EP2049723 - DETERMINATION OF THE WATER STORAGE CAPACITY OF TEXTILES IN A WASHING MACHINE, AND CORRESPONDING WASHING MACHINE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.11.2012 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.07.2014 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 20.08.2014 [2014/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BSH Bosch und Siemens Hausgeräte GmbH Carl-Wery-Strasse 34 81739 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/17] | For all designated states BSH Bosch und Siemens Hausgeräte GmbH Carl-Wery-Str. 34 81739 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CZYZEWSKI, Gundula Amselstr. 18 13125 Berlin / DE | 02 /
SCHULZE, Ingo Ulmenallee 7 16341 Röntgental/Zepernick / DE | [2009/17] | Representative(s) | (deleted) | [2012/02] | Application number, filing date | 07730068.9 | 12.06.2007 | [2009/17] | WO2007EP55737 | Priority number, date | DE20061029950 | 29.06.2006 Original published format: DE102006029950 | [2009/17] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2008000614 | Date: | 03.01.2008 | Language: | DE | [2008/01] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2049723 | Date: | 22.04.2009 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.01.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/17] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2049723 | Date: | 11.01.2012 | Language: | DE | [2012/02] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 03.01.2008 | Classification | IPC: | D06F39/00 | [2009/17] | CPC: |
D06F34/18 (EP,US);
D06F2103/18 (EP,US);
D06F2105/48 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/17] | Title | German: | BESTIMMUNG DES WASSERSPEICHERVERMÖGENS VON TEXTILIEN IN EINER WASCHMASCHINE, SOWIE ENTSPRECHENDE WASCHMASCHINE | [2009/17] | English: | DETERMINATION OF THE WATER STORAGE CAPACITY OF TEXTILES IN A WASHING MACHINE, AND CORRESPONDING WASHING MACHINE | [2009/17] | French: | DÉTERMINATION DE LA CAPACITÉ D'ACCUMULATION D'EAU DE TEXTILES DANS UN LAVE-LINGE ET LAVE-LINGE CORRESPONDANT | [2009/17] | Entry into regional phase | 29.01.2009 | National basic fee paid | 29.01.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.01.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.01.2009 | Examination requested [2009/17] | 16.09.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.11.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 24.11.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 16.09.2011 | Opposition(s) | 12.10.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/51] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.06.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.06.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.06.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 12.06.2007 | CY | 11.01.2012 | CZ | 11.01.2012 | DK | 11.01.2012 | EE | 11.01.2012 | FI | 11.01.2012 | IE | 11.01.2012 | LT | 11.01.2012 | LV | 11.01.2012 | MT | 11.01.2012 | NL | 11.01.2012 | PL | 11.01.2012 | RO | 11.01.2012 | SE | 11.01.2012 | SI | 11.01.2012 | SK | 11.01.2012 | TR | 11.01.2012 | BG | 11.04.2012 | GR | 12.04.2012 | ES | 22.04.2012 | IS | 11.05.2012 | PT | 11.05.2012 | AT | 12.06.2012 | LU | 12.06.2012 | BE | 30.06.2012 | CH | 30.06.2012 | LI | 30.06.2012 | MC | 30.06.2012 | [2014/34] |
Former [2014/27] | CY | 11.01.2012 | |
CZ | 11.01.2012 | ||
DK | 11.01.2012 | ||
EE | 11.01.2012 | ||
FI | 11.01.2012 | ||
IE | 11.01.2012 | ||
LT | 11.01.2012 | ||
LV | 11.01.2012 | ||
MT | 11.01.2012 | ||
NL | 11.01.2012 | ||
PL | 11.01.2012 | ||
RO | 11.01.2012 | ||
SE | 11.01.2012 | ||
SI | 11.01.2012 | ||
SK | 11.01.2012 | ||
TR | 11.01.2012 | ||
BG | 11.04.2012 | ||
GR | 12.04.2012 | ||
ES | 22.04.2012 | ||
IS | 11.05.2012 | ||
PT | 11.05.2012 | ||
AT | 12.06.2012 | ||
LU | 12.06.2012 | ||
BE | 30.06.2012 | ||
CH | 30.06.2012 | ||
LI | 30.06.2012 | ||
MC | 30.06.2012 | ||
Former [2014/21] | CY | 11.01.2012 | |
CZ | 11.01.2012 | ||
DK | 11.01.2012 | ||
EE | 11.01.2012 | ||
FI | 11.01.2012 | ||
IE | 11.01.2012 | ||
LT | 11.01.2012 | ||
LV | 11.01.2012 | ||
MT | 11.01.2012 | ||
NL | 11.01.2012 | ||
PL | 11.01.2012 | ||
RO | 11.01.2012 | ||
SE | 11.01.2012 | ||
SI | 11.01.2012 | ||
SK | 11.01.2012 | ||
TR | 11.01.2012 | ||
BG | 11.04.2012 | ||
GR | 12.04.2012 | ||
ES | 22.04.2012 | ||
IS | 11.05.2012 | ||
PT | 11.05.2012 | ||
AT | 12.06.2012 | ||
BE | 30.06.2012 | ||
CH | 30.06.2012 | ||
LI | 30.06.2012 | ||
MC | 30.06.2012 | ||
Former [2013/48] | CY | 11.01.2012 | |
CZ | 11.01.2012 | ||
DK | 11.01.2012 | ||
EE | 11.01.2012 | ||
FI | 11.01.2012 | ||
IE | 11.01.2012 | ||
LT | 11.01.2012 | ||
LV | 11.01.2012 | ||
MT | 11.01.2012 | ||
NL | 11.01.2012 | ||
PL | 11.01.2012 | ||
RO | 11.01.2012 | ||
SE | 11.01.2012 | ||
SI | 11.01.2012 | ||
SK | 11.01.2012 | ||
BG | 11.04.2012 | ||
GR | 12.04.2012 | ||
ES | 22.04.2012 | ||
IS | 11.05.2012 | ||
PT | 11.05.2012 | ||
AT | 12.06.2012 | ||
BE | 30.06.2012 | ||
CH | 30.06.2012 | ||
LI | 30.06.2012 | ||
MC | 30.06.2012 | ||
Former [2013/35] | CY | 11.01.2012 | |
CZ | 11.01.2012 | ||
DK | 11.01.2012 | ||
EE | 11.01.2012 | ||
FI | 11.01.2012 | ||
IE | 11.01.2012 | ||
LT | 11.01.2012 | ||
LV | 11.01.2012 | ||
MT | 11.01.2012 | ||
NL | 11.01.2012 | ||
PL | 11.01.2012 | ||
RO | 11.01.2012 | ||
SE | 11.01.2012 | ||
SI | 11.01.2012 | ||
SK | 11.01.2012 | ||
BG | 11.04.2012 | ||
GR | 12.04.2012 | ||
ES | 22.04.2012 | ||
IS | 11.05.2012 | ||
PT | 11.05.2012 | ||
BE | 30.06.2012 | ||
CH | 30.06.2012 | ||
LI | 30.06.2012 | ||
MC | 30.06.2012 | ||
Former [2013/22] | CY | 11.01.2012 | |
CZ | 11.01.2012 | ||
DK | 11.01.2012 | ||
EE | 11.01.2012 | ||
FI | 11.01.2012 | ||
IE | 11.01.2012 | ||
LT | 11.01.2012 | ||
LV | 11.01.2012 | ||
NL | 11.01.2012 | ||
PL | 11.01.2012 | ||
RO | 11.01.2012 | ||
SE | 11.01.2012 | ||
SI | 11.01.2012 | ||
SK | 11.01.2012 | ||
BG | 11.04.2012 | ||
GR | 12.04.2012 | ||
ES | 22.04.2012 | ||
IS | 11.05.2012 | ||
PT | 11.05.2012 | ||
BE | 30.06.2012 | ||
CH | 30.06.2012 | ||
LI | 30.06.2012 | ||
MC | 30.06.2012 | ||
Former [2013/20] | CY | 11.01.2012 | |
CZ | 11.01.2012 | ||
DK | 11.01.2012 | ||
EE | 11.01.2012 | ||
FI | 11.01.2012 | ||
IE | 11.01.2012 | ||
LT | 11.01.2012 | ||
LV | 11.01.2012 | ||
NL | 11.01.2012 | ||
PL | 11.01.2012 | ||
RO | 11.01.2012 | ||
SE | 11.01.2012 | ||
SI | 11.01.2012 | ||
SK | 11.01.2012 | ||
BG | 11.04.2012 | ||
GR | 12.04.2012 | ||
IS | 11.05.2012 | ||
PT | 11.05.2012 | ||
BE | 30.06.2012 | ||
CH | 30.06.2012 | ||
LI | 30.06.2012 | ||
MC | 30.06.2012 | ||
Former [2013/08] | CY | 11.01.2012 | |
CZ | 11.01.2012 | ||
DK | 11.01.2012 | ||
EE | 11.01.2012 | ||
FI | 11.01.2012 | ||
IE | 11.01.2012 | ||
LT | 11.01.2012 | ||
LV | 11.01.2012 | ||
NL | 11.01.2012 | ||
PL | 11.01.2012 | ||
RO | 11.01.2012 | ||
SE | 11.01.2012 | ||
SI | 11.01.2012 | ||
SK | 11.01.2012 | ||
BG | 11.04.2012 | ||
GR | 12.04.2012 | ||
IS | 11.05.2012 | ||
PT | 11.05.2012 | ||
MC | 30.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/50] | CY | 11.01.2012 | |
CZ | 11.01.2012 | ||
DK | 11.01.2012 | ||
EE | 11.01.2012 | ||
FI | 11.01.2012 | ||
IE | 11.01.2012 | ||
LT | 11.01.2012 | ||
LV | 11.01.2012 | ||
NL | 11.01.2012 | ||
PL | 11.01.2012 | ||
RO | 11.01.2012 | ||
SE | 11.01.2012 | ||
SI | 11.01.2012 | ||
SK | 11.01.2012 | ||
BG | 11.04.2012 | ||
GR | 12.04.2012 | ||
IS | 11.05.2012 | ||
PT | 11.05.2012 | ||
Former [2012/49] | CY | 11.01.2012 | |
CZ | 11.01.2012 | ||
DK | 11.01.2012 | ||
EE | 11.01.2012 | ||
FI | 11.01.2012 | ||
IE | 11.01.2012 | ||
LT | 11.01.2012 | ||
LV | 11.01.2012 | ||
NL | 11.01.2012 | ||
PL | 11.01.2012 | ||
RO | 11.01.2012 | ||
SE | 11.01.2012 | ||
SI | 11.01.2012 | ||
BG | 11.04.2012 | ||
GR | 12.04.2012 | ||
IS | 11.05.2012 | ||
PT | 11.05.2012 | ||
Former [2012/48] | CY | 11.01.2012 | |
EE | 11.01.2012 | ||
FI | 11.01.2012 | ||
IE | 11.01.2012 | ||
LT | 11.01.2012 | ||
LV | 11.01.2012 | ||
NL | 11.01.2012 | ||
PL | 11.01.2012 | ||
SE | 11.01.2012 | ||
SI | 11.01.2012 | ||
BG | 11.04.2012 | ||
GR | 12.04.2012 | ||
IS | 11.05.2012 | ||
PT | 11.05.2012 | ||
Former [2012/47] | CY | 11.01.2012 | |
FI | 11.01.2012 | ||
IE | 11.01.2012 | ||
LT | 11.01.2012 | ||
LV | 11.01.2012 | ||
NL | 11.01.2012 | ||
PL | 11.01.2012 | ||
SI | 11.01.2012 | ||
BG | 11.04.2012 | ||
GR | 12.04.2012 | ||
IS | 11.05.2012 | ||
PT | 11.05.2012 | ||
Former [2012/41] | CY | 11.01.2012 | |
FI | 11.01.2012 | ||
LT | 11.01.2012 | ||
LV | 11.01.2012 | ||
NL | 11.01.2012 | ||
PL | 11.01.2012 | ||
SI | 11.01.2012 | ||
BG | 11.04.2012 | ||
GR | 12.04.2012 | ||
IS | 11.05.2012 | ||
PT | 11.05.2012 | ||
Former [2012/39] | FI | 11.01.2012 | |
LT | 11.01.2012 | ||
LV | 11.01.2012 | ||
NL | 11.01.2012 | ||
PL | 11.01.2012 | ||
SI | 11.01.2012 | ||
BG | 11.04.2012 | ||
GR | 12.04.2012 | ||
IS | 11.05.2012 | ||
PT | 11.05.2012 | ||
Former [2012/37] | FI | 11.01.2012 | |
LT | 11.01.2012 | ||
NL | 11.01.2012 | ||
PL | 11.01.2012 | ||
SI | 11.01.2012 | ||
BG | 11.04.2012 | ||
GR | 12.04.2012 | ||
IS | 11.05.2012 | ||
PT | 11.05.2012 | ||
Former [2012/36] | LT | 11.01.2012 | |
NL | 11.01.2012 | ||
SI | 11.01.2012 | ||
BG | 11.04.2012 | ||
GR | 12.04.2012 | ||
IS | 11.05.2012 | ||
Former [2012/35] | LT | 11.01.2012 | |
NL | 11.01.2012 | ||
SI | 11.01.2012 | ||
BG | 11.04.2012 | ||
IS | 11.05.2012 | ||
Former [2012/34] | LT | 11.01.2012 | |
SI | 11.01.2012 | ||
IS | 11.05.2012 | ||
Former [2012/33] | LT | 11.01.2012 | |
SI | 11.01.2012 | ||
Former [2012/25] | SI | 11.01.2012 | Cited in | International search | [A]DE4304031 (LICENTIA GMBH [DE]) [A] 1-17* the whole document *; | [A]EP0787848 (MERLONI ELETTRODOMESTICI SPA [IT]) [A] 1-17 * Spalte 3, Zeile 28 - Spalte 5, Zeile 2; Ansprüche 1, 2, 14; Zusammenfassung; Abbildungen *; | [A]EP1281803 (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR]) [A] 1-17 * Absatz [0016] - Absatz [0018]; Ansprüche *; | [A]DE10234473 (BSH BOSCH SIEMENS HAUSGERAETE [DE]) [A] 1-17 * Absatz [0012] - Absatz [0016]; Ansprüche; Abbildungen * |