EP2036290 - METHOD FOR PREVENTING UNWANTED INSTANCES OF COMMUNICATION REQUEST SIGNALLING IN A COMMUNICATION NETWORK [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 26.02.2010 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.02.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 31.03.2010 [2010/13] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nokia Siemens Networks GmbH & Co. KG St. Martin Strasse 76 81541 München / DE | [2009/12] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KAUFFMANN, Martina 2 Jiangtai Road Beijing, 100016 / CN | 02 /
LUKAS, Klaus Niemöllerallee 6 81739 München / DE | [2009/12] | Application number, filing date | 07730137.2 | 13.06.2007 | [2009/12] | WO2007EP55849 | Priority number, date | DE20061027825 | 16.06.2006 Original published format: DE102006027825 | [2009/12] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2007144385 | Date: | 21.12.2007 | Language: | DE | [2007/51] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2036290 | Date: | 18.03.2009 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.12.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/12] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 21.12.2007 | Classification | IPC: | H04L29/06 | [2009/12] | CPC: |
H04L65/1079 (EP);
H04L63/0227 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/12] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUM VERMEIDEN VON UNGEWÜNSCHTEN KOMMUNIKATIONSANFRAGESIGNALISIERUNGEN IN EINEM KOMMUNIKATIONSNETZWERK | [2009/12] | English: | METHOD FOR PREVENTING UNWANTED INSTANCES OF COMMUNICATION REQUEST SIGNALLING IN A COMMUNICATION NETWORK | [2009/12] | French: | PROCÉDÉ POUR ÉVITER DES SIGNALISATIONS DE REQUÊTES DE COMMUNICATION NON SOUHAITÉES DANS UN RÉSEAU DE COMMUNICATION | [2009/12] | Entry into regional phase | 16.01.2009 | National basic fee paid | 16.01.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.01.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.01.2009 | Examination requested [2009/12] | 02.06.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.10.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2010/13] | 13.11.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2010/13] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.06.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]US2005141486 (GILCHRIST ROD [CA], et al) [X] 1-16 * paragraphs [0029] , [0034] , [0036] , [0039] , [0045] - [0047] - [0050] - [0052] *; | [X] - DAWIRS UNIVERSITY OF NAMUR T FROMENT ALCATEL H TSCHOFENIG SIEMENS G, "Authorization Policies for Preventing SPIT", IETF STANDARD-WORKING-DRAFT, INTERNET ENGINEERING TASK FORCE, IETF, CH, (20060220), ISSN 0000-0004, XP015043449 [X] 1-16 * paragraph [0004] * | [A] - MACINTOSH R ET AL, "Detection and mitigation of spam in IP telephony networks using signaling protocol analysis", ADVANCES IN WIRED AND WIRELESS COMMUNICATION, 2005 IEEE/SARNOFF SYMPOSIUM ON PRINCETON, NEW JERSEY, USA APRIL 18-19, 2005, PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA,IEEE, (20050418), ISBN 0-7803-8854-2, pages 49 - 52, XP010793744 [A] 1-6 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/SARNOF.2005.1426509 | [A] - ROSENBERG J ET AL, "The Session Initiation Protocol (SIP) and Spam draft-ietf-sipping-spam-02", INTERNET CITATION, (20060306), URL: http://tools.ietf.org.html/draft-ietf-sipping-spam, (20070706), XP002442168 [A] * paragraphs [03.1] , [03.4] * | [A] - DANTU ET AL, "Detecting Spam in VoIP networks", SRUTI: STEPS TO REDUCING UNWANTED TRAFFIC ON THE INTERNET WORKSHOP, XX, XX, (20050707), pages 31 - 37, XP002405070 |