EP2018462 - FLEXIBLE CURTAIN DOOR WITH PREWIRED CONTROL BOX [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.11.2015 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.10.2017 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): BE, BG, CY, HU, PT, TR | published on 15.11.2017 [2017/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NERGECO 8 rue de l'Industrie 43220 Dunières / FR | [2009/05] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KRAEUTLER, Bernard La Villette 43220 Dunières / FR | [2009/05] | Representative(s) | Delorme, Nicolas Cabinet Germain & Maureau Espace Fauriel 35 rue des Frères Ponchardier 42100 Saint Etienne / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2015/01] | Delorme, Nicolas Cabinet Germain & Maureau 12, rue de la République 42000 Saint Etienne / FR | ||
Former [2009/05] | Delorme, Nicolas Cabinet Germain & Maureau, 12, rue de la République 42000 Saint Etienne / FR | Application number, filing date | 07731358.3 | 25.04.2007 | [2009/05] | WO2007FR00699 | Priority number, date | FR20060004241 | 12.05.2006 Original published format: FR 0604241 | [2009/05] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2007135253 | Date: | 29.11.2007 | Language: | FR | [2007/48] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2018462 | Date: | 28.01.2009 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.11.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/05] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2018462 | Date: | 31.12.2014 | Language: | FR | [2015/01] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 17.01.2008 | Classification | IPC: | E06B9/17 | [2009/05] | CPC: |
E06B9/17 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/05] | Title | German: | TOR MIT FLEXIBLEM TORBLATT UND VORVERDRAHTETEM STEUERKASTEN | [2009/05] | English: | FLEXIBLE CURTAIN DOOR WITH PREWIRED CONTROL BOX | [2009/05] | French: | PORTE A RIDEAU SOUPLE AVEC BOITIER DE COMMANDE PRECABLE | [2009/05] | Entry into regional phase | 06.11.2008 | National basic fee paid | 06.11.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 06.11.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.11.2008 | Examination requested [2009/05] | 24.07.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 12.03.2013 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 17.04.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.01.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.05.2014 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 12.05.2014 | Fee for grant paid | 12.05.2014 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 10.11.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.11.2014 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 24.07.2012 | Opposition(s) | 01.10.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit [2015/50] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 17.04.2013 | Request for further processing filed | 17.04.2013 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 03.05.2013 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.02.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.02.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.02.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.02.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 28.02.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 28.02.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Licence(s) | ID: | 01 01/not-exclusive | For: | AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LT LU LV MC MT NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR | Licencee: | Nergeco France 8, rue de l'Industrie 43220 Dunières / FR | Date: | 28.05.2009 | [2009/35] | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 25.04.2007 | AT | 31.12.2014 | BG | 31.12.2014 | CY | 31.12.2014 | CZ | 31.12.2014 | DK | 31.12.2014 | EE | 31.12.2014 | ES | 31.12.2014 | FI | 31.12.2014 | LT | 31.12.2014 | LV | 31.12.2014 | MC | 31.12.2014 | MT | 31.12.2014 | NL | 31.12.2014 | PL | 31.12.2014 | RO | 31.12.2014 | SI | 31.12.2014 | SK | 31.12.2014 | TR | 31.12.2014 | GR | 01.04.2015 | IE | 25.04.2015 | LU | 25.04.2015 | BE | 30.04.2015 | CH | 30.04.2015 | IS | 30.04.2015 | LI | 30.04.2015 | PT | 01.05.2015 | [2017/39] |
Former [2017/03] | AT | 31.12.2014 | |
CZ | 31.12.2014 | ||
DK | 31.12.2014 | ||
EE | 31.12.2014 | ||
ES | 31.12.2014 | ||
FI | 31.12.2014 | ||
LT | 31.12.2014 | ||
LV | 31.12.2014 | ||
MC | 31.12.2014 | ||
MT | 31.12.2014 | ||
NL | 31.12.2014 | ||
PL | 31.12.2014 | ||
RO | 31.12.2014 | ||
SI | 31.12.2014 | ||
SK | 31.12.2014 | ||
GR | 01.04.2015 | ||
IE | 25.04.2015 | ||
LU | 25.04.2015 | ||
CH | 30.04.2015 | ||
IS | 30.04.2015 | ||
LI | 30.04.2015 | ||
Former [2016/20] | AT | 31.12.2014 | |
CZ | 31.12.2014 | ||
DK | 31.12.2014 | ||
EE | 31.12.2014 | ||
ES | 31.12.2014 | ||
FI | 31.12.2014 | ||
LT | 31.12.2014 | ||
LV | 31.12.2014 | ||
MC | 31.12.2014 | ||
NL | 31.12.2014 | ||
PL | 31.12.2014 | ||
RO | 31.12.2014 | ||
SI | 31.12.2014 | ||
SK | 31.12.2014 | ||
GR | 01.04.2015 | ||
IE | 25.04.2015 | ||
LU | 25.04.2015 | ||
CH | 30.04.2015 | ||
IS | 30.04.2015 | ||
LI | 30.04.2015 | ||
Former [2016/12] | AT | 31.12.2014 | |
CZ | 31.12.2014 | ||
DK | 31.12.2014 | ||
EE | 31.12.2014 | ||
ES | 31.12.2014 | ||
FI | 31.12.2014 | ||
LT | 31.12.2014 | ||
LV | 31.12.2014 | ||
MC | 31.12.2014 | ||
NL | 31.12.2014 | ||
PL | 31.12.2014 | ||
RO | 31.12.2014 | ||
SI | 31.12.2014 | ||
SK | 31.12.2014 | ||
GR | 01.04.2015 | ||
LU | 25.04.2015 | ||
CH | 30.04.2015 | ||
IS | 30.04.2015 | ||
LI | 30.04.2015 | ||
Former [2016/06] | AT | 31.12.2014 | |
CZ | 31.12.2014 | ||
DK | 31.12.2014 | ||
EE | 31.12.2014 | ||
ES | 31.12.2014 | ||
FI | 31.12.2014 | ||
LT | 31.12.2014 | ||
LV | 31.12.2014 | ||
MC | 31.12.2014 | ||
NL | 31.12.2014 | ||
PL | 31.12.2014 | ||
RO | 31.12.2014 | ||
SK | 31.12.2014 | ||
GR | 01.04.2015 | ||
LU | 25.04.2015 | ||
CH | 30.04.2015 | ||
IS | 30.04.2015 | ||
LI | 30.04.2015 | ||
Former [2016/01] | AT | 31.12.2014 | |
CZ | 31.12.2014 | ||
DK | 31.12.2014 | ||
EE | 31.12.2014 | ||
ES | 31.12.2014 | ||
FI | 31.12.2014 | ||
LT | 31.12.2014 | ||
LV | 31.12.2014 | ||
MC | 31.12.2014 | ||
NL | 31.12.2014 | ||
PL | 31.12.2014 | ||
RO | 31.12.2014 | ||
SK | 31.12.2014 | ||
GR | 01.04.2015 | ||
LU | 25.04.2015 | ||
IS | 30.04.2015 | ||
Former [2015/52] | AT | 31.12.2014 | |
CZ | 31.12.2014 | ||
DK | 31.12.2014 | ||
EE | 31.12.2014 | ||
ES | 31.12.2014 | ||
FI | 31.12.2014 | ||
LT | 31.12.2014 | ||
LV | 31.12.2014 | ||
NL | 31.12.2014 | ||
PL | 31.12.2014 | ||
RO | 31.12.2014 | ||
SK | 31.12.2014 | ||
GR | 01.04.2015 | ||
LU | 25.04.2015 | ||
IS | 30.04.2015 | ||
Former [2015/49] | AT | 31.12.2014 | |
CZ | 31.12.2014 | ||
DK | 31.12.2014 | ||
EE | 31.12.2014 | ||
ES | 31.12.2014 | ||
FI | 31.12.2014 | ||
LT | 31.12.2014 | ||
LV | 31.12.2014 | ||
NL | 31.12.2014 | ||
PL | 31.12.2014 | ||
RO | 31.12.2014 | ||
SK | 31.12.2014 | ||
GR | 01.04.2015 | ||
IS | 30.04.2015 | ||
Former [2015/38] | AT | 31.12.2014 | |
CZ | 31.12.2014 | ||
ES | 31.12.2014 | ||
FI | 31.12.2014 | ||
LT | 31.12.2014 | ||
LV | 31.12.2014 | ||
NL | 31.12.2014 | ||
PL | 31.12.2014 | ||
RO | 31.12.2014 | ||
SK | 31.12.2014 | ||
GR | 01.04.2015 | ||
IS | 30.04.2015 | ||
Former [2015/37] | CZ | 31.12.2014 | |
ES | 31.12.2014 | ||
FI | 31.12.2014 | ||
LT | 31.12.2014 | ||
LV | 31.12.2014 | ||
NL | 31.12.2014 | ||
PL | 31.12.2014 | ||
RO | 31.12.2014 | ||
SK | 31.12.2014 | ||
GR | 01.04.2015 | ||
Former [2015/36] | CZ | 31.12.2014 | |
ES | 31.12.2014 | ||
FI | 31.12.2014 | ||
LT | 31.12.2014 | ||
LV | 31.12.2014 | ||
NL | 31.12.2014 | ||
RO | 31.12.2014 | ||
GR | 01.04.2015 | ||
Former [2015/33] | ES | 31.12.2014 | |
FI | 31.12.2014 | ||
LT | 31.12.2014 | ||
LV | 31.12.2014 | ||
NL | 31.12.2014 | ||
GR | 01.04.2015 | ||
Former [2015/29] | FI | 31.12.2014 | |
LT | 31.12.2014 | ||
LV | 31.12.2014 | ||
NL | 31.12.2014 | ||
GR | 01.04.2015 | ||
Former [2015/24] | FI | 31.12.2014 | |
LT | 31.12.2014 | ||
LV | 31.12.2014 | ||
GR | 01.04.2015 | ||
Former [2015/23] | FI | 31.12.2014 | |
LT | 31.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/20] | LT | 31.12.2014 | Cited in | International search | [A]JP2003301678 (BUNKA SHUTTER) [A] 1* the whole document *; | [X] - BUTZBACH GMBH INDUSTRIETORE, "Technische Daten Schnelllauftor NOVOSPRINT Hygiene", (20060427), URL: http://www.butzbach.com/images/5406.3950_C_NOVO_Hygiene_Deutsch.pdf, (20071029), XP002456851 [X] 1 * the whole document * |