ||
BG | 16.06.2011 | ||
GR | 17.06.2011 | ||
Former [2011/37] | CY | 16.03.2011 | |
FI | 16.03.2011 | ||
LT | 16.03.2011 | ||
LV | 16.03.2011 | ||
SE | 16.03.2011 | ||
SI | 16.03.2011 | ||
BG | 16.06.2011 | ||
GR | 17.06.2011 | ||
Former [2011/36] | LT | 16.03.2011 | |
LV | 16.03.2011 | ||
SE | 16.03.2011 | ||
GR | 17.06.2011 | Cited in | International search | [A]AT322546B (ICI LTD [GB]) [A] 1* page 3, lines 18-45; claim 1 *; | [DA]WO2004035018 (CREAVIS TECH & INNOVATION GMBH [DE], et al) [DA] 1 * claims 1,4 * |