EP2008013 - APPARATUS AND METHOD FOR A HYDROCARBON PRODUCTION FACILITY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 04.12.2009 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.12.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 06.01.2010 [2010/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Upstream Designs Limited 13 Riverside Blackhall Banchory Aberdeenshire AB31 6PS / GB | [2009/01] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NAIK, Hemant 13 Riverside, Blackhall, Banchory ABERDEENSHIRE, AB31 6PS / GB | [2009/01] | Representative(s) | (deleted) | [2009/17] |
Former [2009/01] | Allan, James Stewart Murgitroyd & Company 165-169 Scotland Street Glasgow G5 8PL / GB | Application number, filing date | 07732066.1 | 19.03.2007 | [2009/01] | WO2007GB00974 | Priority number, date | GB20060007648 | 18.04.2006 Original published format: GB 0607648 | GB20060007689 | 19.04.2006 Original published format: GB 0607689 | GB20070003571 | 23.02.2007 Original published format: GB 0703571 | [2009/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2007119040 | Date: | 25.10.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/43] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2008013 | Date: | 31.12.2008 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.10.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/01] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 13.12.2007 | Classification | IPC: | F16L55/46 | [2009/01] | CPC: |
F16L55/46 (EP,GB,US);
E21B23/08 (GB);
F16L2101/12 (GB);
F16L2101/70 (GB)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/01] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN FÜR EINE KOHLENWASSERSTOFFPRODUKTIONSEINRICHTUNG | [2009/01] | English: | APPARATUS AND METHOD FOR A HYDROCARBON PRODUCTION FACILITY | [2009/01] | French: | DISPOSITIF ET PROCÉDÉ POUR INSTALLATION DE PRODUCTION D'HYDROCARBURES | [2009/01] | Entry into regional phase | 01.10.2008 | National basic fee paid | 01.10.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 01.10.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 01.10.2008 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.10.2008 | Examination requested [2009/01] | 06.02.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.06.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2010/01] | 23.07.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2010/01] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2009 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]US3158888 (ERIESON ERNEST A); | [A]US3664356 (GROVE MARVIN H, et al); | [X]US4135949 (REESE HERBERT E); | [A]US4160652 (MARTIN ROBERT E, et al); | [X]US6336238 (TARLTON ORAN D [US]) |