EP2022455 - DEVICE FOR FACILITATING ACCESS TO A SANITARY FITTING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 22.08.2014 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.08.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 24.09.2014 [2014/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Svenskastol, S.L. C/ Ganduxer, 5-15, Entlo., Desp. 6 08021 Barcelona / ES | [2009/07] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ALTAPARRO, Daniel Alberto C/ Ganduxer, 5-15 Entlo. Desp.6 E-08021 Barcelona / ES | [2009/11] |
Former [2009/07] | 01 /
ALTAPARRO, Daniel Alberto Plaça Nova n 10 E-08310 Argentona / ES | Representative(s) | Pons Ariño, Angel Pons Patentes y Marcas Internacional, S.L. Glorieta Rubén Dario 4 28010 Madrid / ES | [N/P] |
Former [2013/19] | Pons Ariño, Angel Pons Patentes y Marcas Internacional, S.L. Glorieta Ruben Dario 4 28010 Madrid / ES | ||
Former [2009/07] | Gallego Jiménez, José Fernando BGA Patentes y Marcas Av. Diagonal, 421,2 08008 Barcelona / ES | Application number, filing date | 07730320.4 | 14.02.2007 | [2009/07] | WO2007ES00079 | Priority number, date | ES20060000985 | 28.04.2006 Original published format: ES 200600985 | [2009/07] | Filing language | ES | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2007125136 | Date: | 08.11.2007 | Language: | ES | [2007/45] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2022455 | Date: | 11.02.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/07] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | ES | 08.11.2007 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.08.2013 | Classification | IPC: | A61G7/10, A47K3/12 | [2009/07] | CPC: |
A47K3/12 (EP,US);
A61G2200/34 (EP,US);
A61G7/1003 (EP,US);
A61G7/1007 (EP,US);
A61G7/1034 (EP,US);
A61G7/1059 (EP,US);
A61G7/1076 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/07] | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG ZUR ERLEICHTERUNG DES ZUGANGS ZU EINER SANITÄRARMATUR | [2009/07] | English: | DEVICE FOR FACILITATING ACCESS TO A SANITARY FITTING | [2009/07] | French: | DISPOSITIF PERMETTANT DE FACILITER L'ACCÈS À UN SANITAIRE | [2009/07] | Entry into regional phase | 23.10.2008 | Translation filed | 23.10.2008 | National basic fee paid | 23.10.2008 | Search fee paid | 23.10.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.10.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.10.2008 | Examination requested [2009/07] | 11.03.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2014/39] | 25.04.2014 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2014/39] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.10.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 09.02.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.02.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 16.02.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 28.02.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 28.02.2014 | 08   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [ ] - No further relevant documents disclosed | International search | [X]US5373591 (MYERS RICK L [US]); | [A]US4266305 (KAVALOSKI PETER P, et al); | [A]US6279178 (HILL JIMMY [US]); | [A]US5517704 (DAGOSTINO RICHARD J [US]); | [A]ES1035481U (FERNANDEZ DELGADO MANUEL [ES]) | by applicant | MXPA02010094 | JP2005279284 | GB2411830 | US6941592 | EP1523972 | JP2005204704 |