EP2032329 - MOULD CAVITY WITH DECOUPLED COOLING-CHANNEL ROUTING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.09.2012 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.07.2014 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 20.08.2014 [2014/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MHT Mold & Hotrunner Technology AG Dr.-Ruben-Rausing-Strasse 7 65239 Hochheim / DE | [2009/11] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NETER, Witold 62 Shadow Lake Trail Newnan, GA 30265 / US | 02 /
HÖNISCH, Marek Am Forsthaus 10 65510 Hünstetten / DE | 03 /
THÖMMES, Helmut Kirchstrasse 22 54441 Kastel / DE | [2009/11] | Representative(s) | Köppen, Manfred, et al WSL Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Kaiser-Friedrich-Ring 98 65185 Wiesbaden / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/11] | Köppen, Manfred, et al WSL Patentanwälte Taunusstrasse 5a 65183 Wiesbaden / DE | Application number, filing date | 07730174.5 | 14.06.2007 | [2009/11] | WO2007EP55922 | Priority number, date | DE20061028174 | 16.06.2006 Original published format: DE102006028174 | [2009/11] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2007144415 | Date: | 21.12.2007 | Language: | DE | [2007/51] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2032329 | Date: | 11.03.2009 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.12.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/11] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2032329 | Date: | 16.11.2011 | Language: | DE | [2011/46] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 21.12.2007 | Classification | IPC: | B29C45/73 | [2009/11] | CPC: |
B29C45/7312 (EP,US);
B29C2033/042 (EP,US);
B29K2105/253 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/11] | Title | German: | FORMNESTKAVITÄT MIT MÄANDERFÖRMIGEM KÜHLKANAL | [2009/11] | English: | MOULD CAVITY WITH DECOUPLED COOLING-CHANNEL ROUTING | [2009/11] | French: | CAVITÉ DE MOULE AVEC CANAL DE REFROIDISSEMENT EN FORME DE MÉANDRE | [2009/11] | Entry into regional phase | 28.12.2008 | National basic fee paid | 28.12.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.12.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.12.2008 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 28.12.2008 | Examination requested [2009/11] | 09.03.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.07.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.07.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.10.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 04.10.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 09.03.2010 | Opposition(s) | 17.08.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/43] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.06.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 17.06.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 14.06.2007 | CY | 16.11.2011 | CZ | 16.11.2011 | DK | 16.11.2011 | EE | 16.11.2011 | FI | 16.11.2011 | IE | 16.11.2011 | LT | 16.11.2011 | LV | 16.11.2011 | MT | 16.11.2011 | NL | 16.11.2011 | PL | 16.11.2011 | RO | 16.11.2011 | SE | 16.11.2011 | SI | 16.11.2011 | SK | 16.11.2011 | TR | 16.11.2011 | BG | 16.02.2012 | GR | 17.02.2012 | ES | 27.02.2012 | IS | 16.03.2012 | PT | 16.03.2012 | AT | 14.06.2012 | GB | 14.06.2012 | BE | 30.06.2012 | MC | 30.06.2012 | FR | 02.07.2012 | [2014/34] |
Former [2014/21] | CY | 16.11.2011 | |
CZ | 16.11.2011 | ||
DK | 16.11.2011 | ||
EE | 16.11.2011 | ||
FI | 16.11.2011 | ||
IE | 16.11.2011 | ||
LT | 16.11.2011 | ||
LV | 16.11.2011 | ||
MT | 16.11.2011 | ||
NL | 16.11.2011 | ||
PL | 16.11.2011 | ||
RO | 16.11.2011 | ||
SE | 16.11.2011 | ||
SI | 16.11.2011 | ||
SK | 16.11.2011 | ||
TR | 16.11.2011 | ||
BG | 16.02.2012 | ||
GR | 17.02.2012 | ||
ES | 27.02.2012 | ||
IS | 16.03.2012 | ||
PT | 16.03.2012 | ||
AT | 14.06.2012 | ||
GB | 14.06.2012 | ||
BE | 30.06.2012 | ||
MC | 30.06.2012 | ||
FR | 02.07.2012 | ||
Former [2013/48] | CY | 16.11.2011 | |
CZ | 16.11.2011 | ||
DK | 16.11.2011 | ||
EE | 16.11.2011 | ||
FI | 16.11.2011 | ||
IE | 16.11.2011 | ||
LT | 16.11.2011 | ||
LV | 16.11.2011 | ||
MT | 16.11.2011 | ||
NL | 16.11.2011 | ||
PL | 16.11.2011 | ||
RO | 16.11.2011 | ||
SE | 16.11.2011 | ||
SI | 16.11.2011 | ||
SK | 16.11.2011 | ||
BG | 16.02.2012 | ||
GR | 17.02.2012 | ||
ES | 27.02.2012 | ||
IS | 16.03.2012 | ||
PT | 16.03.2012 | ||
AT | 14.06.2012 | ||
GB | 14.06.2012 | ||
BE | 30.06.2012 | ||
MC | 30.06.2012 | ||
FR | 02.07.2012 | ||
Former [2013/35] | CY | 16.11.2011 | |
CZ | 16.11.2011 | ||
DK | 16.11.2011 | ||
EE | 16.11.2011 | ||
FI | 16.11.2011 | ||
IE | 16.11.2011 | ||
LT | 16.11.2011 | ||
LV | 16.11.2011 | ||
MT | 16.11.2011 | ||
NL | 16.11.2011 | ||
PL | 16.11.2011 | ||
RO | 16.11.2011 | ||
SE | 16.11.2011 | ||
SI | 16.11.2011 | ||
SK | 16.11.2011 | ||
BG | 16.02.2012 | ||
GR | 17.02.2012 | ||
ES | 27.02.2012 | ||
IS | 16.03.2012 | ||
PT | 16.03.2012 | ||
GB | 14.06.2012 | ||
BE | 30.06.2012 | ||
MC | 30.06.2012 | ||
FR | 02.07.2012 | ||
Former [2013/29] | CY | 16.11.2011 | |
CZ | 16.11.2011 | ||
DK | 16.11.2011 | ||
EE | 16.11.2011 | ||
FI | 16.11.2011 | ||
IE | 16.11.2011 | ||
LT | 16.11.2011 | ||
LV | 16.11.2011 | ||
NL | 16.11.2011 | ||
PL | 16.11.2011 | ||
RO | 16.11.2011 | ||
SE | 16.11.2011 | ||
SI | 16.11.2011 | ||
SK | 16.11.2011 | ||
BG | 16.02.2012 | ||
GR | 17.02.2012 | ||
ES | 27.02.2012 | ||
IS | 16.03.2012 | ||
PT | 16.03.2012 | ||
GB | 14.06.2012 | ||
BE | 30.06.2012 | ||
MC | 30.06.2012 | ||
FR | 02.07.2012 | ||
Former [2013/23] | CY | 16.11.2011 | |
CZ | 16.11.2011 | ||
DK | 16.11.2011 | ||
EE | 16.11.2011 | ||
IE | 16.11.2011 | ||
LT | 16.11.2011 | ||
LV | 16.11.2011 | ||
NL | 16.11.2011 | ||
PL | 16.11.2011 | ||
RO | 16.11.2011 | ||
SE | 16.11.2011 | ||
SI | 16.11.2011 | ||
SK | 16.11.2011 | ||
BG | 16.02.2012 | ||
GR | 17.02.2012 | ||
ES | 27.02.2012 | ||
IS | 16.03.2012 | ||
PT | 16.03.2012 | ||
GB | 14.06.2012 | ||
BE | 30.06.2012 | ||
MC | 30.06.2012 | ||
FR | 02.07.2012 | ||
Former [2013/22] | CY | 16.11.2011 | |
CZ | 16.11.2011 | ||
DK | 16.11.2011 | ||
EE | 16.11.2011 | ||
IE | 16.11.2011 | ||
LT | 16.11.2011 | ||
LV | 16.11.2011 | ||
NL | 16.11.2011 | ||
PL | 16.11.2011 | ||
RO | 16.11.2011 | ||
SE | 16.11.2011 | ||
SI | 16.11.2011 | ||
SK | 16.11.2011 | ||
BG | 16.02.2012 | ||
GR | 17.02.2012 | ||
ES | 27.02.2012 | ||
IS | 16.03.2012 | ||
PT | 16.03.2012 | ||
GB | 14.06.2012 | ||
BE | 30.06.2012 | ||
MC | 30.06.2012 | ||
Former [2013/21] | CY | 16.11.2011 | |
CZ | 16.11.2011 | ||
DK | 16.11.2011 | ||
EE | 16.11.2011 | ||
IE | 16.11.2011 | ||
LT | 16.11.2011 | ||
LV | 16.11.2011 | ||
NL | 16.11.2011 | ||
PL | 16.11.2011 | ||
RO | 16.11.2011 | ||
SE | 16.11.2011 | ||
SI | 16.11.2011 | ||
SK | 16.11.2011 | ||
BG | 16.02.2012 | ||
GR | 17.02.2012 | ||
IS | 16.03.2012 | ||
PT | 16.03.2012 | ||
GB | 14.06.2012 | ||
BE | 30.06.2012 | ||
MC | 30.06.2012 | ||
Former [2013/20] | CY | 16.11.2011 | |
CZ | 16.11.2011 | ||
DK | 16.11.2011 | ||
EE | 16.11.2011 | ||
IE | 16.11.2011 | ||
LT | 16.11.2011 | ||
LV | 16.11.2011 | ||
NL | 16.11.2011 | ||
PL | 16.11.2011 | ||
RO | 16.11.2011 | ||
SE | 16.11.2011 | ||
SI | 16.11.2011 | ||
SK | 16.11.2011 | ||
BG | 16.02.2012 | ||
GR | 17.02.2012 | ||
IS | 16.03.2012 | ||
PT | 16.03.2012 | ||
BE | 30.06.2012 | ||
MC | 30.06.2012 | ||
Former [2013/08] | CY | 16.11.2011 | |
CZ | 16.11.2011 | ||
DK | 16.11.2011 | ||
EE | 16.11.2011 | ||
IE | 16.11.2011 | ||
LT | 16.11.2011 | ||
LV | 16.11.2011 | ||
NL | 16.11.2011 | ||
PL | 16.11.2011 | ||
RO | 16.11.2011 | ||
SE | 16.11.2011 | ||
SI | 16.11.2011 | ||
SK | 16.11.2011 | ||
BG | 16.02.2012 | ||
GR | 17.02.2012 | ||
IS | 16.03.2012 | ||
PT | 16.03.2012 | ||
MC | 30.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/36] | CY | 16.11.2011 | |
CZ | 16.11.2011 | ||
DK | 16.11.2011 | ||
EE | 16.11.2011 | ||
IE | 16.11.2011 | ||
LT | 16.11.2011 | ||
LV | 16.11.2011 | ||
NL | 16.11.2011 | ||
PL | 16.11.2011 | ||
RO | 16.11.2011 | ||
SE | 16.11.2011 | ||
SI | 16.11.2011 | ||
SK | 16.11.2011 | ||
BG | 16.02.2012 | ||
GR | 17.02.2012 | ||
IS | 16.03.2012 | ||
PT | 16.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/35] | CY | 16.11.2011 | |
CZ | 16.11.2011 | ||
DK | 16.11.2011 | ||
EE | 16.11.2011 | ||
IE | 16.11.2011 | ||
LT | 16.11.2011 | ||
LV | 16.11.2011 | ||
NL | 16.11.2011 | ||
PL | 16.11.2011 | ||
SE | 16.11.2011 | ||
SI | 16.11.2011 | ||
BG | 16.02.2012 | ||
GR | 17.02.2012 | ||
IS | 16.03.2012 | ||
PT | 16.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/34] | CY | 16.11.2011 | |
CZ | 16.11.2011 | ||
LT | 16.11.2011 | ||
LV | 16.11.2011 | ||
NL | 16.11.2011 | ||
PL | 16.11.2011 | ||
SE | 16.11.2011 | ||
SI | 16.11.2011 | ||
GR | 17.02.2012 | ||
IS | 16.03.2012 | ||
PT | 16.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/28] | CY | 16.11.2011 | |
LT | 16.11.2011 | ||
LV | 16.11.2011 | ||
NL | 16.11.2011 | ||
PL | 16.11.2011 | ||
SE | 16.11.2011 | ||
SI | 16.11.2011 | ||
GR | 17.02.2012 | ||
IS | 16.03.2012 | ||
PT | 16.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/26] | LT | 16.11.2011 | |
LV | 16.11.2011 | ||
NL | 16.11.2011 | ||
PL | 16.11.2011 | ||
SE | 16.11.2011 | ||
SI | 16.11.2011 | ||
GR | 17.02.2012 | ||
IS | 16.03.2012 | ||
PT | 16.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/24] | LT | 16.11.2011 | |
LV | 16.11.2011 | ||
NL | 16.11.2011 | ||
SE | 16.11.2011 | ||
SI | 16.11.2011 | ||
GR | 17.02.2012 | ||
IS | 16.03.2012 | ||
PT | 16.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/23] | LT | 16.11.2011 | |
NL | 16.11.2011 | ||
GR | 17.02.2012 | ||
IS | 16.03.2012 | ||
PT | 16.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/21] | LT | 16.11.2011 | |
IS | 16.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/20] | LT | 16.11.2011 | Cited in | International search | [X]DE2037365 (KORSCH SPEZIALFAB EMIL) [X] 1-3,9,11-13,16,18-20 * page 7, paragraph 4 - page 8, paragraph 1 * * figures 1,2 *; | [X]US3887350 (JENKINS CHARLES W) [X] 1-3,18-20 * column 7, line 41 - column 8, line 2 * * figure 5 *; | [A]EP0688656 (GELLERT JOBST U [CA]) [A] 1* figures 3,4 * | by applicant | DE2037365 | US3887350 | WO2005051632 |