EP1994167 - METHOD FOR READING IMAGES, IN PARTICULAR FOR STUDYING THE DEVELOPMENT OF BIOFILM IN A CULTURE MEDIUM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.07.2012 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.07.2014 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 20.08.2014 [2014/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Biofilm Control Biopôle Clermont-Limagne 63360 Saint-Beauzire / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2008/48] | For all designated states Biofilm Control Biopole Clermont-Limagne 63360 Saint Beauzire / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BERNARDI, Thierry 26 rue de Sarliève 63170 Perignat-les-sarliève / FR | 02 /
BARA, Nicolas 9 rue Française 75002 Paris / FR | [2008/48] | Representative(s) | Novagraaf Technologies Bâtiment O2 2, rue Sarah Bernhardt CS90017 92665 Asnières-sur-Seine Cedex / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2011/35] | Novagraaf Technologies 122 rue Edouard Vaillant 92593 Levallois-Perret Cedex / FR | ||
Former [2008/48] | Bredema 38, avenue de l'Opéra 75002 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 07731707.1 | 08.03.2007 | [2008/48] | WO2007FR50891 | Priority number, date | FR20060002145 | 10.03.2006 Original published format: FR 0602145 | [2008/48] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2007104881 | Date: | 29.09.2007 | Language: | FR | [1938/07] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1994167 | Date: | 26.11.2008 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.09.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/48] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1994167 | Date: | 31.08.2011 | Language: | FR | [2011/35] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 02.05.2008 | Classification | IPC: | C12Q1/04, B01L3/00 | [2008/48] | CPC: |
G01N11/14 (EP,US);
B01L3/545 (EP,US);
C12M23/12 (EP,US);
C12Q1/04 (EP,US);
B01L3/5085 (EP,US);
G01N2011/147 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/48] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUM LESEN VON BILDERN, IM BESONDEREN ZUR UNTERSUCHUNG DER ENTWICKLUNG EINES BIOFILMS IN EINEM KULTURMEDIUM | [2008/48] | English: | METHOD FOR READING IMAGES, IN PARTICULAR FOR STUDYING THE DEVELOPMENT OF BIOFILM IN A CULTURE MEDIUM | [2008/48] | French: | PROCEDE DE RELEVES D'IMAGES, NOTAMMENT POUR L'ETUDE DU DEVELOPPEMENT D'UN BIOFILM DANS UN MILIEU DE CULTURE | [2008/48] | Entry into regional phase | 12.09.2008 | National basic fee paid | 12.09.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.09.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.09.2008 | Examination requested [2008/48] | 02.02.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 30.07.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.03.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.06.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 30.06.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 02.02.2009 | Opposition(s) | 01.06.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/32] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.03.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 08.03.2007 | CY | 31.08.2011 | CZ | 31.08.2011 | EE | 31.08.2011 | FI | 31.08.2011 | LT | 31.08.2011 | LV | 31.08.2011 | MT | 31.08.2011 | PL | 31.08.2011 | RO | 31.08.2011 | SI | 31.08.2011 | SK | 31.08.2011 | TR | 31.08.2011 | BG | 30.11.2011 | GR | 01.12.2011 | IS | 31.12.2011 | [2014/34] |
Former [2014/21] | CY | 31.08.2011 | |
CZ | 31.08.2011 | ||
EE | 31.08.2011 | ||
FI | 31.08.2011 | ||
LT | 31.08.2011 | ||
LV | 31.08.2011 | ||
MT | 31.08.2011 | ||
PL | 31.08.2011 | ||
RO | 31.08.2011 | ||
SI | 31.08.2011 | ||
SK | 31.08.2011 | ||
TR | 31.08.2011 | ||
BG | 30.11.2011 | ||
GR | 01.12.2011 | ||
IS | 31.12.2011 | ||
Former [2013/35] | CY | 31.08.2011 | |
CZ | 31.08.2011 | ||
EE | 31.08.2011 | ||
FI | 31.08.2011 | ||
LT | 31.08.2011 | ||
LV | 31.08.2011 | ||
MT | 31.08.2011 | ||
PL | 31.08.2011 | ||
RO | 31.08.2011 | ||
SI | 31.08.2011 | ||
SK | 31.08.2011 | ||
BG | 30.11.2011 | ||
GR | 01.12.2011 | ||
IS | 31.12.2011 | ||
Former [2013/29] | CY | 31.08.2011 | |
CZ | 31.08.2011 | ||
EE | 31.08.2011 | ||
FI | 31.08.2011 | ||
LT | 31.08.2011 | ||
LV | 31.08.2011 | ||
PL | 31.08.2011 | ||
RO | 31.08.2011 | ||
SI | 31.08.2011 | ||
SK | 31.08.2011 | ||
BG | 30.11.2011 | ||
GR | 01.12.2011 | ||
IS | 31.12.2011 | ||
Former [2012/26] | CY | 31.08.2011 | |
CZ | 31.08.2011 | ||
EE | 31.08.2011 | ||
FI | 31.08.2011 | ||
LT | 31.08.2011 | ||
LV | 31.08.2011 | ||
PL | 31.08.2011 | ||
RO | 31.08.2011 | ||
SI | 31.08.2011 | ||
SK | 31.08.2011 | ||
GR | 01.12.2011 | ||
IS | 31.12.2011 | ||
Former [2012/23] | CY | 31.08.2011 | |
CZ | 31.08.2011 | ||
EE | 31.08.2011 | ||
FI | 31.08.2011 | ||
LT | 31.08.2011 | ||
LV | 31.08.2011 | ||
RO | 31.08.2011 | ||
SI | 31.08.2011 | ||
SK | 31.08.2011 | ||
GR | 01.12.2011 | ||
IS | 31.12.2011 | ||
Former [2012/21] | CY | 31.08.2011 | |
CZ | 31.08.2011 | ||
FI | 31.08.2011 | ||
LT | 31.08.2011 | ||
LV | 31.08.2011 | ||
SI | 31.08.2011 | ||
GR | 01.12.2011 | ||
IS | 31.12.2011 | ||
Former [2012/12] | CY | 31.08.2011 | |
FI | 31.08.2011 | ||
LT | 31.08.2011 | ||
LV | 31.08.2011 | ||
SI | 31.08.2011 | ||
GR | 01.12.2011 | ||
IS | 31.12.2011 | ||
Former [2012/11] | FI | 31.08.2011 | |
LT | 31.08.2011 | ||
LV | 31.08.2011 | ||
SI | 31.08.2011 | ||
GR | 01.12.2011 | ||
IS | 31.12.2011 | Cited in | International search | [A]US3635678 (SEITZ LAMONT J, et al) [A] 1-10 * abstract *; | [A]EP0323322 (SERBIO [FR]) [A] 1-10 * abstract *; | [A]WO9712678 (CORNING COSTAR CORP [US]) [A] 11-14 * the whole document *; | [X]US2001033414 (YAHIRO KANJI [JP]) [X] 11-14 * abstract * * paragraphs [0005] , [0007] , [0016] , [0028] , [0029] *; | [A]WO0186255 (TUFTS COLLEGE [US], et al) [A] 1-10 * abstract *; | [X]US6441894 (MANIAN BALA S [US], et al) [X] 11-14 * abstract * * column 2, line 13 - line 29 * * column 2, line 62 - column 3, line 6 * * column 9, line 57 - column 10, line 21 *; | [A]WO03095995 (AMERSHAM BIOSCIENCES UK LTD [GB], et al) [A] 1-10* abstract *; | [A]WO2005090944 (BERNARDI THIERRY [FR], et al) [A] 1-10 * abstract * * page 19, line 15 - page 20, line 4 * * page 18, line 14 - line 15 * * page 13, line 14 - line 32; claims 10-23 * |