EP2005003 - IMPROVED VACUUM PUMP [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.09.2017 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.09.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 18.10.2017 [2017/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Wabco Automotive UK Limited Unit 1A Grange Valley Road Batley Yorkshire WF17 6GH / GB | [2015/13] |
Former [2008/52] | For all designated states Wabco Automotive UK Limited Beacon Works Texas Street Morley Leeds LS27 0HQ / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HEAPS, David 6 Jacobs Lane Haworth BD22 8RY / GB | 02 /
HEGARTY, John 2a Queen Street East Ardsley Wakefield WF3 2BE / GB | [2016/31] |
Former [2008/52] | 01 /
HEAPS, David WABCO Automotive UK Limited Beacon Works Texas Street Morley Leeds LS27 0HQ / GB | ||
02 /
HEGARTY, John WABCO Automotive UK Limited Texas Street Morley Leeds LS27 0HQ / GB | Representative(s) | Gray, James, et al Withers & Rogers LLP 2 London Bridge London SE1 9RA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2016/45] | Gray, James, et al Withers & Rogers LLP 4 More London Riverside London SE1 2AU / GB | ||
Former [2008/52] | Gray, James, et al Withers & Rogers LLP Goldings House 2 Hays Lane London SE1 2HW / GB | Application number, filing date | 07732358.2 | 05.04.2007 | [2008/52] | WO2007GB01314 | Priority number, date | GB20060007198 | 10.04.2006 Original published format: GB 0607198 | [2008/52] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2007116216 | Date: | 18.10.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/42] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2005003 | Date: | 24.12.2008 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.10.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/52] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2005003 | Date: | 09.11.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/45] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 18.10.2007 | Classification | IPC: | F04C29/02, F04C18/344 | [2008/52] | CPC: |
F04C29/028 (EP,US);
F04C29/02 (KR);
F04C18/344 (KR);
F04C18/3442 (EP,US);
F04C29/126 (EP,US);
F04C2220/10 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, DE, FR, GB, IT, SE [2016/45] |
Former [2009/19] | AT, DE, FR, GB, IT, SE | ||
Former [2008/52] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | VERBESSERTE VAKUUMPUMPE | [2008/52] | English: | IMPROVED VACUUM PUMP | [2008/52] | French: | POMPE A VIDE AMELIOREE | [2008/52] | Entry into regional phase | 15.05.2008 | National basic fee paid | 15.05.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.05.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.05.2008 | Examination requested [2008/52] | 11.11.2008 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 17.12.2008 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HU, IE, IS, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SI, SK, TR | 30.03.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.07.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.06.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 07.08.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.06.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.09.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 30.09.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 30.09.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 30.03.2010 | Opposition(s) | 10.08.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/42] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.04.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.04.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 24.04.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 12.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 10.04.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 30.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 09.11.2016 | [2017/36] | Cited in | International search | [XY]GB2069610 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT) [X] 1-4,7-12,14 * the whole document * [Y] 5,13,15,17; | [X]DE3325261 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [X] 1-4,7-12,14 * page 8, line 1 - line 3; figures 1,2 *; | [X]GB594441 (THOMAS LIONEL HICKS) [X] 1,2,6,16 * page 2, column R, line 90 - line 112; figures 1,2 *; | [Y]DE3841329 (BARMAG BARMER MASCHF [DE]) [Y] 5,13 * column 4, line 13 - line 28; figures 1,2 *; | [Y]GB796924 (LISSMENTS BEAUDOUIN S A R L ET) [Y] 15,17 * the whole document *; | [A]WO2006024872 (WABCO AUTOMOTIVE UK LTD [GB], et al) [A] 1-17 * the whole document * | by applicant | GB2069610 |